Rodriguez Rosa v. Spaulding
Petitioner: Heriberto Rodriguez Rosa
Respondent: Stephen Spaulding
Case Number: 1:2019cv11984
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
Presiding Judge: Marianne B Bowler
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. (Bowler, Marianne)
October 22, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT by Stephen Spaulding to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Stephen Spaulding. (Putnam, Harold)
October 22, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to November 19, 2019 to File Response/Reply as to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) by Stephen Spaulding.(Weida, Jason)
October 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason C. Weida on behalf of Stephen Spaulding (Weida, Jason)
October 11, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Heriberto Rodriguez Rosa ONLY. (Putnam, Harold)
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ORDER entered. SERVICE ORDER re 2241 Petition. The Clerk shall serve a copy of the petition upon (i) FMC Devens Warden Stephen Spaulding; and (ii) the United States Attorney for the District of Massachusetts. The Respondent shall, no later than twenty-one days of the date of this order, file a motion to grant or deny the petition and a memorandum in a response to the petition. The Clerk shall provide the Petitioner, Respondent, and the United States Attorney for the District of Massachusetts with the form for Consent/Refusal of Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction and the instructions for that form.(PSSA, 3)
September 27, 2019 Filing 4 Filing fee/payment: $5.00, receipt number 1BST076555 for #3 Order, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) (Coppola, Katelyn)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ORDER entered. If petitioner wishes to proceed with this action, no later than Thursday, October 10, 2019, he must either (1) pay the $5.00 filing fee; or (2) file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by a certified prison account statement. Failure of petitioner to comply with this directive may result in the dismissal of this action without prejudice.(PSSA, 3)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Danieli, Chris)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), filed by Heriberto Rodriguez Rosa.(Castilla, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez Rosa v. Spaulding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Heriberto Rodriguez Rosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Stephen Spaulding
Represented By: Jason C. Weida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?