Lewis v. Hill et al
Plaintiff: Steven P Lewis
Defendant: ClosedRPLA Holdings, Inc., Margie Joanne Hill, Jeffrey Stoller, Matthew A Hill and David Robert Moore
Case Number: 1:2019cv12500
Filed: December 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Douglas P Woodlock
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2020 Filing 12 First Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (ECF 1-3) filed by Steven P Lewis. (Upton, Jeffrey)
January 24, 2020 Filing 11 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER granting #10 Assented to Motion to Extend Response Deadline to Respond to #9 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (ECF 1-3) until 2/6/2020. (Beatty, Barbara)
January 23, 2020 Filing 10 First MOTION for Extension of Time to 02/06/2020 to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (ECF 1-3) by Steven P Lewis.(Upton, Jeffrey)
January 9, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (ECF 1-3) by ClosedRPLA Holdings, Inc., Margie Joanne Hill, Matthew A Hill, David Robert Moore, Jeffrey Stoller. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #2 Text of Proposed Order on Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit A - Matthew Hill Declaration, #4 Exhibit A-1 - Stock Purchase Agreement, #5 Exhibit A-2 - Notice of Redemption, #6 Exhibit A-3 - Sales Rep Agreement, #7 Exhibit B - Stoller Declaration, #8 Exhibit C - Margie Hill Declaration, #9 Exhibit D - Moore Declaration)(Buttaro, Andrew)
December 16, 2019 Filing 8 STATE COURT Record All Defendants.. (Buttaro, Andrew)
December 13, 2019 Filing 7 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER granting #6 Assented to Motion to Extend Response Deadline until 1/9/2020. (Beatty, Barbara)
December 12, 2019 Filing 6 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 1/9/2020 to File Responsive Pleading by ClosedRPLA Holdings, Inc., Margie Joanne Hill, Matthew A Hill, David Robert Moore, Jeffrey Stoller.(Buttaro, Andrew)
December 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles L. Solomont on behalf of ClosedRPLA Holdings, Inc., Margie Joanne Hill, Matthew A Hill, David Robert Moore, Jeffrey Stoller (Solomont, Charles)
December 12, 2019 Filing 4 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (Halley, Taylor)
December 12, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Douglas P. Woodlock assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
December 12, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ClosedRPLA Holdings, Inc.. (Buttaro, Andrew)
December 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ClosedRPLA Holdings, Inc., Margie Joanne Hill, Matthew A Hill, David Robert Moore, Jeffrey Stoller ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8010891 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D)(Buttaro, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Hill et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ClosedRPLA Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Charles L. Solomont
Represented By: Andrew M. Buttaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margie Joanne Hill
Represented By: Charles L. Solomont
Represented By: Andrew M. Buttaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Stoller
Represented By: Charles L. Solomont
Represented By: Andrew M. Buttaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew A Hill
Represented By: Charles L. Solomont
Represented By: Andrew M. Buttaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Robert Moore
Represented By: Charles L. Solomont
Represented By: Andrew M. Buttaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven P Lewis
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Upton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?