O'Meara v. Agin
Plaintiff: Dorrie O'Meara
Trustee: Esq. Warren E. Agin
Case Number: 1:2019cv12420
Filed: November 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Filing 11 Electronic notice to counsel: This civil action has been transferred to the New Hampshire and assigned civil case number 1:20-cv-00053. (Danieli, Chris)
January 8, 2020 Filing 10 Case transferred to the District of New Hampshire;. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet sent to Clerk in that district. (Montes, Mariliz)
January 8, 2020 Filing 9 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. ORDER OF TRANSFER. (Montes, Mariliz)
January 7, 2020 Filing 8 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #1 Motion to Withdraw Reference of this Adversary Proceeding from the Bankruptcy Court and transfer venue of this case to the United States District Court for the District of New Hampshire. (Simeone, Maria)
January 6, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION and JOINT REQUEST TO TRANSFER ADVERSARY PROCEEDING TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF NEW HAMPSHIRE by Warren E. Agin, Dorrie O'Meara. (Koha, David)
December 5, 2019 Filing 6 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #5 Assented-To Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference Responses due by 1/6/2020. (Montes, Mariliz)
December 4, 2019 Filing 5 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to January 6, 2020 to File Response/Reply as to #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference by Warren E. Agin.(Koha, David)
November 27, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
November 25, 2019 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference filed by Dorrie O'Meara. (Coppola, Katelyn)
November 25, 2019 Filing 2 DOCKET SHEET RECEIVED from Bankruptcy Court Record re #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference by Dorrie O'Meara. (Coppola, Katelyn)
November 25, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference by Dorrie O'Meara. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Initial Transmittal)(Coppola, Katelyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Meara v. Agin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Esq. Warren E. Agin
Represented By: John T. Morrier
Represented By: David Koha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorrie O'Meara
Represented By: Joseph B. Lichtblau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?