Taylor v. Grunigen
Plaintiff: Richard Taylor
Defendant: Erik Grunigen
Not Classified By Court: Judge Jennifer C. Boal
Case Number: 1:2019cv11947
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Marianne B Bowler
Referring Judge: M Page Kelley
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1330 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2022 Filing 232 Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/5/2022 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (Remote only) before Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley.(Vieira, Leonardo)
July 26, 2022 Filing 231 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley: Status Conference held on 7/26/2022. The court discussed with the parties whether they wish to go to mediation. Court further discuss with counsel setting up a Jury Trial date. Jury Trial set for 1/9/2023 - 1/13/2023 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (In person only) before Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Court Reporter: Digital Recording.) To order a copy of this Digital Recording, please go to #https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/transcripts.htm#audio-recordings . For a transcript of this proceeding, contact Katelyn Coppola by email at mad_transcripts@mad.uscourts.gov.(Attorneys present: Straus, Roos) (Vieira, Leonardo)
July 25, 2022 Filing 230 Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: In light of the joint status report, #229 , the court informs the parties that the court is available for trial on the following dates: October 25, 2022; November 29, 2022; December 6, 2022; December 13, 2022; December 27, 2022; January 9, 2023. The court is not inclined to schedule a trial past January, 2023 because of the age of the case. These dates can be further discussed at the hearing on July 26, 2022. (Vieira, Leonardo)
July 19, 2022 Filing 229 STATUS REPORT by Richard Taylor(Individually, as member of 1210 Fire Rock LLC, and as Partner of the Fire Rock Loop Partnership). (Straus, Lindsey)
July 7, 2022 Filing 228 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 7/26/2022 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (Remote only) before Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. The parties are ordered to file a status report, no later than 5 days before the status conference, jointly proposing at least 3 dates for trial.This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov.(Vieira, Leonardo)
July 6, 2022 Filing 227 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley added. Marianne B Recalled Bowler no longer assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
July 6, 2022 Filing 226 Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered reassigning case to Judge Kelley in light of joint statement, # 225.(Belpedio, Lisa)
May 25, 2022 Filing 225 JOINT STATEMENT of counsel Agreeing to Reassignment to Judge Kelley. (Straus, Lindsey)
May 23, 2022 Filing 224 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #178 Motion for leave to Amend. Plaintiff seeks to file a second amended complaint to include "as a numbered count or in the [p]rayer for [r]elief" "a request for correction of [certain] public records" that plaintiff alleges are "false and incorrect." (Docket Entry # 178-1, p. 1). The operative complaint in this action is currently Docket Entry # 20-1 and its accompanying exhibits, as this court previously explained. See (Docket Entry # 207, p. 2, n. 2). Defendant opposes the motion, arguing that "the motion is untimely,... will only prolong proceedings despite numerous extensions [plaintiff] has already sought, and... is futile in that it fails to state a claim upon which relief may be granted." (Docket Entry # 180, p. 1). This court agrees.This court "enjoys significant latitude in deciding whether to grant leave to amend," provided "any adequate reason for the denial is apparent on the record." See U.S. ex rel. Gagne v. City of Worcester, 565 F.3d 40, 48 (1st Cir. 2009). At the time plaintiff filed his motion, this case had been pending for two and a half years. See (Docket Entry # 1). In January of this year, this court emphasized (after numerous delays and deadline extensions): "ABSOLOUTELY NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS TO BE GRANTED IN THIS CASE." (Docket Entry # 146). Plaintiff fails to show good cause under Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a) for his delay in seeking to file a second amended complaint. The fact that the parties may have been busy preparing their summary judgment papers and engaging in settlement discussions, as plaintiff suggests (Docket Entry # 178-1, p. 4), does not excuse plaintiff's delay. Furthermore: (1) to the extent plaintiff seeks to add the "correction of public records and contracts" (Docket Entry # 178-2, p. 50) "as a numbered count" (Docket Entry # 178-1, p. 1), he fails to state a claim for which relief may be granted and therefore proposes a futile amendment, see Rife v. One West Bank, F.S.B., 873 F.3d 17, 21 (1st Cir. 2017); and (2) to the extent plaintiff seeks to supplement his "prayer for relief" with a request for an order requiring defendant to correct the allegedly false and incorrect filings (Docket Entry # 178-1, p. 1), plaintiff has already requested in the operative complaint (Docket Entry # 20-1) a broad request for "further relief as [this] [c]ourt deems appropriate" (Docket Entry # 20-1, p. 56).Accordingly, in this court's discretion under Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a), plaintiff's second motion for leave to amend (Docket Entry # 178) is DENIED. (Belpedio, Lisa)
May 19, 2022 Filing 223 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Status Conference held on 5/19/2022. Case called, counsel appear by telephone, counsel to confer and file preference within one week on how case should proceed. (Court Reporter: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Straus, Roos) (Belpedio, Lisa)
May 12, 2022 Filing 222 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Status Conference set for 5/19/2022 02:00 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. COUNSEL ARE DIRECTED TO APPEAR BY PHONE by calling 888-675-2535 approximately five minutes prior to the conference, using Access Code 6641794. If, for some reason, the call is disconnected, dial back in. NOTE that yours may not be the first case called, but please remain on the line until it is. (Belpedio, Lisa)
April 28, 2022 Filing 221 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. In docketing a Memorandum and Order allowing plaintiffs motion for leave to file corrected filings, the Clerk erroneously informed plaintiffs counsel to file the document for which leave to file has been granted. (Docket Entry # 206). As stated in the Memorandum and Order, however, plaintiff [already] filed the corrected filings (Docket Entry # 194-1 to 194-3, 195,195-1 to 195-4, 196, 196-1, 196-2, 197, 197-1 to 197-5, 198, 1981 to 198-3). (Docket Entry # 206, p. 3). Moreover, a Memorandum and Order on the summary judgment motions (Docket Entry # 208) refers to these filings by the above docket entries.Abiding by the Clerks instructions, plaintiffs counsel yesterday filed ten filings (Docket Entry # 211-220) (the belated filings) regarding the already-adjudicated summary judgment motion (Docket Entry # 115). The belated filings (Docket Entry # 211 to 220) require no judicial action. In addition, they do not replace the already-existing, corrected summary judgment filings noted above, which were part of the summary judgment record when this court decided the summary judgment motions. (Russo, Noreen)
April 27, 2022 Filing 220 AFFIDAVIT of Richard P Taylor in Opposition re #115 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Straus, Lindsey)
April 27, 2022 Filing 219 AFFIDAVIT of Richard P Taylor in Opposition re #115 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Straus, Lindsey)
April 27, 2022 Filing 218 AFFIDAVIT of Richard P Taylor in Opposition re #115 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Taylor. (Straus, Lindsey)
April 27, 2022 Filing 217 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #115 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Taylor. (Straus, Lindsey)
April 27, 2022 Filing 216 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #120 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Taylor. (Straus, Lindsey)
April 27, 2022 Filing 215 AFFIDAVIT of Richard P Taylor in Opposition re #115 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Straus, Lindsey)
April 27, 2022 Filing 214 AFFIDAVIT of Richard P. Taylor in Opposition re #115 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Straus, Lindsey)
April 27, 2022 Filing 213 AFFIDAVIT of Richard P. Taylor in Opposition re #115 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Straus, Lindsey)
