J-Way Southern, Inc. v. United States Army Corps of Engineers
Plaintiff: J-Way Southern, Inc.
Defendant: United States Army Corps of Engineers
Case Number: 1:2019cv12423
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Marianne B Bowler
Referring Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 41:251
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing. Status Conference previously scheduled for 2/11/2020 before Judge Bowler is CANCELED. (Lara, Miguel)
December 19, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case RE-Assignment. Chief Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
December 19, 2019 Filing 9 Refusal to Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. . (Pinta, Ian)
December 19, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Notification forms indicating whether or not a party has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge have not been received in the Clerk's Office. The submission of the form is mandatory. Completed forms shall be filed promptly. Additional forms can be obtained on the Court's web page at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov. NOTICE of Status Conference Status Conference set for 2/11/2020 02:00 PM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Putnam, Harold)
December 18, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney by J-Way Southern, Inc.. United States Army Corps of Engineers served on 12/9/2019, answer due 2/7/2020. (Lara, Miguel)
December 18, 2019 Filing 7 DISREGARD- SUMMONS Returned Executed by J-Way Southern, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Proof of Service)(Pinta, Ian) Modified on 1/15/2020 as document was incorrectly filed. (Lara, Miguel).
December 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Anita Johnson on behalf of United States Army Corps of Engineers (Johnson, Anita)
December 12, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by J-Way Southern, Inc.. (Pinta, Ian)
November 27, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra)
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary)
November 27, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Weld, Jr on behalf of J-Way Southern, Inc. (Weld, Christopher)
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND JURY TRIAL DEMAND against United States Army Corps of Engineers Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7991290 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by J-Way Southern, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Part 1 of 2), #2 Exhibit A (Part 2 of 2), #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Category Form Sheet)(Pinta, Ian) (Modified on 11/29/2019 to Correct Docket Text) (Paine, Matthew).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J-Way Southern, Inc. v. United States Army Corps of Engineers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Army Corps of Engineers
Represented By: Anita Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J-Way Southern, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Weld, Jr.
Represented By: Ian J. Pinta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?