SharkNinja Operating LLC v. iRobot Corporation
Plaintiff: SharkNinja Operating LLC
Defendant: iRobot Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv12236
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:01
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Filing 48 Defendant iRobot's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against SharkNinja Operating LLC by iRobot Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W)(Madden, Timothy)
December 9, 2019 Filing 47 AMENDED COMPLAINT For Declaratory Judgment against SharkNinja Operating LLC, filed by SharkNinja Operating LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - '303 Patent, #2 Exhibit B - '038 Patent, #3 Exhibit C - '048 Patent, #4 Exhibit D - '294 Patent, #5 Exhibit E - '676 Patent)(Lipton, Alissa)
December 9, 2019 Filing 46 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #45 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Folan, Karen)
December 6, 2019 Filing 45 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by SharkNinja Operating LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Complaint)(Lipton, Alissa)
November 12, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE by iRobot Corporation of Withdrawal of Appearance of John W. Shaw (Madden, Timothy)
November 12, 2019 Filing 43 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #42 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Kathleen A. Daley and Jaysen S. Chung. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina)
November 8, 2019 Filing 42 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Kathleen A. Daley and Jaysen S. Chung Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number 0101-7964585 by SharkNinja Operating LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Lipton, Alissa)
November 5, 2019 Filing 41 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #39 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Sean M. McEldowney. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina)
November 5, 2019 Filing 40 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #38 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Brian Rosenthal, Hervey Mark Lyon, Doris Johnson Hines, Luke McCammon, Erika Harmon Arner and Daniel C. Tucker. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina)
November 5, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Sean McEldowney, James Lomeo Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number 0101-7956950 by iRobot Corporation.(Madden, Timothy)
November 5, 2019 Filing 38 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Brian Rosenthal, Hervey Mark Lyon, Doris Johnson Hines, Luke McCammon, Erika Harmon Arner, Daniel C. Tucker Filing fee: $ 600, receipt number 0101-7956929 by SharkNinja Operating LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Lipton, Alissa)
November 5, 2019 Filing 37 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #36 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Robin McCue and C. Alex Shank. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina)
November 5, 2019 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Duplicate Filing Fee and Credit for Refund, for $200.00 paid on 11/04/2019, receipt number 0101-7955117. (Tran, Henry)
November 4, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of C. Alex Shank, Robin McCue Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number 0101-7955163 by iRobot Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Madden, Timothy)
November 4, 2019 Filing 35 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #34 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Folan, Karen)
November 1, 2019 Filing 34 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by iRobot Corporation.(Madden, Timothy)
November 1, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Alissa K. Lipton on behalf of SharkNinja Operating LLC (Lipton, Alissa)
October 31, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter E. Gelhaar on behalf of iRobot Corporation (Gelhaar, Peter)
October 31, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy H. Madden on behalf of iRobot Corporation (Madden, Timothy)
October 30, 2019 Filing 30 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Danieli, Chris)
October 30, 2019 Filing 29 Case transferred in from District of Delaware; Case Number 1:19-cv-01935.
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER: For the reasons articulated by the Court during the telephone conference held today, October 29, 2019, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Transfer to the District of Massachusetts (D.I. #10 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Enjoin Duplicative Litigation (D.I. #6 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer immediately this case to the District of Massachusetts. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/29/2019. (nmf)
October 29, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colm F. Connolly - Telephone Conference held on 10/29/2019. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) (nmf)
October 29, 2019 Filing 28 REPLY BRIEF re #10 MOTION to Transfer Case to The District of Massachusetts filed by iRobot Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-10)(Shaw, John)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Setting Teleconference: Counsel for plaintiff to initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 10/29/2019 at 03:00 PM before Judge Colm F. Connolly. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/29/2019. (nmf)
October 29, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Compendium of Cases in Support of SharkNinja's Motion to Enjoin - filed by SharkNinja Operating LLC.(Egan, Brian)
October 29, 2019 Filing 25 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #24 Reply Brief -- Declaration of Jack B. Blumenfeld -- by SharkNinja Operating LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5)(Egan, Brian)
October 29, 2019 Filing 24 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #6 MOTION to Enjoin Duplicative Litigation filed by SharkNinja Operating LLC. (Egan, Brian)
