Rodrigues v. Nordic Fisheries, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jose Rodrigues
Defendant: Nordic Fisheries, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv12070
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:688
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING; The Scheduling Conference has been reset for 12/16/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom 13 before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Simeone, Maria)
November 13, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference; A Scheduling Conference has been set for 12/9/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom 13 before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Attachments: #1 Scheduling order sample, #2 standing order on summary judgment)(Simeone, Maria)
November 5, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Nordic Fisheries, Inc..(Blatchley, Samuel)
October 21, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed Nordic Fisheries, Inc. served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019. (Latti, Carolyn)
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Murphy on behalf of Nordic Fisheries, Inc. (Murphy, Robert)
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel P. Blatchley on behalf of Nordic Fisheries, Inc. (Blatchley, Samuel)
October 8, 2019 Filing 5 Entered in duplicate by court staff.
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 Set Deadlines: Service to be completed by 1/6/2020. (Montes, Mariliz)
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Nordic Fisheries, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Currie, Haley)
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nordic Fisheries, Inc. (Fee Status: Seaman), filed by Jose Rodrigues. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form, #3 Seaman's Affidavit)(Latti, Carolyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodrigues v. Nordic Fisheries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Rodrigues
Represented By: Carolyn M. Latti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nordic Fisheries, Inc.
Represented By: Samuel P. Blatchley
Represented By: Robert J. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?