Adrian v. GlaxoSmithKline, LLC
Plaintiff: Jennifer Adrian
Defendant: GlaxoSmithKline, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv12270
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Filing 9 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: Status Conference held on 12/16/2019.1) The Court heard updates on the current total of federal and state filings.2) The Court heard the parties responses to its letter to the FDA, which was sent on December 13, 2019, regarding GSKs citizen petition (FDA-2019-P-5151-0001). 3) The Court heard updates on discovery regarding communications between GSK and Novartis. GSK made a supplemental production on December 13, 2019, and anticipates completing production by December 31, 2019. 4) The Court heard updates on discovery related to Dr. Zambelli-Weiners report. The parties currently intend to schedule her additional deposition for early January 2020.5) The Court set status conferences for 1/15/2020 10:00 a.m., 2/20/2020 1:30 p.m., and 3/18/2020 1:30 p.m. (Court Reporter: Linda Walsh at lwalshsteno@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Various) Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02657-FDS et al. (Bono, Christine)
December 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO TELEPHONE PARTICIPANTS: Please use the following Participant line: (877) 876-9174 and Conference ID: Zofran, for the Status Conference set for 12/16/2019 at 1:30 PM. REMINDER: Counsel who wish to address the court by telephone must notify the courtroom deputy by email prior to the conference. Counsel who are not addressing the Court, please mute your telephones, so that you may hear the proceeding but other participants will not hear background noise or interference. Please do not put your telephone on hold. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02657-FDS et al.(Bono, Christine)
November 20, 2019 Filing 7 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: Status Conference held on 11/20/2019 in case 1:15-md-02657-FDS.1) The Court heard updates on the current total of federal and state filings. 2) The Court heard updates on Phase 5 discovery.3) The Court heard the parties proposals concerning the trial schedule in light of GSKs citizen petition pending before the FDA. a. With the agreement of the parties, the Court rescheduled the first bellwether trial, Rodriguez v. GSK, Case No. 1:15-cv-13762 to begin on May 4, 2020. b. The Court also stated that it was inclined to send a letter to the FDA about GSKs citizen petition. Any proposals from the parties about the content of that letter are due by December 2, 2019. c. Due to the revised trial schedule, the Court rescheduled the hearing on summary judgment and Daubert motions in Rodriguez for January 15, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. d. The Court will set revised dates for pretrial filings in Rodriguez.4) The Court heard argument on GSKs motion to compel plaintiffs to produce Dr. Louik for a targeted deposition on her supplemental report. (Dkt. No. 1691). For the reasons stated on the record, the motion is DENIED.5) A colloquy was held on GSKs request to depose Dr. Danielsson on his February 2019 supplemental report in light of the Courts order on GSKs motion to strike his report. (Dkt. Nos. 1425, 1703). To the extent that GSKs motion sought this relief, it remains under advisement. (Court Reporter: Valerie OHara at vaohara@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Various) Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02657-FDS et al.(Bono, Christine)
November 18, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING AS TO HEARING TYPE ONLY: Status Conference set for 11/20/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. NOTICE TO TELEPHONE PARTICIPANTS: Please use the following Participant line: (877) 876-9177 and Conference ID: Zofran, for the Status Conference set for 11/20/2019 at 9:30 AM. REMINDER: Counsel who wish to address the court by telephone must notify the courtroom deputy by email prior to the conference. Counsel who are not addressing the Court, please mute your telephones, so that you may hear the proceeding but other participants will not hear background noise or interference. Please do not put your telephone on hold.Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02657-FDS et al. (Bono, Christine)
November 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer M. Stevenson on behalf of GlaxoSmithKline, LLC (Stevenson, Jennifer)
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to GlaxoSmithKline, LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McDonagh, Christina)
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF MDL CASE OPENED, Direct file in the District of Massachusetts; Adrian v. GlaxoSmithKline, LLC. In Re: Zofran (Ondansetron) Products Liability Litigation, MDL 2657. (Finn, Mary)
November 5, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GlaxoSmithKline, LLC Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7956840 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Jennifer Adrian. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Flint, Jacob)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adrian v. GlaxoSmithKline, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GlaxoSmithKline, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer M. Stevenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Adrian
Represented By: Jacob A. Flint
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?