April 27, 2022 Filing 212 Opposition re #115 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Taylor. (Straus, Lindsey)
April 27, 2022 Filing 211 Amended Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re #115 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Taylor. (Straus, Lindsey)
April 26, 2022 Filing 210 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re: #184 Motion to Strike #184 MOTION to Strike #147 Response to Motion, #148 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion . The motion seeks to strike: (1) plaintiff Richard P. Taylor's memorandum in opposition (Docket Entry # 148) to defendant Erik V. Grunigen's summary judgment motion because it "does not reference a single exhibit" (Docket Entry # 183) (capitalizationomitted); and (2) plaintiff's statement of additional facts (Docket Entry # 147, pp. 15-75) because it is not concise, certain paragraphs are not supported by citations to the record, and other paragraphs cite to exhibits that do not exist. (Docket Entry # 183, 184). After defendant filed the motion to strike, this court allowed plaintiff to file a corrected memorandum in opposition (Docket Entry # 194-2) which now contains citations to exhibits. Request number one is therefore moot. Relative to request number two, this court allowed plaintiff to file a corrected statement of additional facts (Docket Entry # 194-1, pp. 15-75) to include missing citations to the record and referenced exhibits to the corrected Taylor affidavit (Docket Entry # 194-3) as well as a revised set of 48 exhibits to the affidavit (Docket Entry # 195-198) in order to correct misnumbered and missing exhibits. The second request is therefore moot except for the request to strike the additional statement because it is not concise. In this court's discretion, see Advanced Flexible Circuits, Inc. v. GE Sensing & Inspection Techs. GmbH, 781 F.3d 510, 521 (1st Cir. 2015), the prior statement of additional facts is not stricken on the basis that it is not concise or includes immaterial facts. By extension, this court declines to sua sponte strike the corrected statement of additional facts because it is not concise and/or includes immaterial facts. (Belpedio, Lisa)
April 26, 2022 Filing 209 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re: #137 Motion to Strike #137 MOTION to Strike #130 Exhibit Affidavit of Richard P. Taylor. The motion seeks to strike portions of the statement of facts (Docket Entry # 120-1) and affidavit (Docket Entry # 123) filed by plaintiff Richard P. Taylor ("plaintiff") in support of his summary judgment motion (Docket Entry # 120) on the basis that they "contain legal conclusions, self-serving and conclusory assertions, and non-material facts, all of which are inappropriate for summary judgment." (Docket Entry # 137). Defendant Erik V. Grunigen ("defendant") moves to strike as immaterial (inter alia) paragraphs four, 16, and 41 of plaintiff's statement of facts and the corresponding paragraphs in plaintiff's affidavit (paragraphs five, 15, and 37). See (Docket Entry # 136, pp. 2, 5, 11, 4, 16, 41). In evaluating plaintiff's summary judgment motion (Docket Entry # 120), this court in its discretion declined to strike those facts from the record on the basis that they are immaterial.Defendant's motion also seeks to strike the first sentence of the first paragraph in plaintiff's statement of facts (along with the corresponding first sentence of the second paragraph in plaintiff's affidavit). (Docket Entry # 137). In defendant's response to plaintiff's statement of facts, however, he challenges the second sentence of the first paragraph in plaintiff's statement of facts (and the second paragraph in plaintiff's affidavit) on the basis that "there is no support in the record to support such statement and the sentence states a legal conclusion." (Docket Entry # 136, p. 2, 1). Based on a review of defendant's motion to strike (Docket Entry # 137) and his response to plaintiff's statement of facts (Docket Entry # 136), it appears that the correct sentence defendant seeks to strike is the second sentence of the first paragraph in plaintiff's statement of facts (and the second paragraph in plaintiff's affidavit). Because this court did not rely on that sentence in adjudicating plaintiff's summary judgment motion, defendant's request to strike that sentence is moot.Similarly, with respect to the remaining portions of plaintiff's affidavit and statement of facts that defendant challenges, defendant's motion to strike is moot because this court did not rely on those portions of the record. (Belpedio, Lisa)
April 26, 2022 Filing 208 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part #115 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying #120 Motion for Summary Judgment (Belpedio, Lisa)
April 26, 2022 Filing 207 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part #36 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and to Stay Discovery filed by Erik Grunigen. (Belpedio, Lisa)
April 25, 2022 Filing 206 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered granting #194 Motion for Leave to File Corrected Pleadings ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Belpedio, Lisa)
March 4, 2022 Filing 205 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #203 Motion for Leave to File Document. See L.R. 7.1(b)(3). Defendant Erik V. Grunigen's request for fees and costs to oppose the motion (Docket Entry # 204) is DENIED. (Bowler, Marianne)
March 4, 2022 Filing 204 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #203 MOTION for Leave to File Reply To Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Corrected Summary Judgment Pleadings filed by Erik Grunigen. (Roos, Sigmund)
March 2, 2022 Filing 203 MOTION for Leave to File Reply To Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Corrected Summary Judgment Pleadings by Richard Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Memorandum)(Straus, Lindsey)
February 17, 2022 Filing 202 Opposition re #198 MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Summary Judgment Pleadings filed by Erik Grunigen. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Sigmund Roos in Support)(Roos, Sigmund)
February 14, 2022 Filing 201 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #184 MOTION to Strike #147 Response to Motion, #148 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion , #194 MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Summary Judgment Pleadings filed by Richard Taylor. (Straus, Lindsey)
February 14, 2022 Filing 200 AFFIDAVIT of Richard P. Taylor in Opposition re #182 MOTION to Strike #147 Response to Motion, #148 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion , #198 MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Summary Judgment Pleadings filed by Richard Taylor. (Straus, Lindsey)
February 14, 2022 Filing 199 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #182 MOTION to Strike #147 Response to Motion, #148 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Richard Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Straus, Lindsey)
February 14, 2022 Filing 198 MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Summary Judgment Pleadings by Richard Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Straus, Lindsey)
February 14, 2022 Filing 197 MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Summary Judgment Pleadings by Richard Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Straus, Lindsey)
February 14, 2022 Filing 196 MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Summary Judgment Pleadings by Richard Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Straus, Lindsey)
February 14, 2022 Filing 195 MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Summary Judgment Pleadings by Richard Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Straus, Lindsey)
February 14, 2022 Filing 194 MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Summary Judgment Pleadings by Richard Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Straus, Lindsey)
February 11, 2022 Filing 193 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. With briefing complete on the pending summary judgment motions (Docket Entry # 115, 120), including the expiration of the time to file a reply brief to defendant Erik Grunigens opposition (Docket Entry # 135), see L.R. 56.1, THERE SHALL BE NO FURTHER BRIEFING ON EITHER MOTION (Docket Entry # 115, 120). Briefing is also complete on: (1) a motion to strike (Docket Entry # 137) inasmuch as plaintiff Richard Taylor filed an opposition (Docket Entry # 176); and (2) a motion for leave to file a second amended complaint (Docket Entry # 178) inasmuch as defendant Erik Grunigen filed an opposition (Docket Entry # 180). Here again, there shall be no further briefing on either motion (Docket Entry # 137, 178).(Belpedio, Lisa)
