Racioppi v. Dragos et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Racioppi
Defendant: Robert Dragos and Linde LLC
Not Yet Classified: Judge Jennifer C. Boal
Case Number: 1:2019cv12218
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Filing 21 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. The Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing is set for August 7, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 14 before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. Counsel and principals are directed to be present and have full settlement authority. Each party must submit a brief (no more than 5 pages) mediation memorandum that includes a discussion of (1) the merits of the case (both strengths and weaknesses); (2) damages or other relief sought by the parties; (3) the status of discovery; and (4) the status of the parties' settlement discussions. The memoranda should be submitted BY HAND, E-MAIL to (steve_york@mad.uscourts.gov), OR MAIL WITH THE COURT no later than five (5) business days prior to the mediation and marked "Confidential - Not for Docketing." In the event that any party believes that the case is not ripe for mediation, or the date poses a serious conflict, counsel are to notify opposing counsel and call the deputy clerk at 617-748-9238 as soon as possible. Prior to the mediation, there will be a Telephone Conference set for August 4, 2020 at 11:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. The clerk will provide the call in information to all parties by email, one day prior to the upcoming telephone conference. (York, Steve)
December 18, 2019 Filing 20 Notice of assignment to ADR Provider. Judge Jennifer C. Boal appointed.(Belpedio, Lisa)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution as of August 2020.(Paine, Matthew)
December 12, 2019 Filing 18 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Scheduling Conference held on 12/12/2019. The Court explains the requirements of the session. The parties do not want to proceed before a magistrate judge. The case is to go to ADR during the month of August 2020 and placed on the running trial list for January 2021. A final pretrial conference will be held during the month of December 2020. Any motions for summary judgment shall be filed atleast three months prior to trial month. A joint pretrial memorandum is due on the first Monday of the month preceding the trial month. The Court explains the requirements of experts. ( Ready for Trial on 1/4/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young.). (Court Reporter: No Court Reporter Used.) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
December 12, 2019 Filing 17 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered re #16 Second Joint Statement is so ordered as the case management scheduling order. DISCOVERY DUE September 15, 2020 and DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS DUE October 1, 2020. (COUNSEL ARE REQUIRED TO APPEAR FOR THE DECEMBER 12, 2019 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE) (Paine, Matthew)
December 11, 2019 Filing 16 Second JOINT SUBMISSION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Robert Dragos, Linde LLC.(Penka, Jeb)
December 10, 2019 Filing 15 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re #14 Joint statement is returned to the parties as too long a time line. The case is to be placed on the January 2021 running trial list. The parties are to resubmit the joint statement. (Paine, Matthew)
December 5, 2019 Filing 14 JOINT SUBMISSION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Robert Dragos, Linde LLC.(Penka, Jeb)
December 5, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Linde LLC.(Penka, Jeb)
December 5, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Robert Dragos.(Penka, Jeb)
November 25, 2019 Filing 11 Mail Returned as Undeliverable - Return to Sender as to Scot Schneiderman. (Paine, Matthew)
November 6, 2019 Filing 10 STATE COURT Record All Defendants.. (Durney, Peter)
November 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 12/12/2019 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
October 31, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Linde LLC.(Durney, Peter)
October 31, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Robert Dragos.(Durney, Peter)
October 28, 2019 Filing 6 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (McKillop, Matthew)
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Linde LLC. (Durney, Peter)
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeb S. Penka on behalf of Robert Dragos, Linde LLC (Penka, Jeb)
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter M. Durney on behalf of Robert Dragos, Linde LLC (Durney, Peter)
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Robert Dragos, Linde LLC ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7943004 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Summons to Linde LLC, #2 Exhibit B -- Complaint, #3 Exhibit C -- Civil Action Cover Sheet (State), #4 Exhibit D -- Tracking Order (State), #5 Exhibit E -- Summons to Robert Dragos, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Category Form, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Durney, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Racioppi v. Dragos et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Dragos
Represented By: Peter M. Durney
Represented By: Jeb S. Penka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linde LLC
Represented By: Peter M. Durney
Represented By: Jeb S. Penka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Racioppi
Represented By: Scot Schneiderman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Judge Jennifer C. Boal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?