Folkman v. U.S. Department of State
Plaintiff: Theodore J Folkman
Defendant: U.S. Department of State
Case Number: 1:2019cv12440
Filed: December 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Marianne B Bowler
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2020 Filing 21 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ORDER entered. FINAL JUDGMENT. In light of the parties' settlement (Docket Entry #19 ), it is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that this action be DISMISSED with prejudice subject to the right of either party to move within thirty days, for good cause shown, to reopen the case for further proceedings. (Patton, Christine)
March 23, 2020 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing. Noting that this matter has settled, 3/25/2020 Scheduling Conference is cancelled. (Putnam, Harold)
March 13, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Settlement by Theodore J Folkman (Folkman, Theodore)
March 5, 2020 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING. Scheduling Conference reset for 3/25/2020 02:00 PM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Putnam, Harold)
February 26, 2020 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING. Scheduling Conference reset for 3/26/2020 02:30 PM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Putnam, Harold)
February 26, 2020 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #16 Motion to Continue. (Bowler, Marianne)
February 26, 2020 Filing 16 Joint MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference to 3/26/2020 by Theodore J Folkman.(Folkman, Theodore)
February 3, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by U.S. Department of State.(Johnson, Anita)
January 29, 2020 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference reset for 2/27/2020 02:00 PM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Putnam, Harold)
January 28, 2020 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time. The deputy clerk, Harold Putnam, Esq., will set a new date. (Bowler, Marianne)
January 27, 2020 Filing 13 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 2/1/2020 to file Answer and Reset Scheduling Conference by U.S. Department of State.(Johnson, Anita)
January 27, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney by Theodore J Folkman. U.S. Department of State served on 12/20/2019, answer due 2/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Folkman, Theodore)
January 27, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Theodore J Folkman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Folkman, Theodore)
January 24, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina Nicole Lindberg on behalf of Theodore J Folkman (Lindberg, Christina)
January 10, 2020 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 1/28/2020 02:15 PM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Putnam, Harold)
January 6, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT by all parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Theodore J Folkman.. (Folkman, Theodore)
January 2, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Anita Johnson on behalf of U.S. Department of State (Johnson, Anita)
December 18, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Reissued as to U.S. Department of State. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Putnam, Harold)
December 18, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #4 Motion for Summons. (Putnam, Harold)
December 17, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Issue Summons by Theodore J Folkman. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Summons)(Folkman, Theodore)
December 3, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Coppola, Katelyn)
December 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary)
December 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of State Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7994922 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Theodore J Folkman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil action cover sheet, #3 Local category sheet)(Folkman, Theodore)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Folkman v. U.S. Department of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodore J Folkman
Represented By: Theodore J. Folkman
Represented By: Christina Nicole Lindberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of State
Represented By: Anita Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?