February 7, 2022 Filing 192 REPLY to Response to #115 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Erik Grunigen. (Roos, Sigmund)
February 2, 2022 Filing 191 EXHIBIT re #118 Affidavit in Support of Motion Exhibit C, As Redacted by Erik Grunigen. (Roos, Sigmund)
February 2, 2022 Filing 190 EXHIBIT re #118 Affidavit in Support of Motion Exhibit B, as Redacted by Erik Grunigen. (Roos, Sigmund)
February 2, 2022 Filing 189 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part #138 Motion to Seal Document #138 MOTION to Seal Document. (Belpedio, Lisa)
February 2, 2022 Filing 188 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered STRIKING #185 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion filed by Richard Taylor. On January 28, 2021, plaintiff Richard P. Taylor ("plaintiff") filed an opposition to a summary judgment motion (Docket Entry # 115) filed by defendant Erik V. Grunigen on November 23, 2021. (Docket Entry # 148). In conjunction with the filing, plaintiff filed, as the affiant, a 33-page affidavit. (Docket Entry # 149). Previously, plaintiff filed four motions to extend the time period to file the opposition (Docket Entry # 133, 141, 143, 145), which this court allowed (Docket Entry # 134, 142, 144, 146). In allowing the third extension, this court stated "[n]o further extensions to be granted," and, in allowing the fourth extension, this court emphasized "ABSOLUTELY NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS TO BE GRANTED IN THIS CASE." (Docket Entry # 144, 146). Four days after filing the opposition and the aforementioned affidavit, plaintiff unilaterally filed a "corrected" affidavit. (Docket Entry # 185). In violation of L.R. 7.1(b), plaintiff did not seek leave of court to file this untimely affidavit, see L.R. 7.1(b)(1) (affidavits "shall be filed with the motion"), which is an "additional paper[]" within the meaning of L.R. 7.1(b)(3). As such, the affidavit (Docket Entry # 185) is stricken from the record. See L.R. 1.3;Reyes-Perez v. State Ins. Fund Corp., 755 F.3d 49, 53 (1st Cir.2014) ("[d]istrict courts have broad latitude to enforce local rules").(Belpedio, Lisa)
February 2, 2022 Filing 187 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. This memorandum (Docket Entry #182 ) in support of a motion to strike (Docket Entry #184 ) is incorrectly identified on the docket as a motion to strike. As such, it is corrected and restyled as a supporting memorandum linked to the pending motion to strike (Docket Entry #184 ). (Belpedio, Lisa)
February 2, 2022 Filing 186 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. This memorandum (Docket Entry #121 ) in support of a motion for summary judgment (Docket Entry #120 ) is incorrectly identified on the docket as a motion for summary judgment. As such, it is corrected and restyled as a supporting memorandum linked to the pending motion for summary judgment (Docket Entry # {120}). (Belpedio, Lisa)
February 1, 2022 Filing 185 AFFIDAVIT of Richard P. Taylor (Corrected) in Opposition re #115 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Straus, Lindsey)
January 31, 2022 Filing 184 MOTION to Strike #147 Response to Motion, #148 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion by Erik Grunigen.(Roos, Sigmund)
January 31, 2022 Filing 183 MEMORANDUM in Support re #182 MOTION to Strike #147 Response to Motion, #148 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Erik Grunigen. (Roos, Sigmund)
January 31, 2022 Filing 182 MOTION to Strike #147 Response to Motion, #148 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion by Erik Grunigen.(Roos, Sigmund)
January 31, 2022 Filing 181 AFFIDAVIT of Richard Taylor in Opposition re #115 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Straus, Lindsey)
January 31, 2022 Filing 180 Opposition re #178 Second MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Erik Grunigen. (Roos, Sigmund)
January 28, 2022 Filing 179 MEMORANDUM in Support re #178 Second MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Richard Taylor. (Straus, Lindsey)
January 28, 2022 Filing 178 Second MOTION to Amend Complaint by Richard Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Exhibit)(Straus, Lindsey)
January 28, 2022 Filing 177 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #138 MOTION to Seal Document filed by Richard Taylor. (Straus, Lindsey)
January 28, 2022 Filing 176 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #137 MOTION to Strike #130 Exhibit Affidavit of Richard P. Taylor filed by Richard Taylor. (Straus, Lindsey)
January 28, 2022 Filing 175 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #115 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Straus, Lindsey)
January 28, 2022 Filing 174 AFFIDAVIT of Sarah Robeson in Opposition re #115 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Straus, Lindsey)
January 28, 2022 Filing 173 AFFIDAVIT of Sarah Robeson in Opposition re #115 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Straus, Lindsey)
January 28, 2022 Filing 172 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #115 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Straus, Lindsey)
January 28, 2022 Filing 171 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #115 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Taylor. (Straus, Lindsey)
January 28, 2022 Filing 170 AFFIDAVIT of Terence Orton in Opposition re #115 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Taylor. (Straus, Lindsey)
January 28, 2022 Filing 169 AFFIDAVIT of Ronald Tesmer in Opposition re #115 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Taylor. (Straus, Lindsey)
January 28, 2022 Filing 168 AFFIDAVIT of Ronald Tesmer in Opposition re #115 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Taylor. (Straus, Lindsey)
January 28, 2022 Filing 167 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #115 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Straus, Lindsey)
January 28, 2022 Filing 166 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #115 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Taylor. (Straus, Lindsey)
January 28, 2022 Filing 165 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #120 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Taylor. (Straus, Lindsey)
January 28, 2022 Filing 164 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #115 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Affidavit)(Straus, Lindsey)
January 28, 2022 Filing 163 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #115 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Straus, Lindsey)
January 28, 2022 Filing 162 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #115 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Taylor. (Straus, Lindsey)
January 28, 2022 Filing 161 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #115 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Taylor. (Straus, Lindsey)
January 28, 2022 Filing 160 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #115 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Straus, Lindsey)
January 28, 2022 Filing 159 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #115 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Straus, Lindsey)
January 28, 2022 Filing 158 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #115 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Taylor. (Straus, Lindsey)
January 28, 2022 Filing 157 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #120 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Taylor. (Straus, Lindsey)
January 28, 2022 Filing 156 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #115 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Taylor. (Straus, Lindsey)
January 28, 2022 Filing 155 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #120 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Taylor. (Straus, Lindsey)
January 28, 2022 Filing 154 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #115 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Straus, Lindsey)
January 28, 2022 Filing 153 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #120 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Taylor. (Straus, Lindsey)
January 28, 2022 Filing 152 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #120 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Taylor. (Straus, Lindsey)
January 28, 2022 Filing 151 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #115 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Taylor. (Straus, Lindsey)
January 28, 2022 Filing 150 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #115 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Straus, Lindsey)
January 28, 2022 Filing 149 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #115 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Straus, Lindsey)
