Chau v. SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC. et al
Plaintiff: Dine Chau
Defendant: SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC. and U.S. Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2019cv12473
Filed: December 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2020 Filing 19 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #18 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to February 7, 2020 to Respond to Motion to Dismiss Complaint. (McDonagh, Christina)
January 22, 2020 Filing 18 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to February 7, 2020 to Respond to Motion to Dismiss Complaint by Dine Chau.(Potvin, Marc)
January 14, 2020 Filing 17 Withdrawal of motion: #11 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction filed by Dine Chau.. (Potvin, Marc)
January 10, 2020 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC., U.S. Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Seeley, Donald)
January 10, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ( Responses due by 1/24/2020) by SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC., U.S. Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance)(Seeley, Donald)
December 31, 2019 Filing 14 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #13 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to January 10, 2020. (Vieira, Leonardo)
December 30, 2019 Filing 13 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to January 10, 2020 to ENLARGE RESPONSE DEADLINES by SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC., U.S. Bank, N.A..(Seeley, Donald)
December 23, 2019 Filing 12 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #11 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction. Responses due by 12:00 PM 12/31/2019 (Lima, Christine)
December 23, 2019 Filing 11 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction by Dine Chau. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Original Motion for TRO/PI, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed TRO/PI, #3 Affidavit Plaintiff's Affidavit, #4 Exhibit Pl's Aff. Ex. 1, #5 Exhibit Pl's Aff. Ex. 2, #6 Exhibit Pl's Aff. Ex. 3, #7 Exhibit Pl's Aff. Ex. 4, #8 Exhibit Pl's Aff. Ex. 5, #9 Exhibit Pl's Aff. Ex. 6, #10 Exhibit Pl's Aff. Ex. 7, #11 Exhibit Pl's Aff. Ex. 8, #12 Exhibit Pl's Aff. Ex. 9, #13 Affidavit Plaintiff Counsel Affidavit, #14 Exhibit Counsel Aff. Ex. 1, #15 Exhibit Counsel Aff. Ex. 2, #16 Exhibit Counsel Aff. Ex. 3, #17 Exhibit Counsel Aff. Ex. 4.A-C, #18 Exhibit Counsel Aff. Ex. 5, #19 Exhibit Counsel Aff. Ex. 6, #20 Exhibit Counsel Aff. Ex. 7, #21 Exhibit Counsel Aff. Ex. 8, #22 Exhibit Counsel Aff. Ex. 9, #23 Exhibit Counsel Aff. Ex. 10, #24 Exhibit Counsel Aff. Ex. 11, #25 Exhibit Counsel Aff. Ex. 12, #26 Exhibit Counsel Aff. Ex. 13, #27 Exhibit Counsel Aff. Ex. 14, #28 Exhibit Counsel Aff. Ex. 15, #29 Exhibit Counsel Aff. Ex. 16, #30 Exhibit Counsel Aff. Ex. 17, #31 Exhibit Counsel Aff. Ex. 18, #32 Exhibit Counsel Aff. Ex. 19, #33 Exhibit Counsel Aff. Ex. 20, #34 Exhibit Counsel Aff. Ex. 21, #35 Exhibit Counsel Aff. Ex. 22.A-B, #36 Exhibit Counsel Aff. Ex. 23, #37 Exhibit Counsel Aff. Ex. 24)(Potvin, Marc)
December 10, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey D. Adams on behalf of SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC., U.S. Bank, N.A. (Adams, Jeffrey)
December 10, 2019 Filing 9 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #6 Motion for Extension of Time. Response due by 12/30/2019. (Vieira, Leonardo)
December 9, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC., U.S. Bank, N.A.. (Seeley, Donald)
December 9, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC., U.S. Bank, N.A.. (Seeley, Donald)
December 9, 2019 Filing 6 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 12/30/2019 to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint , Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 12/30/2019 to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint ( Responses due by 12/23/2019) by SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC., U.S. Bank, N.A..(Seeley, Donald)
December 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald W. Seeley, Jr on behalf of SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC., U.S. Bank, N.A. (Seeley, Donald)
December 6, 2019 Filing 4 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (Kelly, Danielle)
December 6, 2019 Filing 3 EXHIBIT re #1 Notice of Removal,, Exhibit A to Notice of Removal by SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC., U.S. Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Part 2 continued)(Seeley, Donald) (Main Document 3 replaced on 12/9/2019) to upload redacted documents at request of counsel (Vieira, Leonardo). (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/9/2019) to upload redacted documents at request of counsel (Vieira, Leonardo).
December 6, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Danieli, Chris)
December 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC., U.S. Bank, N.A., as Trustee, on behalf of the holders of the J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Trust 2006-WMC3 Asset Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-WMC3 ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8002677 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Category Form)(Seeley, Donald). Modified on 12/6/2019: Replaced civil cover sheet and category form to flatten file (Kelly, Danielle).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chau v. SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC.
Represented By: Donald W. Seeley, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Donald W. Seeley, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dine Chau
Represented By: Marc W. Potvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?