October 25, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Enjoin Duplicative Litigation filed by iRobot Corporation.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 11/1/2019. (Fry, David)
October 25, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Compendium of Cases in Support of SharkNinja's Answering Brief in Opposition to iRobot's Motion to Transfer filed by SharkNinja Operating LLC.(Egan, Brian)
October 25, 2019 Filing 21 DECLARATION re #20 Answering Brief in Opposition -- Declaration of Jack Blumenfeld -- by SharkNinja Operating LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-F)(Egan, Brian)
October 25, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Transfer Case to The District of Massachusetts filed by SharkNinja Operating LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 11/1/2019. (Egan, Brian)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #19 Stipulation filed by SharkNinja Operating LLC. Set Briefing Schedule: re #10 MOTION to Transfer Case to The District of Massachusetts, #6 MOTION to Enjoin Duplicative Litigation. (Answering Brief due 10/25/2019., Reply Brief due 10/29/2019.). Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/24/2019. (fms)
October 24, 2019 Filing 19 STIPULATION regarding briefing on motion to enjoin (D.I. 6) and motion to transfer (D.I. 11) by SharkNinja Operating LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
October 23, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Gregg F. LoCascio for iRobot Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
October 22, 2019 Filing 18 Letter to The Honorable Colm F. Connolly from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding request for teleconference - re #13 Letter, #16 Letter. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
October 22, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Anders P. Fjellstedt for iRobot Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
October 22, 2019 Filing 17 PROPOSED ORDER re Briefing Schedule re #16 Letter by iRobot Corporation. (Shaw, John)
October 22, 2019 Filing 16 Letter to The Honorable Colm F. Connolly from John Shaw - re #13 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Shaw, John)
October 22, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Compendium in Support of its Opening Brief re #10 MOTION to Transfer Case to The District of Massachusetts filed by iRobot Corporation.(Hoeschen, Nathan)
October 22, 2019 Filing 14 APPENDIX re #10 MOTION to Transfer Case to The District of Massachusetts by iRobot Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15)(Shaw, John)
October 22, 2019 Filing 13 Letter to The Honorable Colm F. Connolly from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding request for expedited relief - re #6 MOTION to Enjoin Duplicative Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Blumenfeld, Jack)
October 22, 2019 Filing 12 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #10 MOTION to Transfer Case to The District of Massachusetts filed by iRobot Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/5/2019. (Shaw, John)
October 22, 2019 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc. for iRobot Corporation filed by iRobot Corporation. (Shaw, John)
October 22, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Transfer Case to The District of Massachusetts - filed by iRobot Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shaw, John)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gregg F. LoCascio and Anders P. Fjellstedt filed by iRobot Corporation. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/22/2019. (fms)
October 21, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gregg F. LoCascio and Anders P. Fjellstedt - filed by iRobot Corporation. (Shaw, John)
October 18, 2019 Filing 8 DECLARATION re #6 MOTION to Enjoin Duplicative Litigation -- Declaration of Jack B. Blumenfeld -- by SharkNinja Operating LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-4)(Blumenfeld, Jack)
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #6 MOTION to Enjoin Duplicative Litigation filed by SharkNinja Operating LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/1/2019. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Enjoin Duplicative Litigation - filed by SharkNinja Operating LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
October 16, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SharkNinja Operating LLC. iRobot Corporation served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
October 15, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to iRobot Corporation on 10/15/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (lak)
October 11, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent EP Midco LLC for SharkNinja Operating LLC filed by SharkNinja Operating LLC. (lak)
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,418,303 B2 ;8,950,038 B2 ;9,104,204 B2 ;9,223,749 B2 ;9,492,048 B2 ;9,529,363 B2 ;9,550,294 B2. (See attached for additional Patents). (lak)
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT - filed with Jury Demand against iRobot Corporation - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2753613.) - filed by SharkNinja Operating LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-K, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SharkNinja Operating LLC v. iRobot Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: iRobot Corporation
Represented By: Anders P. Fjellstedt
Represented By: Gregg F Locascio
Represented By: John W. Shaw
Represented By: Peter E. Gelhaar
Represented By: Timothy H. Madden
Represented By: Sean McEldowney
Represented By: Robin A McCue
Represented By: C. Alex Shank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SharkNinja Operating LLC
Represented By: Brian P. Egan
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Alissa K. Lipton
Represented By: Daniel C. Tucker
Represented By: Doris Johnson Hines
Represented By: Brian A. Rosenthal
Represented By: Jaysen S. Chung
Represented By: Erika Harmon Arner
Represented By: Kathleen A. Daley
Represented By: Luke McCammon
Represented By: H. Mark Lyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?