In Re. Inpellis, Inc. et al
In Re: Inpellis, Inc.
Not Yet Classified: ADEC Private Equity Investments, LLC
Appellant: Jan Schlichtmann, BioPhysics Pharma, Inc., John Masiz and Zhen Zhu
Trustee: John Fitzgerald and John Aquino
Case Number: 1:2019cv12003
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: George A OToole
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge Mark L. Wolf added. Judge George A. OToole, Jr no longer assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
November 8, 2019 Filing 14 Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Creditor ADEC Private Equity Investments, LLCs #7 Motion to Transfer Case to the Honorable Mark L. Wolf is GRANTED. (Halley, Taylor)
October 23, 2019 Filing 13 Opposition re #9 MOTION to Compel ADEC To Correct Record Regarding ADEC's False Accusations That Appellants Engaged In Crime & Fraud filed by ADEC Private Equity Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Errata 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21)(Cacace, Joseph)
October 23, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Sanctions Against Appellants Jan Schlichtmann, Zhen Zhu, Biophysics Pharma, Inc., and John Masiz by ADEC Private Equity Investments, LLC.(Cacace, Joseph)
October 16, 2019 Filing 11 Opposition re #7 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Honorable Mark L. Wolf to Massachusetts. filed by BioPhysics Pharma, Inc., John Masiz, Jan Schlichtmann, Zhen Zhu. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Attachment A (9-23-19 Defendants Opposition To ADEC's Motion to Transfer Motion For Partial Withdrawal Of Reference (ADEC Doc. #8)))(Schlichtmann, Jan)
October 9, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to Compel ADEC To Correct Record Regarding ADEC's False Accusations That Appellants Engaged In Crime & Fraud filed by BioPhysics Pharma, Inc., John Masiz, Jan Schlichtmann, Zhen Zhu. (Schlichtmann, Jan)
October 9, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Compel ADEC To Correct Record Regarding ADEC's False Accusations That Appellants Engaged In Crime & Fraud by BioPhysics Pharma, Inc., John Masiz, Jan Schlichtmann, Zhen Zhu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A (Illustration Re G-4 v VALE Technology (Inpellis Doc. #94-34))), #2 Exhibit Ex B (BioChemics Doc. 560 "Ex 1"), #3 Exhibit Ex C (9-5-19 BioChemics Hearing))(Schlichtmann, Jan)
October 7, 2019 Filing 8 EXHIBIT re #4 MOTION Attachment A & Exhibits 1-7 To Resps' 9-18-19 Brief (Doc. 5) by BioPhysics Pharma, Inc., John Masiz, Jan Schlichtmann, Zhen Zhu. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Attachment A (9-6-19 Inpellis Order Appealed From), #2 Exhibit Ex 1 (8-7-19 Masiz Affidavit), #3 Exhibit Ex 2 (6-5-17 Owsley Affidavit), #4 Exhibit Ex 3 (6-8-17 Barrette Affidavit), #5 Exhibit Ex 4 (12-17-18 ADEC "Demand Letter"), #6 Exhibit Ex 5 (3-12-19 Inpellis Hearing), #7 Exhibit Ex 6 (8-14-19 Inpellis Hearing), #8 Exhibit Ex 7 (9-5-19 BioChemics Hearing))(Schlichtmann, Jan)
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Honorable Mark L. Wolf to Massachusetts. by ADEC Private Equity Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Cacace, Joseph)
October 2, 2019 Filing 6 Opposition re #4 MOTION by Respondents for Leave to Appeal 9-6-19 Bankruptcy Court Order filed by ADEC Private Equity Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Cacace, Joseph)
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 Brief in Support re #4 RESPONDENTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAL 9-6-19 ORDER filed by BioPhysics Pharma, Inc., John Masiz, Jan Schlichtmann, Zhen Zhu. (Halley, Taylor)
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 RESPONDENTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAL 9-6-19 ORDER by BioPhysics Pharma, Inc., John Masiz, Jan Schlichtmann, Zhen Zhu.(Halley, Taylor)
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge George A. OToole, Jr assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 Copy of Bankruptcy Docket Received: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Coppola, Katelyn)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 18-12844. File received (Attachments: #1 Initial Transmittal)(Coppola, Katelyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re. Inpellis, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Inpellis, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ADEC Private Equity Investments, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Bresnahan
Represented By: Howard M. Cooper
Represented By: Peter Sabin Willett
Represented By: Joseph M. Cacace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Jan Schlichtmann
Represented By: Jan R. Schlichtmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: BioPhysics Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Jan R. Schlichtmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: John Masiz
Represented By: John A. Sten
Represented By: Michael P. Angelini
Represented By: Jan R. Schlichtmann
Represented By: Douglas T. Radigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Zhen Zhu
Represented By: Jan R. Schlichtmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: John Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: John Aquino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?