Mullapudi v. Philips North America
Plaintiff: Srujitha Mullapudi
Defendant: Philips North America
Case Number: 1:2019cv12001
Filed: September 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Filing 31 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Shaw, Alexandra)
November 20, 2019 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE pursuant to LR 5.2 by Philips North America re #25 Joint statement of counsel Corrected Certificate of Service. (Shaw, Alexandra)
November 20, 2019 Filing 29 Copy re 28 Order on Motion for leave to electronically file Pro Se, mailed and e-mailed to Srujitha Mullapudi on 11/20/2019. (McDonagh, Christina)
November 20, 2019 Filing 28 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #26 Motion for leave to electronically file Pro Se. The court grants permission on the condition that the plaintiff satisfies all applicable training and other requirements for pro se litigants as stated in the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures, Page 5. The plaintiff is directed to complete the registration form accessible at https://public.mad.uscourts.gov/ecfreg.html (McDonagh, Christina)
November 19, 2019 Filing 25 JOINT STATEMENT of counsel Pursuant to Local Rule 16.1(d). (Shaw, Alexandra)
November 18, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint by Srujitha Mullapudi (Attachments:#1 Amended Complaint, #2 Amended Complaint Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet to Amended Complaint) (McDonagh, Christina).
November 18, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to file electronically Pro Se by Srujitha Mullapudi.(McDonagh, Christina)
November 8, 2019 Filing 24 Copy re 23 Order on Motion to Strike, mailed to Srujitha Mullapudi on 11/8/2019. (McDonagh, Christina)
November 8, 2019 Filing 23 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying without prejudice #21 Motion to Dismiss or Strike Defendant's Affirmative Defenses. This motion is premature as no discovery has yet taken place. Plaintiff may renew this motion following discovery (McDonagh, Christina)
November 7, 2019 Filing 22 Corrected MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Srujitha Mullapudi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(McDonagh, Christina)
November 7, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss or Strike Defendant's Affirmative Defenses by Srujitha Mullapudi.(McDonagh, Christina)
November 6, 2019 Filing 20 Copy re #19 Notice of Scheduling Conference, mailed to plaintiff on 11/6/19. (Folan, Karen)
November 6, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 11/26/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. Parties may participate in this scheduling conference by telephone by calling in to 888-363-4734, access code 6426345.(Folan, Karen)
November 6, 2019 Filing 18 Copy re 17 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, mailed to plaintiff on 11/6/19. (Folan, Karen)
November 6, 2019 Filing 17 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying without prejudice #15 Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment. Plaintiffs' filing, styled as a motion for summary judgment, is premature as no discovery has yet taken place. In addition, the motion does not include "a concise statement of the material facts of record as to which the moving party contends there is no genuine issue to be tried, with page references to affidavits, depositions and other documentation," which is grounds for denial. LR, D.Mass. 56.1.(Folan, Karen)
November 1, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Srujitha Mullapudi. (McDonagh, Christina)
November 1, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Srujitha Mullapudi.(McDonagh, Christina)
October 28, 2019 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Philips North America identifying Corporate Parent Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V., Corporate Parent Philips North America LLC for Philips North America.. (Shaw, Alexandra)
October 28, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint by Philips North America.(Shaw, Alexandra)
October 28, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra E. Shaw on behalf of Philips North America (Shaw, Alexandra)
October 28, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick M. Curran, Jr on behalf of Philips North America (Curran, Patrick)
October 18, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed Philips North America served on 10/7/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (McDonagh, Christina)
September 24, 2019 Filing 9 DOCKET SHEET sent to Srujitha Mullapudi (Danieli, Chris)
September 24, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Danieli, Chris)
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Maryland; Case Number 1:19-cv-02554.
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER transferring this case to the United States District Court for the District of Massachusetts. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 9/24/2019. (c/m 09/24/2019 ols, Deputy Clerk)
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued 21 days as to Philips North America. (ol, Deputy Clerk)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Philips North America, filed by Srujitha Mullapudi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit) (ols, Deputy Clerk)
September 16, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge George Levi Russell, III. Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Plaintiff is granted 21 days from the date of this Order in which to complete the Marshal forms and summons and return the to the Clerk and to provide service copies of the Complaint as set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 9/12/2019. (c/m as directed 09/13/2019 ol, Deputy Clerk)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Srujitha Mullapudi.(slss, Deputy Clerk)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Philips North America, filed by Srujitha Mullapudi.(Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(slss, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mullapudi v. Philips North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Srujitha Mullapudi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philips North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?