Hearns v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth L. Hearns
Defendant: SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC. and PLAZA HOME MORTGAGE INCORPORATED
Case Number: 1:2019cv12223
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Rya W Zobel
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kenneth L. Hearns (Cabana, Robert)
November 13, 2019 Filing 10 STATE COURT Record. (Seeley, Donald)
November 6, 2019 Filing 9 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Responses due by 11/22/2019 (Urso, Lisa)
October 31, 2019 Filing 8 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to November 22, 2019 to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc..(Seeley, Donald)
October 31, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Kenneth L. Hearns OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF CLAIMS AGAINST PLAZA HOME MORTGAGE INCORPORATED (Cabana, Robert)
October 28, 2019 Filing 6 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (McKillop, Matthew)
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Rya W. Zobel assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey D. Adams on behalf of SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC. (Adams, Jeffrey)
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald W. Seeley, Jr on behalf of SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC. (Seeley, Donald)
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC.. (Seeley, Donald)
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC. ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7943603 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Category Form, #4 Exhibit Attachment to Category Form)(Seeley, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hearns v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC.
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Adams
Represented By: Donald W. Seeley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PLAZA HOME MORTGAGE INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth L. Hearns
Represented By: Robert K. Cabana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?