Rizzuto v. United Healthcare Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Zachary Rizzuto
Defendant: United Healthcare Insurance Company, United HealthCare Services, Inc. and The Hertz Custom Benefits Program
Case Number: 1:2019cv12239
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2020 Filing 50 REPLY to Response to #38 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by The Hertz Custom Benefits Program, United HealthCare Services, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company. (O'Brien, Justin)
February 10, 2020 Filing 49 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #48 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Folan, Karen)
February 7, 2020 Filing 48 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Further Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by The Hertz Custom Benefits Program, United HealthCare Services, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Reply)(O'Brien, Justin)
February 7, 2020 Filing 47 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Hertz Custom Benefits Program. (O'Brien, Justin)
January 21, 2020 Filing 46 Opposition re #38 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Zachary Rizzuto. (Collins, Richard)
January 17, 2020 Filing 45 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #44 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Adrian L. Canzoneri. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina)
January 16, 2020 Filing 44 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Adrian L. Canzoneri Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8059422 by Zachary Rizzuto. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Adrian L. Canzoneri)(Rafik, Mala)
January 16, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Mala M. Rafik on behalf of Zachary Rizzuto (Rafik, Mala)
December 16, 2019 Filing 42 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #41 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #38 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Responses due by 1/21/2020 (Folan, Karen)
December 13, 2019 Filing 41 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss to File Response/Reply as to #38 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Zachary Rizzuto.(Collins, Richard)
December 6, 2019 Filing 40 DECLARATION re #39 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #38 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by The Hertz Custom Benefits Program, United HealthCare Services, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(O'Brien, Justin)
December 6, 2019 Filing 39 MEMORANDUM in Support re #38 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by The Hertz Custom Benefits Program, United HealthCare Services, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company. (O'Brien, Justin)
December 6, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by The Hertz Custom Benefits Program, United HealthCare Services, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company.(O'Brien, Justin)
November 5, 2019 Filing 37 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #36 Motion for Extension of Time to December 6, 2019 to File Response to Complaint (Folan, Karen)
November 5, 2019 Filing 36 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to December 6, 2019 to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by The Hertz Custom Benefits Program, United HealthCare Services, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company.(O'Brien, Justin)
November 4, 2019 Filing 35 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #34 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Peter H. Walsh and Briana L. Black. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina)
November 4, 2019 Filing 34 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Peter Walsh and Briana Black Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number 0101-7954274 by The Hertz Custom Benefits Program, United HealthCare Services, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Peter Walsh, #2 Affidavit of Briana Black)(O'Brien, Justin)
November 4, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin P. O'Brien on behalf of The Hertz Custom Benefits Program, United HealthCare Services, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company (O'Brien, Justin)
October 30, 2019 Filing 32 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Danieli, Chris)
October 30, 2019 Filing 31 Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 2:19-cv-00691.
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDERED: Defendants United Healthcare Insurance Company, United Healthcare Services, Inc., and the Hertz Custom Benefits Program's Unopposed Motion to Transfer, or in the Alternative, to Stay in Favor of First-Filed Action (Doc. #27 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to transfer the above-captioned case to the United States District Court for the District of Massachusetts, terminate all pending motions, and close the file. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 10/29/2019. (AEH)
October 22, 2019 Filing 29 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 11/5/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 10/22/2019. (RMT)
October 21, 2019 Filing 28 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, #27 Unopposed MOTION to transfer case or in the Alternative to Stay in Favor of First-Filed Action by All Defendants. (Pegg, Allen) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell.
October 21, 2019 Filing 27 Unopposed MOTION to transfer case or in the Alternative to Stay in Favor of First-Filed Action by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Pegg, Allen)
October 21, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Allen Paige Pegg on behalf of The Hertz Custom Benefits Program (Pegg, Allen)
October 15, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #7 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by United Healthcare Insurance Company, United Healthcare Services, Inc.. Related case(s): Y (Pegg, Allen)
October 15, 2019 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #19 Interested persons order by United Healthcare Insurance Company, United Healthcare Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Unitedhealth Group Incorporated for United Healthcare Insurance Company, United Healthcare Services, Inc... (Pegg, Allen)
October 8, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE to counsel Lisa S. Kantor of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; The attorney listed shall file a notice of compliance within fourteen days. Failure to comply with this notice within fourteen days will result in counsel being terminated from the docket sheet without further notice. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SPB) Modified on 10/8/2019 Entered in Error. (SPB).
