Barnes v The United States Parole Commission
Petitioner: Eric Derell Barnes
Respondent: The United States Parole Commission
Case Number: 1:2019cv12052
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer C Boal
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Filing 5 Letter/request Fee from Eric Barnes, (Castilla, Francis)
November 21, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ORDER entered. 1.Within 21 days of this Order, Petitioner shall either (1) pay the $5.00 filing fee; or (2) file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis, that is, file an application to proceed in district court without prepaying fees or costs accompanied by a certified prison account statement. Failure of the Petitioner to comply with this directive may result in dismissal of this action. 2. The Clerk of this Court shall serve a copy of the Petition on the Respondent and the United States Attorney for the District of Massachusetts.3.The Respondent shall file an answer or other responsive pleading within 21 days of either (1) the Petitioners payment of the $5 filing fee; or (2) this Courts granting of a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. 4.Because this action was randomly assigned to this Court pursuant to the District Courts Consent Program, the Clerk shall provide the Petitioner with the form for Consent/Refusal of Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction and the instructions for that form.(PSSA, 4)
October 3, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: PROCEDURAL ORDER entered. If petitioner wishes to proceed with this action, within 21 days of the date of this Procedural Order, he either must (1) pay the $5.00 filing fee; or (2) file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by a certified prison account statement. The Clerk shall provide petitioner with an Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs.(PSSA, 4)
October 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), filed by Eric Derell Barnes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Castilla, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnes v The United States Parole Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: The United States Parole Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eric Derell Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?