Community Association Underwriters of America Inc. v. Fluidmaster, Inc.
Plaintiff: Community Association Underwriters of America Inc.
Defendant: Fluidmaster, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv12225
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Marianne B Bowler
Referring Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Filing 22 Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by Fluidmaster, Inc..(Shannon, Anne)
November 25, 2019 Filing 21 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Scheduling Conference held on 11/25/2019. Court reviews #14 Joint Submission. Plaintiff anticipates no more than four depositions; defendant, perhaps six. Court sets following schedule: written discovery to be served by 2/25/2020, fact discovery to be completed by 6/1/2020, plaintiff to identify experts by 7/1/2020, defendant to identify experts by 8/3/2020, expert discovery to be completed by 10/2/2020. Should parties desire mediation, they may file a joint motion for such. (Status Conference set for 3/10/2020 02:00 PM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler.). (Court Reporter: Digital Recording.) To order a copy of this Digital Recording, please go to #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/Magistrate-Audio.htm . For a transcript of this proceeding, contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov.(Attorneys present: Cohn, Shannon) (Putnam, Harold)
November 25, 2019 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 11/25/2019 03:15 PM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Putnam, Harold)
November 21, 2019 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler added. Judge Indira Talwani no longer assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
November 21, 2019 Filing 18 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Bowler. (MacDonald, Gail)
November 20, 2019 Filing 17 CONSENT by all parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Community Association Underwriters of America Inc... (Cohn, Jason)
November 19, 2019 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: You have consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Attached is a form that indicates consent. The submission of the form is mandatory. Completed forms shall be filed promptly. Additional forms can be obtained on the Court's web page at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov. (MacDonald, Gail)
November 19, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Cohn, Jason)
November 18, 2019 Filing 14 JOINT SUBMISSION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Fluidmaster, Inc..(Shannon, Anne)
November 18, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Fluidmaster, Inc..(Shannon, Anne)
November 6, 2019 Filing 12 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Benjamin D. Wharton. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Kelly, Danielle)
November 6, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Benjamin D. Wharton Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7957567 by Community Association Underwriters of America Inc..(Cohn, Jason)
November 5, 2019 Filing 10 STATE COURT Record. (Shannon, Anne)
November 5, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Community Association Underwriters of America Inc.. (Cohn, Jason)
November 5, 2019 Filing 8 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Jeffrey Thomen. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Vieira, Leonardo)
November 4, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fluidmaster, Inc.. (Shannon, Anne)
November 4, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Fluidmaster, Inc..(Shannon, Anne)
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jeffrey M. Thomen Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7955282 by Fluidmaster, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Shannon, Anne)
October 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference: Scheduling Conference set for 11/25/2019 03:15 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. (MacDonald, Gail)
October 29, 2019 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (McKillop, Matthew)
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Danieli, Chris)
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Fluidmaster, Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7943711 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Fluidmaster, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Category Form)(Shannon, Anne) Modified on 10/28/2019 (McKillop, Matthew). (Attachment 3 replaced on 10/29/2019) (McKillop, Matthew).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Community Association Underwriters of America Inc. v. Fluidmaster, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fluidmaster, Inc.
Represented By: Anne E. Shannon
Represented By: Jeffrey Thomen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Community Association Underwriters of America Inc.
Represented By: Anne E. Shannon
Represented By: Benjamin D Wharton
Represented By: Jason E. Cohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?