Barber, Individually and as Natual Parent and Guardian of H.B., a minor et al v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC d/b/a GlaxoSmithKline
Plaintiff: H. B., a minor, Dena Barber, Individually and as Natual Parent and Guardian of H.B., a minor and Payton Barber, Individually and as Natual Parent and Guardian of H.B., a minor
Defendant: GlaxoSmithKline LLC d/b/a GlaxoSmithKline
Case Number: 1:2019cv12448
Filed: December 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2020 Filing 13 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: Status Conference held on 1/27/2020.1) The Court heard updates on the current total of federal and state filings.2) The Court heard updates on GSK's citizen petition to the FDA and related discovery requests, including those for communications between GSK and Novartis.3) The Court heard updates on discovery related to Dr. Zambelli-Weiner's report. 4) The Court heard updates on supplemental expert reports produced in response to new scientific data that has become available. 5) The parties alerted the Court of their proposed amendments to the pretrial scheduling order in Rodriguez, 15-cv-13762. An amended version of that order will issue shortly. (Court Reporter: Valerie OHara at vaohara@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Various) Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02657-FDS et al.(Bono, Christine)
January 24, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE TO TELEPHONE PARTICIPANTS: Please use the following Participant line: (877) 876-9174 and Conference ID: ZOFRANMDL, for the Status Conference set for 1/27/2020 at 1:30 PM.REMINDER: Counsel who wish to address the court by telephone must notify the courtroom deputy by email prior to the conference. Counsel who are not addressing the Court, please mute your telephones, so that you may hear the proceeding but other participants will not hear background noise or interference. Please do not put your telephone on hold. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02657-FDS et al.(Bono, Christine)
January 15, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE re 1791 Motion Hearing set for 1/16/2020 at 10:30 AM. Counsel may attend the hearing by telephone. Please use the following dial-in information: DIAL IN: 1-888-675-2535, ACCESS CODE: 7629998. REMINDER: Your telephone line should be MUTED, so that you may hear the proceeding but other participants will not hear any background noise or interference. Please do not put your telephone on hold. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02657-FDS et al.(Bono, Christine)
January 14, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE re 1774 Status Conference and Motion Hearing set for 1/15/2020 at 10:00 AM. Counsel may attend the hearing by telephone. Please use the following dial-in information: DIAL IN: 1-888-675-2535, ACCESS CODE: 7629998. REMINDER: Your telephone line should be MUTED, so that you may hear the proceeding but other participants will not hear any background noise or interference. Please do not put your telephone on hold. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02657-FDS et al. (Bono, Christine)
December 16, 2019 Filing 9 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: Status Conference held on 12/16/2019.1) The Court heard updates on the current total of federal and state filings.2) The Court heard the parties responses to its letter to the FDA, which was sent on December 13, 2019, regarding GSKs citizen petition (FDA-2019-P-5151-0001). 3) The Court heard updates on discovery regarding communications between GSK and Novartis. GSK made a supplemental production on December 13, 2019, and anticipates completing production by December 31, 2019. 4) The Court heard updates on discovery related to Dr. Zambelli-Weiners report. The parties currently intend to schedule her additional deposition for early January 2020.5) The Court set status conferences for 1/15/2020 10:00 a.m., 2/20/2020 1:30 p.m., and 3/18/2020 1:30 p.m. (Court Reporter: Linda Walsh at lwalshsteno@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Various) Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02657-FDS et al. (Bono, Christine)
December 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO TELEPHONE PARTICIPANTS: Please use the following Participant line: (877) 876-9174 and Conference ID: Zofran, for the Status Conference set for 12/16/2019 at 1:30 PM. REMINDER: Counsel who wish to address the court by telephone must notify the courtroom deputy by email prior to the conference. Counsel who are not addressing the Court, please mute your telephones, so that you may hear the proceeding but other participants will not hear background noise or interference. Please do not put your telephone on hold. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02657-FDS et al.(Bono, Christine)
December 10, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Dena Barber, Individually and as Natual Parent and Guardian of H.B., a minor, H. B., a minor, Payton Barber, Individually and as Natual Parent and Guardian of H.B., a minor. GlaxoSmithKline LLC d/b/a GlaxoSmithKline waiver sent on 12/4/2019, answer due 2/3/2020. (Rice Ervin, Ann)
December 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer M. Stevenson on behalf of GlaxoSmithKline LLC d/b/a GlaxoSmithKline (Stevenson, Jennifer)
December 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Ann E. Rice Ervin on behalf of H. B., a minor, Dena Barber, Individually and as Natual Parent and Guardian of H.B., a minor, Payton Barber, Individually and as Natual Parent and Guardian of H.B., a minor (Rice Ervin, Ann)
December 4, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to GlaxoSmithKline LLC d/b/a GlaxoSmithKline. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry)
December 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF MDL CASE OPENED, Direct file in the District of Massachusetts; Barber, Individually and as Natural Parent and Guardian of H.B., a minor, et al. v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC d/b/a GlasoSmithKline. In Re: Zofran (Ondansetron) Products Liability Litigation, MDL 2657. (Finn, Mary)
December 4, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
December 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7996946 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by H. B., a minor, Dena Barber, Individually and as Natual Parent and Guardian of H.B., a minor, Payton Barber, Individually and as Natual Parent and Guardian of H.B., a minor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Baden, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barber, Individually and as Natual Parent and Guardian of H.B., a minor et al v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC d/b/a GlaxoSmithKline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H. B., a minor
Represented By: Kimberly Barone Baden
Represented By: Ann E. Rice Ervin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dena Barber, Individually and as Natual Parent and Guardian of H.B., a minor
Represented By: Kimberly Barone Baden
Represented By: Ann E. Rice Ervin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Payton Barber, Individually and as Natual Parent and Guardian of H.B., a minor
Represented By: Kimberly Barone Baden
Represented By: Ann E. Rice Ervin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GlaxoSmithKline LLC d/b/a GlaxoSmithKline
Represented By: Jennifer M. Stevenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?