Cashman Equipment Corp. v. Precon Marine, Inc.
Plaintiff: Cashman Equipment Corp.
Defendant: Precon Marine, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv12213
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Counterclaim by Cashman Equipment Corp..(Brownell, Scott)
December 4, 2019 Filing 12 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #11 Cashman Equipment Corp.'s Motion for Extension of Time to respond to Precon's Counterclaim (Dkt #6) until up to and including December 20, 2019. (Zierk, Marsha)
December 3, 2019 Filing 11 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 12/20/2019 to File Answer re #6 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Cashman Equipment Corp..(Brownell, Scott)
November 22, 2019 Filing 10 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Mark T. Coberly. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Pacho, Arnold)
November 21, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Precon Marine, Inc.. (Smith, David)
November 21, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Mark Coberly Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7982626 by Precon Marine, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support)(Smith, David)
November 21, 2019 Filing 7 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The Answer (along with a counterclaim) having been filed in this straight-forward contract case, the court enters the following pretrial schedule:Initial disclosures required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) must be completed by 12/20/19; Motions for leave to Amend Pleadings & Joinder of Parties must be filed by 1/20/20. Without leave of court, the parties are permitted to serve 30 interrogatories, 30 requests for admissions and 30 document requests, to be filed within the 30 days of the initial disclosures. The court expects responses to be made in thirty days, unless a request for additional time is granted. A party may not notice more than 5 deponents without leave of court on a showing of good cause. If all parties are interested in the court's mediation program, they must notify our docket clerk Arnold Pacho (617-748-9812) by 3/27/20 (or earlier). All fact discovery must be completed no later than 5/8/20. The parties will inform the court no later than 4/6/2020, if they intend to engage an expert witness, stating the experts area of knowledge, and why the expert is necessary to their case. If no experts are utilized, dispositive motions, if any, will be filed no later than 5/29/2020, oppositions due 6/19/2020, reply by leave of court only. If experts are utilized, the court will order a supplemental schedule.(Zierk, Marsha)
November 20, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Cashman Equipment Corp. by Precon Marine, Inc..(Smith, David)
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Scott D. Brownell. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Pacho, Arnold)
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION Pro Hac Vice Admission of Scott D. Brownell by Cashman Equipment Corp..(Rider, Stephen) Modified on 10/28/2019 to correct CM/ECF event (Pacho, Arnold).
October 25, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Precon Marine, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McDonagh, Christina)
October 25, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Danieli, Chris)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7941853 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Cashman Equipment Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Categorization Sheet)(Rider, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cashman Equipment Corp. v. Precon Marine, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cashman Equipment Corp.
Represented By: Stephen W. Rider
Represented By: Scott D. Brownell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Precon Marine, Inc.
Represented By: David S. Smith
Represented By: Mark T. Coberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?