Timmins Software Corporation v. EMC Corporation, et al.
Plaintiff: Timmins Software Corporation
Defendant: EMC Corporation,, Dell Inc. and Dell Technologies Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv12053
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Filing 21 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #20 Motion to Continue. Scheduling Conference set for 12/16/19 RESET for 1/16/2020 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. (MacDonald, Gail)
November 22, 2019 Filing 20 Joint MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference by Dell Inc., Dell Technologies Inc., EMC Corporation,.(Hemr, Kurt)
November 6, 2019 Filing 19 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to December 13, 2019 to To Respond To Amended Complaint. Scheduling Conference set for 11/25/19/RESET for 12/16/2019 02:15 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. (MacDonald, Gail)
November 6, 2019 Filing 18 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Anthony P. Sammi. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Kelly, Danielle)
November 5, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to December 13, 2019 to To Respond To Amended Complaint (Unopposed) by Dell Inc., Dell Technologies Inc., EMC Corporation,.(Hemr, Kurt)
November 5, 2019 Filing 16 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Anthony P. Sammi Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7956875 by Dell Inc., Dell Technologies Inc., EMC Corporation,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Certification of Anthony P. Sammi))(Hemr, Kurt)
November 1, 2019 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by EMC Corporation,. (Hemr, Kurt)
November 1, 2019 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dell Inc.. (Hemr, Kurt)
November 1, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dell Technologies Inc.. (Hemr, Kurt)
November 1, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher G. Clark on behalf of Dell Inc., Dell Technologies Inc., EMC Corporation, (Clark, Christopher)
November 1, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Kurt Wm. Hemr on behalf of Dell Inc., Dell Technologies Inc., EMC Corporation, (Hemr, Kurt)
October 24, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference: Scheduling Conference set for 11/25/2019 02:45 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. Counsel for the plaintiff(s) is responsible for ensuring that all parties and/or their attorneys who have not filed an answer or appearance with the court are notified of the date of the scheduling conference. (MacDonald, Gail)
October 23, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed Dell Technologies Inc. served on 10/22/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Stern, Benjamin)
October 23, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed Dell Inc. served on 10/22/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Stern, Benjamin)
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed EMC Corporation, served on 10/22/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Stern, Benjamin)
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT on the filing/termination of copyright case . (Stern, Benjamin)
October 22, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Timmins Software Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Stern, Benjamin)
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically shall download this summons, complete one for each defendant, and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (DeMaria, Timothy)
October 3, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
October 3, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by TIMMINS SOFTWARE CORPORATION identifying Corporate Parent TIMMINS SOFTWARE CORPORATION for TIMMINS SOFTWARE CORPORATION.. (Stern, Benjamin)
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dell Inc., Dell Technologies Inc., EMC Corporation, Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7907505 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by TIMMINS SOFTWARE CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Local Category Form) (Stern, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Timmins Software Corporation v. EMC Corporation, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMC Corporation,
Represented By: Kurt Wm. Hemr
Represented By: Anthony P Sammi
Represented By: Christopher G. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dell Inc.
Represented By: Kurt Wm. Hemr
Represented By: Anthony P Sammi
Represented By: Christopher G. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dell Technologies Inc.
Represented By: Kurt Wm. Hemr
Represented By: Anthony P Sammi
Represented By: Christopher G. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timmins Software Corporation
Represented By: Benjamin M. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?