Driscoll et al v. McCann et al
Plaintiff: Shaun Driscoll, Cynthia Driscoll and Shawn Driscoll
Defendant: Frank McCann and Kathleen McCann
Case Number: 1:2019cv12302
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Referring Judge: Donald L Cabell
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case RE-Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
December 19, 2019 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing. 12/20/19 Status Conference is cancelled. (Russo, Noreen)
December 19, 2019 Filing 12 Refusal to Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. . (Shuman, Mark)
December 19, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Shawn Driscoll, Cynthia Driscoll. Shawn Driscoll served on 11/15/2019, answer due 12/6/2019; Cynthia Driscoll served on 11/15/2019, answer due 12/6/2019. Acknowledgement filed by Shawn Driscoll; Cynthia Driscoll. (Shuman, Mark)
December 17, 2019 Filing 10 SECOND ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Notification form indicating whether or not the parties have consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge has not been received in the Clerk's Office. The submission of the form is mandatory. Completed forms shall be filed promptly. An extra form is attached to this entry and additional forms can be obtained on the Court's web page at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov / Resources / forms / local forms. NOTICE of Status Conference: Status Conference set for 12/20/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom 23 before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. If the form is filed before the conference - the status shall be cancelled. (Russo, Noreen)
December 10, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by William P. Mekrut on behalf of Frank McCann, Kathleen McCann (Mekrut, William)
December 10, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Notification forms indicating whether or not a party has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge have not been received in the Clerk's Office. The submission of the form is mandatory. Completed forms shall be filed promptly. Additional forms can be obtained on the Court's web page at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov. (Russo, Noreen)
December 10, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Frank McCann.(Garrison, Kathryn)
December 10, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Kathleen McCann.(Garrison, Kathryn)
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Reissued as to Shawn Driscoll. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Russo, Noreen)
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 Letter/request (non-motion) from Mark Shuman, Esq. (Russo, Noreen)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Halley, Taylor)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7963249 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Cynthia Driscoll, Shaun Driscoll. (Attachments: #1 Case Category Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shuman, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Driscoll et al v. McCann et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank McCann
Represented By: William P. Mekrut
Represented By: Kathryn Terrell Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen McCann
Represented By: William P. Mekrut
Represented By: Kathryn Terrell Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaun Driscoll
Represented By: Mark S. Shuman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Driscoll
Represented By: Mark S. Shuman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Driscoll
Represented By: Mark S. Shuman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?