American Civil Liberties Union et al v. United States Department of Justice et al
Plaintiff: American Civil Liberties Union and American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation, Drug Enforcement Administration and UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Case Number: 1:2019cv12242
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Donald L Cabell
Referring Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Filing 16 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Docket Entry #14 Summons Returned Executed as to the US Attorney Corrected Because: The Summons Was Filed Under the Wrong Event in CM/ECF by Counsel Segal. The Incorrect Answer Deadlines Were Terminated and the Summons Re-Docketed Under the Correct Event in CM/ECF as ECF No. #15 . (Paine, Matthew)
November 5, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts. Drug Enforcement Administration served on 11/4/2019, answer due 1/3/2020; Federal Bureau of Investigation served on 11/4/2019, answer due 1/3/2020; UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 11/4/2019, answer due 1/3/2020. (Paine, Matthew)
November 4, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts. Federal Bureau of Investigation served on 11/4/2019, answer due 11/25/2019; UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 11/4/2019, answer due 11/25/2019; Drug Enforcement Administration served on 11/4/2019, answer due 11/25/2019., SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney by American Civil Liberties Union; American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts. Federal Bureau of Investigation served on 11/4/2019, answer due 11/25/2019; UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 11/4/2019, answer due 11/25/2019; Drug Enforcement Administration served on 11/4/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. (Segal, Matthew)
November 4, 2019 Filing 13 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Brett Max Kaufman and Nathan Freed Wessler. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Paine, Matthew)
November 4, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Docket Entry #10 Service as to the United States corrected because: Counsel Segal filed the Service of the United States Under Wrong Event in CM/ECF. Summons/Affidavit Returned Executed as to the USA Re-Docketed Under the Correct Event (Docket Text Modified) as ECF No. #11 (Paine, Matthew)
November 4, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to the Attorney General of the United States, Drug Enforcement Administration, and Federal Bureau of Investigation by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts. (Paine, Matthew)
November 1, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts. All Defendants. Acknowledgement filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts. (Segal, Matthew)
November 1, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Re-Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
November 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathaniel C. Donoghue on behalf of American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts (Donoghue, Nathaniel)
November 1, 2019 Filing 7 Refusal to Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. . (McFadden, Daniel)
October 31, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Segal on behalf of American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts (Segal, Matthew)
October 31, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Brett Max Kaufman and Nathan Freed Wessler Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number 0101-7949544 by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit)(McFadden, Daniel)
October 31, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Pacho, Arnold)
October 31, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary)
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David Glod on behalf of American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts (Glod, David)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7948899 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Category Sheet)(McFadden, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Civil Liberties Union et al v. United States Department of Justice et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drug Enforcement Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Civil Liberties Union
Represented By: David Glod
Represented By: Daniel L. McFadden
Represented By: Matthew Segal
Represented By: Nathaniel C. Donoghue
Represented By: Brett Max Kaufman
Represented By: Nathan Freed Wessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts
Represented By: David Glod
Represented By: Daniel L. McFadden
Represented By: Matthew Segal
Represented By: Nathaniel C. Donoghue
Represented By: Brett Max Kaufman
Represented By: Nathan Freed Wessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?