Tile, Inc. v. BLAZING PRICES et al
Plaintiff: Tile, Inc.
Defendant: HAMPSHIRE, DIRECT DISTRIBUTOR, #1 GREATEST DEALS, BLAZING PRICES, EVERYTHINGDEALS and iHEAVEN
Case Number: 1:2019cv12081
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Judith G Dein
Referring Judge: Mark L Wolf
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Filing 13 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #12 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Response to Complaint due 12/9/2019. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
November 25, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to December 9, 2019 to Respond to the Complaint Unopposed by #1 GREATEST DEALS, BLAZING PRICES, HAMPSHIRE, iHEAVEN.(Lent, Jonathan)
November 12, 2019 Filing 11 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #10 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' Response to Complaint due by 11/25/19. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
November 8, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to November 25, 2019 to Respond to the Complaint Unopposed by #1 GREATEST DEALS, BLAZING PRICES, HAMPSHIRE, iHEAVEN.(Lent, Jonathan)
October 24, 2019 Filing 9 Judge Mark L. Wolf: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. Referred for: Full Pretrial, Dispositive Motions (ptd). (Loret, Magdalena)
October 22, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Tile, Inc.. All Defendants. Acknowledgement filed by Tile, Inc.. (Nickerson, Morgan)
October 17, 2019 Filing 7 Judge Mark L. Wolf: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Motion for Alternative Service of Process. (Loret, Magdalena)
October 9, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Alternative Service by Tile, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Order, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Order, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Order)(Nickerson, Morgan)
October 8, 2019 Filing 5 Set Deadlines: Complete Service by 1/6/2020. (Montes, Mariliz)
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to #1 GREATEST DEALS, BLAZING PRICES, DIRECT DISTRIBUTOR, EVERYTHINGDEALS, HAMPSHIRE, iHEAVEN. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McDonagh, Christina)
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark L. Wolf assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (McDonagh, Christina)
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against #1 GREATEST DEALS, HAMPSHIRE, EVERYTHINGDEALS, DIRECT DISTRIBUTOR, BLAZING PRICES, iHEAVEN Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7914105 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Tile, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 JS45)(Nickerson, Morgan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tile, Inc. v. BLAZING PRICES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tile, Inc.
Represented By: Morgan T. Nickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAMPSHIRE
Represented By: Jonathan W. Lent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIRECT DISTRIBUTOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: #1 GREATEST DEALS
Represented By: Jonathan W. Lent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLAZING PRICES
Represented By: Jonathan W. Lent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EVERYTHINGDEALS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: iHEAVEN
Represented By: Jonathan W. Lent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?