Miranda v. Flores et al
Plaintiff: Christian Miranda
Defendant: Massachusetts Partnership for Correctional Healthcare, Maria Angeles, M.D., Carlos Flores, Wellpath, Elizabeth Louder and Medical Care Providers
Case Number: 1:2019cv12029
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Upon reconsideration of Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #2 , the Court grants the motion in part, but only with regard to the filing fee. Thus, the Court will proceed to screen the complaint. Because the Clerk has received a check for $350 on behalf of Plaintiff, these funds are credited toward Plaintiff and no deductions will occur from Plaintiff's prison account overtime to pay the filing fee. If, after the screening of the complaint by the Court, the Court determines that summonses should issue, then at that point Plaintiff will be responsible for arranging service and he will be required to pay all costs of service of the summonses and complaint unless he has filed, and the Court has granted, a renewed motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by a six-month prison account statement. (PSSA, 3)
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 Set Deadlines: Plaintiff to either pay fling fee or file a renewed motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by 10/18/2019. (Montes, Mariliz)
September 27, 2019 Filing 4 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered denying without prejudice #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (PSSA, 3)
September 27, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Danieli, Chris)
September 27, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christian Miranda.(McDonagh, Christina)
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Massachusetts Partnership for Correctional Healthcare, Maria Angeles, MD, Elizabeth Louder, Carlos Flores, Medical Care Providers, filed by Christian Miranda. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Form)(McDonagh, Christina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miranda v. Flores et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Massachusetts Partnership for Correctional Healthcare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Angeles, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellpath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Louder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Care Providers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Miranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?