Singh v. McDonald et al
Plaintiff: Mantej Singh
Defendant: Joseph McDonald, Jr., Todd Lyons, U.S. Department of Homeland Security Immigration and Customs Enforcement and William Barr
Respondent: Antone Moniz
Case Number: 1:2019cv12337
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1651
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE by Antone Moniz re #33 Notice (Other) (Jolley, Lance)
December 30, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE by Mantej Singh re #31 MOTION Status Conference (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Recipt of I-360, #2 Exhibit Notice of Class Membership, #3 Exhibit Notice of Class Rights)(Doyle, Kerry)
December 26, 2019 Filing 32 RESPONSE to Motion re #31 MOTION Status Conference filed by William Barr, Todd Lyons, Joseph McDonald, Jr, Antone Moniz, U.S. Department of Homeland Security Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Jolley, Lance)
December 20, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION Status Conference by Mantej Singh.(Doyle, Kerry)
December 18, 2019 Filing 30 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Petitioners Motion for Preliminary Injunction [ECF No. #3 ] is DENIED. Petitioner has not demonstrated his likelihood of success on the merits at this preliminary stage. [P]roving likelihood of success on the merits is the sine qua non of a preliminary injunction. Arborjet, Inc. v. Rainbow Treecare Sci. Advancements, Inc., 794 F.3d 168, 173 (1st Cir. 2015). Preliminary findings of fact and conclusions of law at the preliminary injunction stage, however, are not binding at trial on the merits. Univ. of Tex. v. Camenisch, 451 U.S. 390, 395 (1981). The Court therefore reserves further review of the merits for consideration of Respondents Motion to Dismiss [ECF No. #14 ]. In order to preserve this Courts jurisdiction over this matter, Petitioners removal or deportation is hereby stayed pending the Courts order on Respondents Motion to Dismiss. [ECF No. #14 ]. (Folan, Karen)
December 16, 2019 Filing 29 Letter/request (non-motion) from Petitioner's Counsel . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Grotas, Paul)
December 13, 2019 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Antone Moniz. (Jolley, Lance)
December 13, 2019 Filing 27 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #26 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Folan, Karen)
December 13, 2019 Filing 26 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Petitioner's Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss by Antone Moniz. (Attachments: #1 Reply to Petitioner's Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss)(Jolley, Lance)
December 13, 2019 Filing 25 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. General Order 19-02 [ECF No. #5 ] is a standing procedural order restricting remote access to electronic case records in immigration matters for 30 days after case filing. The parties had 14 days to file objections with the Court and no objections were filed. Accordingly, as thirty days have elapsed since filing and neither party has raised objections, the restriction is hereby removed.(McDonagh, Christina)
December 12, 2019 Filing 24 AMENDED COMPLAINT First against Todd Lyons, Antone Moniz, William Barr, Joseph McDonald, Jr, U.S. Department of Homeland Security Immigration and Customs Enforcement, filed by Mantej Singh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Special Findings SIJS, #2 Exhibit I360 SIJS, #3 Exhibit I485 Permant Resident Application, #4 Exhibit Supplemental Court Filings)(Doyle, Kerry)
December 12, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Kerry E. Doyle on behalf of Mantej Singh (Doyle, Kerry)
December 12, 2019 Filing 22 First MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Mantej Singh. (Doyle, Kerry) (Main Document 22 replaced on 12/12/2019) (McDonagh, Christina).
December 10, 2019 Filing 21 Letter/request (non-motion) from Petitioner's Counsel . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Grotas, Paul)
December 9, 2019 Filing 20 Case List Letter/request (non-motion) from Respondent . (Jolley, Lance)
December 4, 2019 Filing 19 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs: Hearing held on 12/4/2019. Removal rescheduled to 12/18/19. Plaintiff's response to motion due by midday on 12/12/19. (Court Reporter: Kelly Mortellite at mortellite@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Grotas by telephone, Drago, Jolley) (Folan, Karen)
December 3, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Grotas on behalf of Mantej Singh (Grotas, Paul)
December 3, 2019 Filing 17 Letter/request (non-motion) from Petitioner's Counsel . (Grotas, Paul)
December 2, 2019 Filing 16 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The Court hereby ORDERS that Petitioner shall not be moved from the District of Massachusetts pending the Courts order on the jurisdictional issue raised in Respondents Motion #14 to Dismiss. The Court shall hold a hearing on the jurisdictional question on December 4, 2019 at 12:00pm in Courtroom #17.(Folan, Karen)
November 29, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support re #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by William Barr, Todd Lyons, Joseph McDonald, Jr, Antone Moniz, U.S. Department of Homeland Security Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Board Decision)(Jolley, Lance)
November 29, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ( Responses due by 12/13/2019) by William Barr, Todd Lyons, Joseph McDonald, Jr, Antone Moniz, U.S. Department of Homeland Security Immigration and Customs Enforcement.(Jolley, Lance)
November 29, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by Antone Moniz of Intent to Remove (Jolley, Lance)
November 29, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Lance L. Jolley on behalf of Antone Moniz (Jolley, Lance)
November 21, 2019 Filing 11 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. AMENDED SERVICE ORDER re 2241 Petition. Antone Moniz, the Superintendent of the Plymouth County Correctional Facility and the immediate physical custodian of Petitioner, shall be substituted as the sole respondent. The Clerk of this Court shall serve a copy of the petition and the motion for a preliminary injunction upon Superintendent Moniz and the United States Attorney for the District of Massachusetts. The respondent shall, no later than Thursday, December 5, 2019, file responses to the petition and the motion for a preliminary injunction. To give the Court time to consider the matter, unless otherwise ordered by the Court, the petitioner shall not be moved outside the District of Massachusetts without providing the Court 48 hours advance notice of the move and the reason therefor. (PSSA, 3)
November 14, 2019 Filing 10 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Paul Grotas. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina)
November 13, 2019 Filing 9 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER on 2241 petitions regarding detention and removal of the Petitioner from the District of Massachusetts. (PSSA, 3)
November 13, 2019 Filing 8 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER on 2241 petitions regarding detention and removal of the Petitioner from the District of Massachusetts. (PSSA, 3)
November 13, 2019 Filing 7 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. SERVICE ORDER re 2241 Petition. Order entered pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2243 governing Section 2241 cases for service on respondents. The answer or responsive pleading is due no later than 21 days from receipt of this order. (McDonagh, Christina)
November 13, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 General Order 19-02, dated June 1, 2019 regarding Public Access to Immigration Cases Restricted by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(c). (Jones, Sherry)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 Online access to documents in this case is limited to counsel of record only. All documents are available for review in the Office of the Clerk. Counsel of record: please note that you will need to log into CM/ECF to access any documents in this case. (Jones, Sherry)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Mantej Singh.(Drago, Anthony)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Paul Grotas Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7969415 by Mantej Singh.(Drago, Anthony)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number 0101-7969376 Fee status: Filing Fee paid., filed by Mantej Singh. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Drago, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singh v. McDonald et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mantej Singh
Represented By: Anthony Drago, Jr.
Represented By: Paul Grotas
Represented By: Kerry E. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph McDonald, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Antone Moniz
Represented By: Lance L. Jolley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?