January 28, 2022 Filing 148 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #115 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Taylor. (Straus, Lindsey)
January 28, 2022 Filing 147 RESPONSE to Motion re #115 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Taylor. (Straus, Lindsey)
January 14, 2022 Filing 146 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #145 Motion for Extension of Time. ABSOLUTELY NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS TO BE GRANTED IN THIS CASE. (Bowler, Marianne)
January 13, 2022 Filing 145 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 01/28/2022 to File Oppositions to Pending Motions for Summary Judgment, To Strike, and To Seal by Richard Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Straus, Lindsey)
January 7, 2022 Filing 144 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #143 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. No further extensions to be granted. (Bowler, Marianne)
January 6, 2022 Filing 143 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 01/14/2022 to File Response/Reply as to 142 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, 140 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, #137 MOTION to Strike #130 Exhibit Affidavit of Richard P. Taylor, #115 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #138 MOTION to Seal Document by Richard Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Straus, Lindsey)
December 29, 2021 Filing 142 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #141 Motion for Extension of Time. (Bowler, Marianne)
December 28, 2021 Filing 141 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 01/07/2022 to File Plaintiff and Defendant-in-Counterclaim's Opposition to Defendant and Plaintiff-in-Counterclaim's Motion for Summary Judgment by Richard Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Straus, Lindsey)
December 25, 2021 Filing 140 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #139 Motion for Extension of Time. (Bowler, Marianne)
December 24, 2021 Filing 139 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 01/07/2022 to File Oppositions to Defendant's Motion to Strike and To Seal by Richard Taylor.(Straus, Lindsey)
December 14, 2021 Filing 138 MOTION to Seal and Declaration of Counsel by Erik Grunigen.(Belpedio, Lisa)
December 13, 2021 Filing 137 MOTION to Strike #130 Exhibit Affidavit of Richard P. Taylor by Erik Grunigen. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(Roos, Sigmund)
December 13, 2021 Filing 136 RESPONSE to Motion re #120 MOTION for Summary Judgment Statement of Material Facts filed by Erik Grunigen. (Roos, Sigmund)
December 13, 2021 Filing 135 Opposition re #120 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Erik Grunigen. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Second Affidavit of Erik Grunigen)(Roos, Sigmund)
December 7, 2021 Filing 134 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #133 Motion for Extension of Time. (Bowler, Marianne)
December 6, 2021 Filing 133 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 12/31/2021 to File Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by Richard Taylor.(Straus, Lindsey)
November 25, 2021 Filing 132 EXHIBIT re #123 Affidavit in Support of Motion, for Partial Summary Judgment by Richard Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Straus, Lindsey)
November 25, 2021 Filing 131 EXHIBIT re #123 Affidavit in Support of Motion, for Partial Summary Judgment by Richard Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Straus, Lindsey)
November 25, 2021 Filing 130 EXHIBIT re #122 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Richard Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Straus, Lindsey)
November 24, 2021 Filing 129 EXHIBIT re #127 Exhibit by Richard Taylor. (Straus, Lindsey)
November 24, 2021 Filing 128 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Richard Taylor to #120 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Straus, Lindsey)
November 24, 2021 Filing 127 EXHIBIT re #126 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Richard Taylor. (Straus, Lindsey)
November 24, 2021 Filing 126 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #120 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(Straus, Lindsey)
November 24, 2021 Filing 125 EXHIBIT re #124 Exhibit by Richard Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Straus, Lindsey)
November 24, 2021 Filing 124 EXHIBIT re #123 Affidavit in Support of Motion, by Richard Taylor. (Straus, Lindsey)
November 24, 2021 Filing 123 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #121 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(Straus, Lindsey)
November 24, 2021 Filing 122 AFFIDAVIT of Plaintiff in Support re #121 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Supplement, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Straus, Lindsey)
November 24, 2021 Filing 121 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Richard Taylor.(Straus, Lindsey)
November 24, 2021 Filing 120 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Richard Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Undisputed Facts)(Straus, Lindsey)
November 23, 2021 Filing 119 AFFIDAVIT of Erik V. Grunigen in Support re #115 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Erik Grunigen. (Currie, Haley)
November 23, 2021 Filing 118 AFFIDAVIT of Sigmund J. Roos in Support re #115 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Erik Grunigen. (Currie, Haley)
November 23, 2021 Filing 117 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re #115 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Erik Grunigen. (Currie, Haley)
November 23, 2021 Filing 116 MEMORANDUM in Support re #115 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Erik Grunigen. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Exhibits A-C)(Currie, Haley)
November 23, 2021 Filing 115 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Erik Grunigen.(Currie, Haley)
October 14, 2021 Filing 114 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #113 Motion for Extension of Time. No further extensions to be granted. (Bowler, Marianne)
October 13, 2021 Filing 113 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 11/5/21 and 11/24/21 to Complete expert discovery and file motions for summary judgment by Richard Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Straus, Lindsey)
September 8, 2021 Filing 112 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Motion Hearing held on 9/8/2021 re #102 MOTION to Compel filed by Erik Grunigen. Case called, counsel appear by telephone, counsel argue motion, motion ruled on for reasons as stated on the record, electronic order to issue. Summary Judgment motion deadline extended for 30 days. (Court Reporter: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Straus, Roos) (Belpedio, Lisa)
September 8, 2021 Filing 111 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part #102 Motion to Compel after hearing. The motion is ALLOWED to the extent that the information sought shall be produced for the time period between 2014 and the filing of the lawsuit in 2019. That portion of the motion seeking attorney's fees and costs is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to be be renewed at the end of the case. (Bowler, Marianne)
August 25, 2021 Filing 110 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #102 MOTION to Compel : Motion Hearing set for 9/8/2021 11:00 AM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. COUNSEL ARE DIRECTED TO APPEAR BY PHONE by calling 888-675-2535 approximately five minutes prior to the conference, using Access Code 6641794. If, for some reason, the call is disconnected, dial back in. NOTE that yours may not be the first case called, but please remain on the line until it is.(Belpedio, Lisa)
August 25, 2021 Filing 109 REPLY to Response to #102 MOTION to Compel filed by Erik Grunigen. (Roos, Sigmund)
August 25, 2021 Filing 108 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #107 Motion for Leave to File Document. Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Bowler, Marianne)
August 24, 2021 Filing 107 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Opposition by Erik Grunigen.(Roos, Sigmund)
August 23, 2021 Filing 106 Opposition re #102 MOTION to Compel filed by Richard Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Affidavit)(Straus, Lindsey)
August 16, 2021 Filing 105 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #103 Motion for Leave to File Document. Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Bowler, Marianne)
August 13, 2021 Filing 104 MEMORANDUM in Support re #102 MOTION to Compel filed by Erik Grunigen. (Roos, Sigmund)
August 13, 2021 Filing 103 MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum Under Seal by Erik Grunigen.(Roos, Sigmund) Modified on 8/16/2021 (Belpedio, Lisa).
