Straggas v. Performance Horizon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Nicholas Straggas
Defendant: Performance Horizon, Inc. and Michael Lemberg
Case Number: 1:2019cv12013
Filed: September 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Discovery to Commence Forthwith by Nicholas Straggas. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A: Proposed Request for Production of Documents, #2 Ex. B: Unemployment Denial Documents, #3 Ex. C: Request for Personnel File)(Garick, Joshua)
November 13, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Performance Horizon, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Performance Horizon Group Ltd. for Performance Horizon, Inc... (Shank, Jonathan)
November 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 12/12/2019 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
November 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew C. Chambers on behalf of Michael Lemberg, Performance Horizon, Inc. (Chambers, Matthew)
November 7, 2019 Filing 8 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Michael Lemberg, Performance Horizon, Inc..(Shank, Jonathan)
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Assented-To MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to November 7, 2019. (Paine, Matthew)
October 17, 2019 Filing 6 Assented-To MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to November 7, 2019 by Michael Lemberg, Performance Horizon, Inc..(Shank, Jonathan) (Modified on 10/17/2019 to Correct CM/ECF Filing Event) (Paine, Matthew).
October 10, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Performance Horizon, Inc. served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019. (Garick, Joshua)
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed Michael Lemberg served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019. (Garick, Joshua)
September 25, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra)
September 25, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
September 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Michael Lemberg, Performance Horizon, Inc. d/b/a Partnerize Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7894278 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Nicholas Straggas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Garick, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Straggas v. Performance Horizon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Straggas
Represented By: Joshua N. Garick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Performance Horizon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?