Becotte v. United Technologies Corporation
Plaintiff: Elaine Becotte
Defendant: United Technologies Corporation and Walter Kidde Portable Equipment, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv11952
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Filing 25 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot #7 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
October 29, 2019 Filing 24 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing. The motion hearing set for 11/7/2019 at 2:00 PM is hereby canceled. The motion to dismiss is moot following the filing of the Second Amended Complaint #21 naming the correct defendant. Summons issued on 10/28/2019. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
October 28, 2019 Filing 23 Summons Issued as to Walter Kidde Portable Equipment, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Paine, Matthew)
October 28, 2019 Filing 22 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Docket Entry #20 Second Amended Complaint corrected because: The Second Amended Complaint Was Filed Under the Wrong Event in CM/ECF By Counsel Colucci. The Second Amended Complaint Was Refiled Under the Correct Event in CM/ECF. See Docket Entry #21 . (Paine, Matthew)
October 28, 2019 Filing 21 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Walter Kidde Portable Equipment, Inc., filed by Elaine Becotte.(Paine, Matthew)
October 25, 2019 Filing 20 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Elaine Becotte. second amended complaint. (Colucci, Dino)
October 22, 2019 Filing 19 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #13 First MOTION for Leave to File second amended complaint ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Paine, Matthew)
October 18, 2019 Filing 18 Opposition re #16 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply to Plaintiff's Limited Opposition to its Motion to Dismiss, #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by United Technologies Corporation. (Lantry, Jacob)
October 18, 2019 Filing 17 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #16 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Paine, Matthew)
October 18, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply to Plaintiff's Limited Opposition to its Motion to Dismiss by United Technologies Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Reply to Plaintiff's Limited Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss)(Lantry, Jacob)
October 9, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 First MOTION for Leave to File second amended complaint filed by Elaine Becotte. (Paine, Matthew)
October 4, 2019 Filing 14 First Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Elaine Becotte. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Colucci, Dino)
October 3, 2019 Filing 13 First MOTION for Leave to File second amended complaint by Elaine Becotte. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint )(Colucci, Dino) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/9/2019) (Paine, Matthew). Modified on 10/9/2019 (Paine, Matthew). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/9/2019: #2 Exhibit) (Paine, Matthew).
September 25, 2019 Filing 12 STATE COURT Record. (Lantry, Jacob)
September 24, 2019 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : Motion Hearing set for 11/7/2019 02:00 PM before Judge William G. Young. This hearing will be held at Boston College Law School, 885 Centre Street, East Wing, Room 115, Newton, MA. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
September 23, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Re-Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
September 20, 2019 Filing 9 Refusal to Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. . (Lantry, Jacob)
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by United Technologies Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Affidavit of Donna L Jenner, #2 Exhibit B: Letter from L. Scott to R. Allen)(Lantry, Jacob)
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by United Technologies Corporation.(Lantry, Jacob)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (Halley, Taylor)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet re #1 Notice of Removal, by United Technologies Corporation. (Lantry, Jacob)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United Technologies Corporation. (Lantry, Jacob)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob J. Lantry on behalf of United Technologies Corporation (Lantry, Jacob)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United Technologies Corporation ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7876919 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Complaint, #2 Exhibit B: Proof of Service, #3 Exhibit C: Letter from CT Corp, #4 Exhibit D: Notice to Clerk, #5 Exhibit E: Civil Action Cover Sheet)(Lantry, Jacob)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Becotte v. United Technologies Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Technologies Corporation
Represented By: Jacob J. Lantry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Kidde Portable Equipment, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine Becotte
Represented By: Dino M. Colucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?