August 13, 2021 Filing 102 MOTION to Compel by Erik Grunigen.(Roos, Sigmund)
July 15, 2021 Filing 101 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #100 Motion to Continue. No further extensions to be granted. (Bowler, Marianne)
July 14, 2021 Filing 100 Joint MOTION to Continue Deadline for Expert Witness Depositions to 08/20/2021 by Richard Taylor.(Straus, Lindsey)
May 28, 2021 Filing 98 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re: Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and to Stay Discovery by Erik Grunigen. (Docket Entry #36 ).As stated in open court on May 27, 2021, defendant Erik V. Grunigen's two-part motion seeking both a judgment on the pleadings and a stay of discovery (Docket Entry #36 ) is DENIED as to the request to stay discovery. The motion for judgment on the pleadings remains pending before this court. Defendant Erik V. Grunigen ("defendant") seeks a stay of discovery pending "further order of this Court" and a resolution of the motion for judgment on the pleadings. (Docket Entry #36 , ¶¶ 6-7). By way of explanation, this court "has broad discretion to stay discovery pending resolution of a motion to dismiss." Dicenzo v. Mass. Dept of Corr., Case No. 3:15-cv-30152-MGM, 2016 WL 158505, at *1 (D. Mass. Jan. 13, 2016). Nevertheless, "stays cannot be cavalierly dispensed: there must be good cause for their issuance; they must be reasonable in duration; and the court must ensure that competing equities are weighed and balanced." Marquis v. Fed. Deposit Ins. Corp., 965 F.2d 1148, 1155 (1st Cir. 1992); accord Hillside Plastics, Inc. v. Dominion & Grimm U.S.A., Inc., Civil Action No. 3:17-cv-30037-MAP, 2018 WL 3727365, at *2 (D. Mass. Aug. 6, 2018) (quoting Marquis, 965 F.2d at 1155). Here, plaintiff Richard P. Taylor more than adequately refutes any good cause by explaining in an affidavit that a stay will unnecessarily delay resolution of claims in the first amended complaint seeking production of corporate records and corporate tax filings, which he needs to file correct tax returns and avoid exposure to penalties and interest. (Docket Entry # 40-1) (Docket Entry #28 , pp. 42-43, 45-46, 52, ¶¶ 156-160, 173-180). Defendant's argument to stay discovery to avoid "time consuming" and "expensive" deposition practice (Docket Entry #36 , 7) is insufficient to justify a stay of discovery. See also Lugo v. Alvarado, 819 F.2d 5, 7 (1st Cir. 1987) (affirming lower court's denial of motion to stay discovery pending resolution of qualified immunity and noting movant's "acquiescence to the discovery schedule established by the district court"). (Patton, Christine)
May 24, 2021 Filing 97 REPORT of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider: Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal reports that this case did not settle. This case should be restored to your trial list. Should the parties wish to resume mediation efforts in the future, they should contact the Deputy Clerk, Steve York. (York, Steve)
May 11, 2021 Filing 95 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING. Considering 5/24/2021 ADR Hearing, 5/12/2021 Status Conference, should it be needed, reset for 5/27/2021 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. ALL COUNSEL ARE DIRECTED TO APPEAR BY PHONE by calling 888-675-2535 approximately five minutes prior to the conference, using Access Code 6641794. If, for some reason, the call is disconnected, dial back in. NOTE that yours may not be the first case called, but please remain on the line until it is. (Putnam, Harold)
May 10, 2021 Filing 94 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing.This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible. Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing set for 5/24/2021 10:00 AM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Belpedio, Lisa)
April 23, 2021 Filing 91 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING. Should it be needed, Status Conference reset for 5/12/2021 02:15 PM before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. ALL COUNSEL ARE DIRECTED TO APPEAR BY PHONE by calling 888-675-2535 approximately five minutes prior to the conference, using Access Code 6641794. If, for some reason, the call is disconnected, dial back in. NOTE that yours may not be the first case called, but please remain on the line until it is.(Putnam, Harold)
April 20, 2021 Filing 90 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. A Further Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing is set for May 10, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. by Remote Proceeding at Boston before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. The parties shall submit a status report by May 5, 2021. (York, Steve)
April 20, 2021 Filing 89 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: Status Conference held on 4/20/2021. The Court held a status conference with counsel regarding continued mediation of this case. The Court will schedule a further session for May 10, 2021 at 10:00 a.m.. The parties shall submit a status report by May 5, 2021. (Court Reporter: No Court Reporter Used.)(Attorneys present: Straus for plaintiff; Roos for defendant;) (York, Steve)
April 13, 2021 Filing 88 Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ORDER entered granting #87 Motion for Order to order transcript. Because the requested transcript pertains to a mediation hearing, the transcript should be sealed and only made available to the parties. (York, Steve)
April 12, 2021 Filing 87 MOTION for Order to order transcript by Erik Grunigen.(Roos, Sigmund)
April 9, 2021 Filing 86 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Count VIII of First Amended Complaint by Richard Taylor. (Straus, Lindsey)
March 31, 2021 Filing 85 Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The parties have reported continued progress towards settlement. They shall submit a further status report no later than April 16, 2021. If they have not resolved the remaining issues by then, counsel only shall participate in a status conference on Tuesday April 20 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. The clerk will provide the relative information for this hearing to all parties at the email registered in CM/ECF, prior to the upcoming conference. (York, Steve)
March 29, 2021 Filing 84 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING. Status Conference reset for 4/28/2021 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. ALL COUNSEL ARE DIRECTED TO APPEAR BY PHONE by calling 888-675-2535 approximately five minutes prior to the conference, using Access Code 6641794. If, for some reason, the call is disconnected, dial back in. NOTE that yours may not be the first case called, but please remain on the line until it is.(Putnam, Harold)
March 27, 2021 Filing 83 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #82 Motion to Continue. The status conference is continued until April 28, 2021 at 2:00 PM. (Bowler, Marianne)
March 26, 2021 Filing 82 Joint MOTION to Continue Status Conference to 04/20/2021 by Richard Taylor.(Straus, Lindsey)
March 17, 2021 Filing 81 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING Status Conference reset for 3/30/2021 02:15 PM before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. ALL COUNSEL ARE DIRECTED TO APPEAR BY PHONE by calling 888-675-2535 approximately five minutes prior to the conference, using Access Code 6641794. If, for some reason, the call is disconnected, dial back in. NOTE that yours may not be the first case called, but please remain on the line until it is.(Putnam, Harold)
March 17, 2021 Filing 80 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #79 Motion to Continue. The status conference is continued until March 30, 20121 at 2:15 PM. (Bowler, Marianne)
March 16, 2021 Filing 79 Joint MOTION to Continue Status Conference to 04/08/2021 by Richard Taylor.(Straus, Lindsey)
March 12, 2021 Filing 78 Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ELECTRONIC ORDER ENTERED. The parties have reported that they have continued to make progress on their settlement efforts. The parties shall submit a further status report no later than March 26, 2021. (York, Steve)
