Hristozov et al v. Seafood Shanty Restaurant Management, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Grigor Hristozov and Karolina Hristova
Defendant: Seafood Shanty Restaurant Management, Inc., Denise Page and Frank J Pellegrino
Case Number: 1:2019cv11985
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 12/13/2019 02:15 PM in Courtroom 19 before Chief Judge Patti B. Saris. (Lara, Miguel)
October 11, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Seafood Shanty Restaurant Management, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Seafood Shanty Restaurant Management, Inc. for Seafood Shanty Restaurant Management, Inc... (Joyce, Austin)
October 11, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by John M. Collins on behalf of Denise Page, Frank J Pellegrino, Seafood Shanty Restaurant Management, Inc. (Collins, John)
October 11, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 Seafood Shanty Restaurant Mgmt., Inc.. (Joyce, Austin)
October 11, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 Frank J. Pellegrino. (Joyce, Austin)
October 11, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 Denise Page. (Joyce, Austin)
October 10, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by Denise Page, Frank J Pellegrino, Seafood Shanty Restaurant Management, Inc..(Joyce, Austin)
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Austin M. Joyce on behalf of Denise Page, Frank J Pellegrino, Seafood Shanty Restaurant Management, Inc. (Joyce, Austin)
September 28, 2019 Filing 5 STATE COURT Record All Defendants.. (Gambaccini, Andrew)
September 27, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs, filed by Grigor Hristozov, Karolina Hristova. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Hammarlund, Erik)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email. (Lara, Miguel)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Danieli, Chris)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Seafood Shanty Restaurant Management, Inc., Frank J Pellegrino, and Denise Page - Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7885881 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Frank J Pellegrino, Seafood Shanty Restaurant Management, Inc., Denise Page. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Superior Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit Process in Superior Court, #3 Exhibit Superior Court Cover Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet United States District Court Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit United States District Court Case Category Form)(Gambaccini, Andrew) Modified on 9/19/2019 as case was incorrectly filed as a Complaint.(Lara, Miguel).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hristozov et al v. Seafood Shanty Restaurant Management, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seafood Shanty Restaurant Management, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew J. Gambaccini
Represented By: Austin M. Joyce
Represented By: John M. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Page
Represented By: Andrew J. Gambaccini
Represented By: Austin M. Joyce
Represented By: John M. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank J Pellegrino
Represented By: Andrew J. Gambaccini
Represented By: Austin M. Joyce
Represented By: John M. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grigor Hristozov
Represented By: Erik Hammarlund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karolina Hristova
Represented By: Erik Hammarlund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?