Sabree v. Mitchell
Petitioner: G Saif Sabree
Respondent: Superintendent Lisa A. Mitchell
Case Number: 1:2019cv12454
Filed: December 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2020 Filing 10 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. SERVICE ORDER re 2254 Petition. Order entered pursuant to R.4 of the Rules governing Section 2254 cases for service on respondents. Answer/responsive pleading due w/in 21 days of receipt of this order.(Kelly, Danielle)
January 28, 2020 Filing 9 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER: Petitioner's Motion to Appoint Counsel #2 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Petitioner may renew his motion after Respondent has filed a response to Petitioner's habeas petition. (Kelly, Danielle)
January 10, 2020 Filing 8 Filing fee/payment: $5.00, receipt number 1BST078171 for #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254), #4 PSSA Order 4 (Coppola, Katelyn)
December 27, 2019 Filing 7 Letter from Customer Service Department to G. Saif Sabree (response to Sabree Letter ECF No 5) re: filing fee(s). (PSSA, 4)
December 20, 2019 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by G Saif Sabree. (Kelly, Danielle)
December 20, 2019 Filing 5 Letter/request (non-motion) from Pro Se Petitioner G Saif Sabree. (Kelly, Danielle) Modified on 12/23/2019 (Kelly, Danielle).
December 9, 2019 Filing 4 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. Procedural Order regarding resolution of filling fee. Petitioner must respond within 21 days. (PSSA, 4)
December 4, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
December 2, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by G Saif Sabree.(Castilla, Francis)
December 2, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28:2254, filed by G Saif Sabree. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Castilla, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sabree v. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Superintendent Lisa A. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: G Saif Sabree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?