Haglund v. Estee Lauder Companies, Inc.
Plaintiff: Erin Haglund
Defendant: Estee Lauder Companies, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv11970
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference by Erin Haglund. (Vieira, Leonardo)
November 12, 2019 Filing 22 Copy re 21 Order on Motion to Continue mailed to Marc D. Padellaro on 11/12/19. (Lima, Christine)
November 12, 2019 Filing 21 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #20 Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference set for 12/17/2019 10:45 AM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. (Lima, Christine)
November 8, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference by Erin Haglund.(Lima, Christine)
November 4, 2019 Filing 19 JOINT SUBMISSION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Estee Lauder Companies, Inc..(Shank, Jonathan)
November 4, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Estee Lauder Companies, Inc..(Shank, Jonathan)
October 16, 2019 Filing 17 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Marc D. Padellaro. (Vieira, Leonardo)
October 4, 2019 Filing 16 Copy re 15 Notice Cancelling Hearing, #14 Notice of Scheduling Conference mailed to Marc D. Padellaro on 10/4/19. (Lima, Christine)
October 4, 2019 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing. The Scheduling Conference previously set for 11/6/19 has been rescheduled to 11/13/19. (Lima, Christine)
October 4, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 11/13/2019 02:45 PM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. (Lima, Christine)
October 1, 2019 Filing 13 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Marc D. Padellaro. (Vieira, Leonardo)
September 30, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Estee Lauder Companies, Inc.. (McAllister, Jeffrey)
September 30, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Estee Lauder Companies, Inc..(McAllister, Jeffrey)
September 25, 2019 Filing 10 Copy re #8 Notice of Scheduling Conference, 9 Notice regarding mandatory use of ECF mailed to Marc D. Padellaro on 9/25/19. (Lima, Christine)
September 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE issued to Attorney Marc D. Padellaro regarding mandatory use of ECF in compliance with Local Rule 5.4. Failure to comply may result in the imposition of sanctions. (Lima, Christine)
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 11/6/2019 10:45 AM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. (Lima, Christine)
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Estee Lauder Companies, Inc. Answer due 10/1/2019. (Vieira, Leonardo)
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to October 1, 2019 to File Answer by Estee Lauder Companies, Inc..(McAllister, Jeffrey)
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey S. McAllister on behalf of Estee Lauder Companies, Inc. (McAllister, Jeffrey)
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 STATE COURT Record. (Shank, Jonathan)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail. (Vieira, Leonardo)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Estee Lauder Companies, Inc. ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7880624 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 category sheet)(Shank, Jonathan) (Attachment 4 replaced on 9/17/2019) to fix category selection (Vieira, Leonardo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haglund v. Estee Lauder Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estee Lauder Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan R. Shank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Haglund
Represented By: Marc D. Padellaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?