February 16, 2021 Filing 77 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING Status Conference set for 3/18/2021 02:15 PM before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. ALL COUNSEL ARE DIRECTED TO APPEAR BY PHONE by calling 888-675-2535 approximately five minutes prior to the conference, using Access Code 6641794. If, for some reason, the call is disconnected, dial back in. NOTE that yours may not be the first case called, but please remain on the line until it is.(Putnam, Harold)
February 16, 2021 Filing 76 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #75 Motion to Continue. The status conference is continued until March 18, 2021 at 2:15 PM. (Bowler, Marianne)
February 15, 2021 Filing 75 Joint MOTION to Continue Status Conference to 03/13/2021 by Richard Taylor.(Straus, Lindsey)
February 11, 2021 Filing 74 REPORT of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider: Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal reports this case did not settle but progress was made. The parties shall file a Status Report by March 12, 2021 detailing what progress was made on the outstanding issues. (York, Steve)
January 14, 2021 Filing 72 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING. The Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing is rescheduled to February 11, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. Boston before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. The Mediation Hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible. It shall be understood (a) that all parties and counsel will participate in this court-sponsored mediation in good faith and with the interest of settling the matter on mutually acceptable terms, (b) that the entire mediation process, including all communications during any in-person, video or audio part thereof, is confidential, (c) that all statements made during the course of mediation are privileged settlement discussions, made without prejudice to any party's legal position, and inadmissible for any purpose in any legal proceeding, (d) that no party, participant, or representative shall seek in any proceeding to hereafter compel the mediator to testify and/or produce any document with respect to the mediation, and (e) that all parties, counsel and other participants agree that, by participating in this court-sponsored mediation, they are bound by these conditions and shall keep confidential all communications exchanged during the mediation process.(York, Steve)
January 12, 2021 Filing 71 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING. Status Conference reset for 2/17/2021 02:15 PM before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. ALL COUNSEL ARE DIRECTED TO APPEAR BY PHONE by calling 888-675-2535 approximately five minutes prior to the conference, using Access Code 6641794. If, for some reason, the call is disconnected, dial back in. NOTE that yours may not be the first case called, but please remain on the line until it is.(Putnam, Harold)
January 12, 2021 Filing 70 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #69 Motion to Continue. The court will conduct a status conference on February 17, 2021 at 2:15 PM. (Bowler, Marianne)
January 11, 2021 Filing 69 Joint MOTION to Continue Status Conference to after February 12, 2021 by Erik Grunigen.(Roos, Sigmund)
January 11, 2021 Filing 68 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. A further Alternative Dispute Resolution is Hearing set for February 12, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. by Remote Proceeding at Boston before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. A status report is due by February 10, 2021. The Mediation Hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible. (York, Steve)
January 11, 2021 Filing 67 REPORT of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider. Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal reports this case did not settle but progress was made. A further session to be scheduled for February 12, 2021. The parties shall file a status report by February 10, 2021. (York, Steve)
December 18, 2020 Filing 65 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. A further Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing is set for January 11, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. by Remote Proceeding at Boston before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. A status report shall be submitted by January 7, 2021. The Mediation Hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible. (York, Steve)
December 18, 2020 Filing 64 REPORT of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider: Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal reports this case did not settle but progress was made. A further session to be scheduled for January 11, 2021 at 10:30 a.m.. The parties shall submit a status report, by January 7, 2021. (York, Steve)
December 1, 2020 Filing 62 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING. Status Conference reset for 1/14/2021 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. ALL COUNSEL ARE DIRECTED TO APPEAR BY PHONE by calling 888-675-2535 approximately five minutes prior to the conference, using Access Code 6641794. If, for some reason, the call is disconnected, dial back in. NOTE that yours may not be the first case called, but please remain on the line until it is.(Putnam, Harold)
November 25, 2020 Filing 61 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #60 Motion for Modification. The court will conduct a status conference on January 14, 2020 at 2:00 PM if the case does not settle before that date. (Bowler, Marianne)
November 24, 2020 Filing 60 Joint MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order By Postponing Case Management Conference by Richard Taylor.(Straus, Lindsey)
November 20, 2020 Filing 59 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. A further Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing is set for December 18, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. by Remote Proceeding at Boston before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. The Mediation Hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible. It shall be understood (a) that all parties and counsel will participate in this court-sponsored mediation in good faith and with the interest of settling the matter on mutually acceptable terms, (b) that the entire mediation process, including all communications during any in-person, video or audio part thereof, is confidential, (c) that all statements made during the course of mediation are privileged settlement discussions, made without prejudice to any party's legal position, and inadmissible for any purpose in any legal proceeding, (d) that no party, participant, or representative shall seek in any proceeding to hereafter compel the mediator to testify and/or produce any document with respect to the mediation, and (e) that all parties, counsel and other participants agree that, by participating in this court-sponsored mediation, they are bound by these conditions and shall keep confidential all communications exchanged during the mediation process.(York, Steve)
November 20, 2020 Filing 58 REPORT of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider: Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal reports this case did not settle, progress was made and the matter has been suspended to allow attorney Sigmund Roos to evaluate if he will have a conflict moving forward with the mediation. A further session is scheduled for December 18, 2020 at 10:00 a.m.. (York, Steve)
November 17, 2020 Filing 56 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: Telephone Conference held on 11/17/2020. This hearing was held remotely by phone. The Court reviewed preliminary matters with the parties prior to the upcoming mediation. (Court Reporter: James Gibbons at jamesgibbonsrpr@gmail.com.) The transcript of this hearing will be kept sealed. To gain access to this transcript, the parties should first seek leave of the Court by filing a motion. (Attorneys present: Straus for plaintiff; Roos for defendant;) (York, Steve)
October 31, 2020 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #55 Motion for Modification. (Bowler, Marianne)
October 30, 2020 Filing 55 Assented to MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order by Richard Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Straus, Lindsey)
