GRAY et al v. HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORPORATION
Plaintiff: Linda Gray and KURT GRAY
Defendant: Howmedica Osteonics Corp
Case Number: 1:2019cv11956
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 10 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. MDL ORDERS 1-13, (Attachments: #1 Case Management Orders 1-5, #2 Protective Order, #3 ESI Order, #4 Fact Sheet Implementation Order, #5 Plaintiff Fact Sheet, #6 Defendant Fact Sheet, #7 Order Aiding Private Settlement)(Jones, Sherry)
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. (Jones, Sherry)
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: Pursuant to CTO Number: 50, MDL No. 2768 has been transferred from Maine and assigned civil action number: 19-11956. Maine case number: 19-00377. In Re: Striker Orthopaedics LFIT V40 Femoral Head Products Liability Litigation (Jones, Sherry)
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Maine; Case Number 2:19-cv-00377.
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 MDL CERTIFIED TRANSFER ORDER (tcs)
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (mlm)
August 16, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2064298.), filed by LINDA GRAY, KURT GRAY.(FITZGERALD, KEVIN)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER sent to MDL Panel. (bfa)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORPORATION. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORPORATION with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by LINDA GRAY, KURT GRAY. (Service of Process Deadline 11/13/2019) Fee due by 8/19/2019.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GRAY et al v. HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Gray
Represented By: Kevin M. Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KURT GRAY
Represented By: Kevin M. Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howmedica Osteonics Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?