Fuller v. Jet Blue Airways Corporation
Plaintiff: Kimberly Fuller
Defendant: Jet Blue Airways Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv12297
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Filing 13 Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER.(Hourihan, Lisa)
December 16, 2019 Filing 12 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Denise J. Casper: Scheduling Conference held on 12/16/2019. Initial disclosures due by 1/15/20. Amended Pleadings due by 2/14/2020. Fact discovery to be completed by 6/30/2020. Summary Judgment Motions to be filed by 8/28/2020. Opposition to be filed by 9/28/20. Status Conference set for 7/13/2020 02:15 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Denise J. Casper(Court Reporter: Debra Joyce at joycedebra@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Chetan Tiwari for the plaintiff. Erik Winton for the defendant.) (Hourihan, Lisa)
December 16, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 (D)(3). (Winton, Erik)
December 6, 2019 Filing 10 First CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Tiwari, Chetan)
December 6, 2019 Filing 9 First JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (Tiwari, Chetan)
November 15, 2019 Filing 8 Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. Standing Order Re: Courtroom Opportunities for Relatively Inexperienced Attorneys(Hourihan, Lisa)
November 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 12/16/2019 02:30 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Denise J. Casper. (Hourihan, Lisa)
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jet Blue Airways Corporation. (Winton, Erik)
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Jet Blue Airways Corporation.(Winton, Erik)
November 8, 2019 Filing 4 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (Halley, Taylor)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 DECLARATION re #1 Notice of Removal, by Devina Dewnarayan by Jet Blue Airways Corporation. (Winton, Erik)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jet Blue Airways Corporation ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7961896 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Pleadings, #2 Exhibit 2 - Docket, #3 Exhibit 3 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Category Sheet)(Winton, Erik)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fuller v. Jet Blue Airways Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Fuller
Represented By: Chetan Tiwari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jet Blue Airways Corporation
Represented By: Erik J. Winton
Represented By: Samantha Abeysekera
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?