October 14, 2020 Filing 54 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Status Conference held on 10/14/2020. No discovery extensions at this time. Should mediation prove unsuccessful, discovery deadlines will be addressed at subsequent conference. (Status Conference set for 12/2/2020 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. ALL COUNSEL ARE DIRECTED TO APPEAR BY PHONE by calling 888-675-2535 approximately five minutes prior to the conference, using Access Code 6641794). (Court Reporter: Kathleen Silva at kathysilva@verizon.net.)(Attorneys present: Straus, Roos) (Putnam, Harold)
October 13, 2020 Filing 53 NOTICE Regarding 10/14/2020 Status Conference. ALL COUNSEL ARE DIRECTED TO APPEAR BY PHONE by calling 888-675-2535 approximately five minutes prior to the conference, using Access Code 6641794. If, for some reason, the call is disconnected, dial back in. NOTE that yours may not be the first case called, but please remain on the line until it is. (Putnam, Harold)
October 8, 2020 Filing 52 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING. The Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing has been rescheduled for November 20, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. by Remote Proceeding at Boston before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. Counsel and principals are directed to be present and have full settlement authority. Each party must submit a brief (no more than 5 pages) mediation memorandum that includes a discussion of (1) the merits of the case (both strengths and weaknesses); (2) damages or other relief sought by the parties; (3) the status of discovery; and (4) the status of the parties' settlement discussions. The memoranda should be submitted BY E-MAIL to (steve_york@mad.uscourts.gov no later than five (5) business days prior to the mediation and marked "Confidential - Not for Docketing." In the event that any party believes that the case is not ripe for mediation, or the date poses a serious conflict, counsel are to notify opposing counsel and call the deputy clerk at 617-748-9238 as soon as possible. Prior to the mediation, there will be a Telephone Conference set for November 17, 2020 at 11:30 a.m. by Remote Proceeding at Boston before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. The clerk will provide the call-in information for the phone conference to all parties by email, one day prior to the upcoming telephone conference. The Mediation Hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible. (York, Steve)
October 8, 2020 Filing 51 Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #50 Assented to Motion to Continue Alternate Dispute Resolution Hearing. (York, Steve)
October 6, 2020 Filing 50 Assented to MOTION to Continue Alternate Dispute Resolution Hearing to 11/13/2020 by Richard Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Straus, Lindsey)
September 30, 2020 Filing 49 Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #48 Motion to Continue Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing. The Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing is rescheduled October 30, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. by Remote Proceeding at Boston before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal.Counsel and principals are directed to be present and have full settlement authority. Each party must submit a brief (no more than 5 pages) mediation memorandum that includes a discussion of (1) the merits of the case (both strengths and weaknesses); (2) damages or other relief sought by the parties; (3) the status of discovery; and (4) the status of the parties' settlement discussions. The memoranda should be submitted BY E-MAIL to (steve_york@mad.uscourts.gov no later than five (5) business days prior to the mediation and marked "Confidential - Not for Docketing." In the event that any party believes that the case is not ripe for mediation, or the date poses a serious conflict, counsel are to notify opposing counsel and call the deputy clerk at 617-748-9238 as soon as possible. Prior to the mediation, there will be a Telephone Conference set for October 27, 2020 at 11:30 a.m. by Remote Proceeding at Boston before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. The clerk will provide the call-in information for the phone conference to all parties by email, one day prior to the upcoming telephone conference. The Mediation Hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible. (York, Steve)
September 28, 2020 Filing 48 MOTION to Continue Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing to 11/09/20 by Richard Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Straus, Lindsey)
September 27, 2020 Filing 47 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Defendant having indicated no intention to oppose the motion, ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #44 Motion for Modification of Scheduling Order. (Putnam, Harold)
September 23, 2020 Filing 44 MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order by Richard Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Motion to Modify Scheduling Order, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit)(Straus, Lindsey)
September 9, 2020 Filing 43 REPLY to Response to #36 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and to Stay Discovery filed by Erik Grunigen. (Roos, Sigmund)
September 3, 2020 Filing 42 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #41 Motion for Leave to File Document. Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Bowler, Marianne)
September 2, 2020 Filing 41 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief by Erik Grunigen. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum in Support)(Roos, Sigmund)
September 1, 2020 Filing 40 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #36 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and to Stay Discovery filed by Richard Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Straus, Lindsey)
August 19, 2020 Filing 39 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. The Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing is set for October 8, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. Counsel and principals are directed to be present and have full settlement authority. Each party must submit a brief (no more than 5 pages) mediation memorandum that includes a discussion of (1) the merits of the case (both strengths and weaknesses); (2) damages or other relief sought by the parties; (3) the status of discovery; and (4) the status of the parties' settlement discussions. The memoranda should be submitted BY E-MAIL to (steve_york@mad.uscourts.gov no later than five (5) business days prior to the mediation and marked "Confidential - Not for Docketing." In the event that any party believes that the case is not ripe for mediation, or the date poses a serious conflict, counsel are to notify opposing counsel and call the deputy clerk at 617-748-9238 as soon as possible. Prior to the mediation, there will be a Telephone Conference set for October 5, 2020 at 11:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. The clerk will provide the call-in information for the phone conference to all parties by email, one day prior to the upcoming telephone conference. The Mediation Hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible. (York, Steve)
August 19, 2020 Filing 38 Notice of assignment to ADR Provider. Judge Jennifer C. Boal appointed.(Belpedio, Lisa)
August 17, 2020 Filing 37 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #36 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and to Stay Discovery . (Roos, Sigmund)
August 17, 2020 Filing 36 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and to Stay Discovery by Erik Grunigen. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum in Support)(Roos, Sigmund)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution.(Putnam, Harold)
July 23, 2020 Filing 34 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Status Conference held on 7/23/2020. Court sets the following schedule: plaintiff to identify experts by 10/30/2020, defendant to identify experts by 11/30/2020, all expert discovery to be completed by 1/15/2021, dispositive motions to be filed by 2/15/2021. Plaintiff notes that it does not anticipate further amendments. Further date set. Matter to be referred to mediation. (Status Conference set for 10/14/2020 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler.). (Court Reporter: Kathleen Silva at kathysilva@verizon.net.)(Attorneys present: Straus, Roos) (Putnam, Harold)
