Auctus Fund, LLC v. Anvia Holdings Corp.
Plaintiff: Auctus Fund, LLC
Defendant: Anvia Holdings Corp.
Case Number: 1:2019cv12055
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2019 Filing 11 Emergency MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION for Order to for a Short Order of Notice with Certificate of Service, #10 Emergency MOTION for Writ of Garnishment and Attachment by Trustee Process of Defendant's Assets on a Short Order of Notice, with Certificate of Service with Certificate of Service filed by Auctus Fund, LLC. (Giordano, Philip)
November 30, 2019 Filing 10 Emergency MOTION for Writ of Garnishment and Attachment by Trustee Process of Defendant's Assets on a Short Order of Notice, with Certificate of Service by Auctus Fund, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Louis Posner, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Affidavit of Philip M. Giordano, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit E, #10 Exhibit F, #11 Exhibit G, #12 Exhibit H, #13 Exhibit I, #14 Exhibit J, #15 Text of Proposed Order of Attachment by Trustee Process)(Giordano, Philip)
November 30, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Order to for a Short Order of Notice with Certificate of Service by Auctus Fund, LLC.(Giordano, Philip)
November 25, 2019 Filing 8 Copy re #6 Notice: Clerk's Entry of Default, #7 Standing Order re motions for default judgment mailed certified mail (7012 3050 0000 7255 8157) to Anvia Holdings Corp. c/o Inc. Plan USA as Registered Agent on 11/25/2019. (McDonagh, Christina)
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER on motions for default judgment re #6 Notice: Clerk's Entry of Default (McDonagh, Christina)
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Anvia Holdings Corp. (McDonagh, Christina)
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 Request for notice of default by Auctus Fund, LLC Pursuant to Rule 55(a), with a Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Philip M. Giordano, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Giordano, Philip)
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed Anvia Holdings Corp. served on 10/4/2019, answer due 10/25/2019. (Giordano, Philip)
October 3, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically shall download this summons, complete one for each defendant, and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (DeMaria, Timothy)
October 3, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7907968 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Auctus Fund, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Local Category Form, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (Giordano, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Auctus Fund, LLC v. Anvia Holdings Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Auctus Fund, LLC
Represented By: Sophia E. Syziridis
Represented By: Philip M. Giordano
Represented By: Sophia E. Kyziridis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anvia Holdings Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?