October 4, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #8 Interested persons order by Zachary Rizzuto. (Collins, Richard)
October 4, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #7 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Zachary Rizzuto. Related case(s): yes (Collins, Richard)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ENDORSED ORDER granting #18 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Class Action Complaint. Defendants UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company and United HealthCare Services, Inc. shall have up to and including November 11, 2019, to file a response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 10/3/2019. (brh)
October 1, 2019 Filing 19 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER as to United Healthcare Insurance Company and United Healthcare Services, Inc. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 10/15/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 10/1/2019. (drn)
September 30, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Richard T. Collins, appearing on behalf of Zachary Rizzuto (Filing fee $150 receipt number FTM014108.) Related document: #12 MOTION for Richard T. Collins to appear pro hac vice. (SPB)
September 30, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Damon D. Eisenbrey, appearing on behalf of Zachary Rizzuto (Filing fee $150 receipt number FTM014109.) Related document: #13 MOTION for Damon D. Eisenbrey to appear pro hac vice. (SPB)
September 30, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Lisa S. Kantor, appearing on behalf of Zachary Rizzuto (Filing fee $150 receipt number FTM014110.) Related document: #14 MOTION for Lisa S. Kantor to appear pro hac vice. (SPB)
September 30, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Timothy J. Rozelle, appearing on behalf of Zachary Rizzuto (Filing fee $150 receipt number FTM014111.) Related document: #15 MOTION for Timothy J. Rozelle to appear pro hac vice. (SPB)
September 30, 2019 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Class Action Complaint by United Healthcare Insurance Company, United Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Pegg, Allen)
September 30, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Allen Paige Pegg on behalf of United Healthcare Insurance Company, United Healthcare Services, Inc. (Pegg, Allen)
September 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #12 #13 #14 #15 Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Richard T. Collins, Damon D. Eisenbrey, Lisa S. Kantor, and Timothy J. Rozelle may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff Zachary Rizzuto. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 9/28/2019. (brh)
September 27, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Timothy J. Rozelle to appear pro hac vice by Zachary Rizzuto. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dabdoub, Edward) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell.
September 27, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Lisa S. Kantor to appear pro hac vice by Zachary Rizzuto. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dabdoub, Edward) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell.
September 27, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Damon D. Eisenbrey to appear pro hac vice by Zachary Rizzuto. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dabdoub, Edward) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell.
September 27, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Richard T. Collins to appear pro hac vice by Zachary Rizzuto. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dabdoub, Edward) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell.
September 27, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN of service executed on 09/20/2019 by Zachary Rizzuto as to The Hertz Custom Benefits Program. (Dabdoub, Edward)
September 27, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN of service executed on 09/20/2019 by Zachary Rizzuto as to United Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Dabdoub, Edward)
September 27, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN of service executed on 09/23/2019 by Zachary Rizzuto as to United Healthcare Insurance Company. (Dabdoub, Edward)
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 10/4/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 9/20/2019. (WRW)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 10/4/2019. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 9/20/2019. (Track 2 notice entered per law clerk BH) (WRW)
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 9/20/2019. (drn)
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to The Hertz Custom Benefits Program. (drn)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to United Healthcare Services, Inc. (drn)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to United Healthcare Insurance Company. (drn)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:19-cv-691-FtM-38NPM. (NAS)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15939027) filed by Zachary Rizzuto. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons)(Dabdoub, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rizzuto v. United Healthcare Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Insurance Company
Represented By: Allen Paige Pegg
Represented By: Justin P. O'Brien
Represented By: Briana L Black
Represented By: Peter H Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United HealthCare Services, Inc.
Represented By: Allen Paige Pegg
Represented By: Justin P. O'Brien
Represented By: Briana L Black
Represented By: Peter H Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hertz Custom Benefits Program
Represented By: Allen Paige Pegg
Represented By: Justin P. O'Brien
Represented By: Briana L Black
Represented By: Peter H Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Rizzuto
Represented By: Edward Philip Dabdoub
Represented By: Damon D. Eisenbrey
Represented By: Richard T. Collins
Represented By: Lisa S. Kantor
Represented By: Timothy J. Rozelle
Represented By: Adrian L. Canzoneri
Represented By: Mala M. Rafik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?