Fontaine v. Frito-Lay, Inc.
Plaintiff: Richard Fontaine
Defendant: Frito-Lay, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv11993
Filed: September 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Frito-Lay, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Hohler, Daniel)
November 5, 2019 Filing 9 USMS Service NOTICE (Hohler, Daniel)
November 5, 2019 Filing 8 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis "Plaintiffs renewed Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. 7) is ALLOWED. The Clerk shall issue summons. The plaintiff may elect to have service made by the United States Marshals Service. If directed by the plaintiff to do so, the United States Marshal shall serve the summons, amended complaint, and this Order upon the defendant, in the manner directed by the plaintiff, with all costs of service to be advanced by the United States. Notwithstanding Local Rule 4.1, the plaintiff shall have 90 days from the date of this Order to complete service. The plaintiff is responsible for providing the United States Marshals Service with all necessary papers for service." (PSSA 5)
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Richard Fontaine.(O'Brien, Mark)
October 9, 2019 Filing 6 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis "Plaintiff Richard Fontaine's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. 2) is DENIED without prejudice. Fontaine failed to file a complete and signed affidavit in support of the motion. Accordingly, it is FURTHER ORDERED that Fontaine shall by October 30, 2019 either pay the $400 filing fee, or file a renewed motion to proceed in forma pauperis along with a complete, and signed, affidavit in support. A copy of Form AO 240 is attached to this Electronic Order. Failure to comply with this Order will result in dismissal of this action." (PSSA, 5) (PSSA, 5).
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet by Richard Fontaine. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Category Form)(O'Brien, Mark)
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel shall complete and file in PDF format a Local Category Form and Civil Cover Sheet. The form can be found on the court's website under Resources/Forms. Counsel will use the event under Other Documents- Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet. (Currie, Haley)
September 24, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Richard Fontaine. Attachments: #1 IFP Financial Statement). Motion filed as a separate entry using the proper event.(Currie, Haley)
September 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Richard Fontaine as Plaintiff against Frito-Lay, Inc. (Fee Status: IFP requested), filed by Richard Fontaine. (Attachments: # 1 Motion In Forma Pauperis, # 2 IFP Financial Statement)(O'Brien, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fontaine v. Frito-Lay, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Fontaine
Represented By: Mark Ellis O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frito-Lay, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?