Pryce v. Souza
Petitioner: Matthew Lloyd Pryce
Respondent: Steve Souza, Thomas M. Hodgson and Marcos Charles
Case Number: 1:2019cv11978
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Referring Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 20 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice and Without Costs by Marcos Charles, Steve Souza. (Farquhar, Rayford)
October 22, 2019 Filing 19 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to October 25, 2019 to Answer/Respond to the habeas petition (For Defendant Steve Souza) by Matthew Lloyd Pryce (Hourihan, Lisa)
October 21, 2019 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge Denise J. Casper added. Chief Judge Patti B. Saris no longer assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
October 21, 2019 Filing 17 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Pursuant to L.R. 40.1(g)(1) and (4), I find that this case is not related and therefore was erroneously assigned to me. The case is returned to the Clerk for random reassignment. (Lara, Miguel)
October 18, 2019 Filing 16 Letter/request (non-motion) from Petitioner /Petitioner's Letter to the Court Requesting Clarification Regarding Motion for Order to Show Cause #9 . (Malkiel, Yakov)
October 18, 2019 Filing 15 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to October 25, 2019 to Answer/Respond to the habeas petition (For Defendant Steve Souza) by Matthew Lloyd Pryce.(Malkiel, Yakov)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 General Order 19-02, dated June 1, 2019 regarding Public Access to Immigration Cases Restricted by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(c). (Lara, Miguel)
October 16, 2019 Filing 13 Answer deadline reset as to Steve Souza 10/18/2019. (Lara, Miguel)
October 15, 2019 Filing 12 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Lara, Miguel)
October 8, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to 10/18/19 to File Response/Reply by Steve Souza.(Farquhar, Rayford)
October 7, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION for Order to Show Cause as to Why this Case is Related to C.A. Nos. 18-10475 and 19-11314 filed by Steve Souza. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Farquhar, Rayford)
October 7, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Order to Show Cause as to Why this Case is Related to C.A. Nos. 18-10475 and 19-11314 by Steve Souza.(Farquhar, Rayford)
September 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Rayford A. Farquhar on behalf of Steve Souza (Farquhar, Rayford)
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra I. Gliga on behalf of Matthew Lloyd Pryce (Gliga, Alexandra)
September 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Yakov Malkiel on behalf of Matthew Lloyd Pryce (Malkiel, Yakov)
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. SERVICE ORDER re 2241 Petition. Superintendent Souza shall be the sole respondent. The other respondents shall be dismissed as parties to this action. The Clerk of this Court shall serve a copy of the Petition upon Superintendent Souza and the United States Attorney for the District of Massachusetts. Respondent shall, no later Wednesday, October 9, 2019, file a motion for the grant or denial of the petition and a memorandum in support thereof. To give the Court time to consider the matter, unless otherwise ordered by the Court, Petitioner shall not be moved outside the District of Massachusetts without providing the Court 48 hours' advance notice of the move and the reason therefor. (PSSA, 3)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), / Affidavit of Melanie Chaput, Esq. with Regard to Matthew Lloyd Pryce. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Malkiel, Yakov)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Matthew Lloyd Pryce in Support re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241),. (Malkiel, Yakov)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) / Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number 0101-7883115 Fee status: Filing Fee paid., filed by Matthew Lloyd Pryce. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Malkiel, Yakov)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pryce v. Souza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Steve Souza
Represented By: Rayford A. Farquhar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Thomas M. Hodgson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Marcos Charles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Matthew Lloyd Pryce
Represented By: Alexandra I. Gliga
Represented By: Yakov Malkiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?