Federal National Mortgage Association v. Linstad et al
Plaintiff: Federal National Mortgage Association
Defendant: CAPITAL ONE BANK (U.S.A.), N.A.,, Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, The Granite Group Wholesalers, LLC, Cach, LLC, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA and Bruce A. Linstad
Case Number: 1:2019cv12043
Filed: October 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:2410
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re 9 Order, Directing Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association to Disburse a Portion of the Surplus Funds to Defendant United States of America (Lizama, Thelma)
November 12, 2019 Filing 14 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered directing Federal National Mortgage Association to pay to the Granite Group Wholesalers LLC, no later than November 15, 2019, $5,254.72, on its judgment against Bruce A. Linstad as set out in the Affidavit of Jessica Barry. See Dkt. #11. (Zierk, Marsha)
November 11, 2019 Filing 13 Notice of Service of Process filed by Federal National Mortgage Association., AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Federal National Mortgage Association. All Defendants. Acknowledgement filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. (Chmielecki, Abigail)
November 11, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed in State Court as to All Defendants. (Chmielecki, Abigail) Modified on 11/12/2019 to indicate service from state court (Pacho, Arnold).
November 6, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Jessica Barry re 10 Order,, by The Granite Group Wholesalers, LLC. (Cohen, Alan)
November 1, 2019 Filing 10 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Other than the United States of America, defendant, The Granite Group Wholesalers, LLC, (Granite) is the only judgment creditor that responded to the Complaint in this case. The Internal Revenue Service having been paid, the court directs Granite (or its attorney Alan Mark Cohen) to file an affidavit under oath of the monies it is currently owed on its Execution on Money Judgment entered against Bruce A. Linstad in the Lowell District Court (Dkt. #1311cv1659) dated April 30, 2014. The court asks that the affidavit be filed no later than November 11, 2019.(Zierk, Marsha)
October 25, 2019 Filing 9 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The court directs plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association to disburse a portion of its surplus funds in the amount of $5,513.02, to the United States of America, as set out in the Declaration of debt (Dkt #8), on or before October 28, 2019. SO ORDERED. (Zierk, Marsha)
October 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA OF CURRENT CLAIM OF OUTSTANDING TAXES AND INTEREST AGAINST THE SURPLUS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Debt)(Lizama, Thelma)
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 STATE COURT Record. (Lizama, Thelma)
October 11, 2019 Filing 6 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. After deduction and payment of the balance due to plaintiff Federal National Mortgage on the first mortgage and the fees and costs for the foreclosure, pursuant to the terms of the mortgage and Mass. Gen. Laws ch. 183, 27, the remaining proceeds from the foreclosure auction are in the amount of $18,937.46. Because of the minor amount of remaining funds and the United States of America's priority regarding the monies, the court will proceed as follows: The Federal National Mortgage Association is directed to file its returns of service for each defendant on the docket (including a statement that this Order has been transmitted to each defendant), and the United States will file its current claim of outstanding taxes and interest against the surplus. After payment is made to the United States, the court intends to exhaust the remaining surplus by ordering payments to defendants in chronological order of their Execution on Money Judgment. (Zierk, Marsha)
October 3, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(Lizama, Thelma)
October 1, 2019 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet re #1 Notice of Removal Updated Civil Cover Sheet by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Lizama, Thelma)
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (Coppola, Katelyn)
October 1, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
October 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ( Fee Status: US Government) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Category Form, #3 Exhibit State court materials)(Lizama, Thelma)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal National Mortgage Association v. Linstad et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPITAL ONE BANK (U.S.A.), N.A.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Granite Group Wholesalers, LLC
Represented By: Alan M. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cach, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Thelma Lizama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce A. Linstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Abigail Chmielecki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?