Snell v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Joyce Snell
Defendant: Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv11966
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 6 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company's answer is due 11/22/2019, with no further extension permitted. As Defendant Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, Incs. (Long-Term Disability Plan) Answer is due (after extension) in this case on November 22, 2019, the court enters the following pretrial schedule:Any amendment to the pleadings must be made by January 24, 2020; defendant(s) must provide the proposed record for judicial review by December 20, 2019; Joyce Snell must notify defendant's counsel in writing by February 3, 2020, if she believes that the record is inaccurate or incomplete. Any disagreement regarding the record must be filed with the court by February 17, 2020, setting out additional material the parties expect to add to the record. Any request for an entitlement to discovery must also be filed by February 17, 2020. If no disagreements or requests are filed, motion for judgment on the record must be filed by defendant by March 2, 2020, with Snell's response due by March 30, 2020. If there is a disagreement, dispositive motions are due thirty days from the court's response to the February 17, 2020 filings - with opposition 21 days thereafter. The court expects the parties to adhere to these dates unless good cause arises dictating extension. SO ORDERED. (Zierk, Marsha)
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Lincoln National Corporation for Lincoln National Life Insurance Company.. (Pomeroy, Scott)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 11/22/2019 to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company.(Pomeroy, Scott)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Halley, Taylor)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Danieli, Chris)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lincoln National Life Insurance Company Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7879062 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Joyce Snell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Macedo, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snell v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Snell
Represented By: Jonathan T. Macedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?