Knous v. Broadridge Financial Solutions, Inc.
Plaintiff: Scott Knous
Defendant: Broadridge Financial Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv11973
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 Filing 26 Response by Broadridge Financial Solutions, Inc. to #21 Statement of facts . (Blank, Shira)
February 14, 2020 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Support re #22 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Broadridge Financial Solutions, Inc.. (Blank, Shira)
February 14, 2020 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #22 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Broadridge Financial Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-H (Bookkedmarked))(Blank, Shira)
February 14, 2020 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #22 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Broadridge Financial Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2 (Bookmarked))(Blank, Shira)
February 14, 2020 Filing 22 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by Broadridge Financial Solutions, Inc..(Blank, Shira)
January 15, 2020 Filing 21 STATEMENT of facts . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Crede, Alan)
January 15, 2020 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Support re #19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Scott Knous. (Crede, Alan)
January 15, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Scott Knous.(Crede, Alan)
December 10, 2019 Filing 18 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: Status Conference held on 12/10/2019. Counsel state the status of the case. Discovery is complete. Counsel request the court set a summary judgment schedule. The court sets the following deadlines: Summary judgment Motions due by 1/15/2020. Responses due by 2/15/2020. Replies due by 3/15/2020. Sur-replies due by 3/31/2020. (Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com.) (Simeone, Maria)
December 9, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE; Counsel may appear at the status conference by phone by calling into the courts conference line at 888-675-2535, access code 9123576. (Simeone, Maria)
November 25, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Shira M. Blank (Blank, Shira)
October 21, 2019 Filing 15 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: Scheduling Conference held on 10/21/2019; Counsel state the status of the case. The plaintiffs position was eliminated, was handed a separation agreement and told his last day would be 5/24. Plaintiff disputes the termination date, and claims under the wage act it is the responsibility of the employer to pay the vacation time on that day and therefore entitled to treble and reasonable attorneys fees. The court hears counsel on the legal significance of Mass law regarding determining the proper termination date. The court goes over the proposed schedule. The court will set the fact discovery deadline for 12/4/19 and set a status conference for 12/10/19 at 2:15pm. Counsel may appear at that conference by telephone. ( Discovery to be completed by 12/4/2019), ( Status Conference set for 12/10/2019 02:15 PM in Courtroom 13 before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin.). (Court Reporter: Rachel Lopez at raeufp@gmail.com.) (Simeone, Maria)
October 15, 2019 Filing 14 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The parties' request, Doc. 13, to be permitted to attend the Rule 16 Conference by telephone is ALLOWED. The parties shall contact the Court at least five minutes prior to the scheduled time, by calling 1-888-675-2535, access code 9123576. re #13 Letter/request (non-motion) (Montes, Mariliz)
October 14, 2019 Filing 13 Letter/request (non-motion) from Shira M. Blank to The Honorable Leo T. Sorokin, Dated October 14, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Scheduling Order)(Blank, Shira)
October 2, 2019 Filing 12 STATE COURT Record Broadridge Financial Solutions, Inc. summons served on 8/29/2019, answer due 9/19/2019.. (Blank, Shira)
September 26, 2019 Filing 11 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Jeremy M. Brown. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Montes, Mariliz)
September 26, 2019 Filing 10 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Assented-To Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Shira M. Blank. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Montes, Mariliz)
September 25, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jeremy M. Brown Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7895196 by Broadridge Financial Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Certification of Jeremy M. Brown in Support of Motion)(Torkelsen, Elizabeth)
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Shira M. Blank Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7895157 by Broadridge Financial Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Certification of Shira M. Blank in Support of Motion)(Torkelsen, Elizabeth)
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. A Scheduling Conference has beeen set for 10/21/2019 02:15 PM in Courtroom 13 before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Attachments: #1 scheduling order sample, #2 standing order on summary judgment)(Simeone, Maria)
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Broadridge Financial Solutions, Inc.. (Torkelsen, Elizabeth)
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Broadridge Financial Solutions, Inc..(Torkelsen, Elizabeth)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth S. Torkelsen on behalf of Broadridge Financial Solutions, Inc. (Torkelsen, Elizabeth)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail.(Burgos, Sandra)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Broadridge Financial Solutions, Inc. ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7881595 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint, #3 Exhibit C- Civil Action Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit D- Case Details, #5 Exhibit E - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Torkelsen, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knous v. Broadridge Financial Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Knous
Represented By: Alan H. Crede
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broadridge Financial Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth S. Torkelsen
Represented By: Shira M. Blank
Represented By: Jeremy M. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?