July 22, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE Regarding 7/23/2020 Status Conference. ALL COUNSEL ARE DIRECTED TO APPEAR BY PHONE by calling 888-675-2535 approximately five minutes prior to the conference, using Access Code 6641794. If, for some reason, the call is disconnected, dial back in. NOTE that yours may not be the first case called, but please remain on the line until it is. (Putnam, Harold)
July 1, 2020 Filing 32 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ORDER entered. PROTECTIVE ORDER(Putnam, Harold)
July 1, 2020 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #31 Motion for Protective Order. (Bowler, Marianne)
June 30, 2020 Filing 31 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Richard Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Straus, Lindsey)
June 10, 2020 Filing 30 ANSWER to Counterclaim by Richard Taylor(Individually, as member of 1210 Fire Rock LLC, and as Partner of the Fire Rock Loop Partnership).(Straus, Lindsey)
May 28, 2020 Filing 29 Amended ANSWER to #28 Amended Complaint Affirmative Defenses, Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Richard Taylor by Erik Grunigen.(Roos, Sigmund)
May 19, 2020 Filing 28 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Erik Grunigen, filed by Richard Taylor.(Straus, Lindsey)
May 14, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE by Richard Taylor re Pending Action (Straus, Lindsey)
May 1, 2020 Filing 26 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Erik Grunigen against Richard Taylor, filed by Richard Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #37 Exhibit, #38 Exhibit, #39 Exhibit, #40 Exhibit, #41 Exhibit, #42 Exhibit, #43 Exhibit, #44 Exhibit, #45 Exhibit, #46 Exhibit, #47 Exhibit, #48 Exhibit, #49 Exhibit, #50 Exhibit)(Straus, Lindsey)
April 28, 2020 Filing 25 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Motion Hearing held on 4/28/2020 re #20 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Richard Taylor. Case called, Counsel appear by telephone, Counsel argue motion, Motion to be granted, Status Conference held on 4/28/2020, Counsel to discuss mediation with their client and file a joint motion if in agreement, Fact Discovery is extended to September 30, 2020, Further Status Conference set for 7/23/2020 02:30 PM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler (Court Reporter: Lee Marzilli at leemarz@aol.com.)(Attorneys present: Straus, Roos) (Belpedio, Lisa)
April 28, 2020 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #20 Motion for Leave to File Document after hearing. Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Bowler, Marianne)
April 17, 2020 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to #20 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Richard Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Affidavit)(Straus, Lindsey)
April 14, 2020 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #23 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Bowler, Marianne)
April 13, 2020 Filing 23 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Defendant's Memorandum In Opposition to Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Richard Taylor.(Straus, Lindsey)
April 8, 2020 Filing 22 Opposition re #20 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Erik Grunigen. (Roos, Sigmund)
March 31, 2020 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Support re #20 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Richard Taylor. (Straus, Lindsey)
March 31, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Richard Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #37 Exhibit, #38 Exhibit, #39 Exhibit, #40 Exhibit, #41 Exhibit, #42 Exhibit, #43 Exhibit, #44 Exhibit, #45 Exhibit, #46 Exhibit, #47 Exhibit, #48 Exhibit, #49 Exhibit)(Straus, Lindsey)
February 13, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to Counterclaim by Richard Taylor.(Straus, Lindsey)
February 3, 2020 Filing 18 Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by Erik Grunigen.(Roos, Sigmund)
January 24, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, , COUNTERCLAIM against Richard Taylor by Erik Grunigen.(Roos, Sigmund)
January 22, 2020 Filing 16 CONSENT by all parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Erik Grunigen, Richard Taylor. (Putnam, Harold)
January 22, 2020 Filing 15 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Scheduling Conference held on 1/22/2020. Parties file Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge (signed and initialed by clerk on behalf of plaintiff). Plaintiff anticipates fewer than ten depositions and anticipates one to two experts. Defendant anticipates one or two depositions and does not anticipate any experts. All amendments to pleadings to be filed by 3/31/2020, all fact discovery to be completed by 7/31/2020. (Status Conference set for 4/28/2020 02:00 PM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler.). (Court Reporter: Digital Recording.) To order a copy of this Digital Recording, please go to #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/Magistrate-Audio.htm . For a transcript of this proceeding, contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov.(Attorneys present: Straus (by phone), Roos) (Putnam, Harold)
January 21, 2020 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Notification forms indicating whether or not a party has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge have not been received in the Clerk's Office. The submission of the form is mandatory. Completed forms shall be filed promptly. Additional forms can be obtained on the Court's web page at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov. (Putnam, Harold)
January 21, 2020 Filing 13 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #12 Motion to appear by telephone. (Putnam, Harold)
January 21, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION Allow plaintiff's counsel to appear by telephone at status conference by Richard Taylor.(Straus, Lindsey)
January 16, 2020 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer and granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. (Bowler, Marianne)
January 15, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to 01/24/2020 to File Answer , MOTION for Extension of Time to 01/24/2020 to File Response/Reply ( Responses due by 1/29/2020) by Erik Grunigen.(Roos, Sigmund)
January 13, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Sigmund J. Roos on behalf of Erik Grunigen (Roos, Sigmund)
December 19, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Should settlement not be consummated by 1/10/2019 as indicated in #8 Withdrawal of Motion, Status Conference set for 1/22/2020 02:00 PM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Putnam, Harold)
December 17, 2019 Filing 8 Withdrawal of motion: #7 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Richard Taylor.. (Straus, Lindsey)
December 9, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Entry of Default by Richard Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Straus, Lindsey)
December 1, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Richard Taylor. Erik Grunigen served on 11/9/2019, answer due 12/2/2019. Acknowledgement filed by Richard Taylor. (Straus, Lindsey)
October 30, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Richard Taylor. Erik Grunigen served on 10/15/2009, answer due 11/5/2009. Acknowledgement filed by Richard Taylor. (Straus, Lindsey)
October 23, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed Erik Grunigen served on 10/11/2009, answer due 11/1/2009. (Straus, Lindsey)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Erik Grunigen. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Pacho, Arnold)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Erik V. Grunigen. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7876181 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Richard Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit)(Straus, Lindsey) Modified on 9/13/2019 (Pacho, Arnold). Modified on 9/13/2019 to correct docket text (Pacho, Arnold).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Grunigen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erik Grunigen
Represented By: Sigmund J. Roos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Taylor
Represented By: Lindsey M. Straus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Judge Jennifer C. Boal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?