Dickey v. U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.,
Plaintiff: James Dickey
Defendant: 497 East Fourth Street LLC, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., As Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust, Andrew Schena, Commonwelath Cooperative Bank, David O'Donnell, Patricia Gillespie and U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2019cv12504
Filed: December 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2020 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Support re #19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by 497 East Fourth Street LLC, Andrew Schena. (Marshall, Michael)
February 7, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by 497 East Fourth Street LLC, Andrew Schena.(Marshall, Michael)
February 5, 2020 Filing 18 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM U.S. Bank Trust N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust's Motion to Dismiss Complaint with Prejudice Responses due by 3/3/2020 (Halley, Taylor)
February 3, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM U.S. Bank Trust N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust's Motion to Dismiss Complaint with Prejudice by James Dickey.(Halley, Taylor) (Main Document 17 replaced on 2/5/2020) (Paine, Matthew).
January 27, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T. Marshall on behalf of 497 East Fourth Street LLC, Andrew Schena (Marshall, Michael)
January 17, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM U.S. Bank Trust N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust's Motion to Dismiss Complaint with Prejudice by U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., As Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Sandler, Erick)
January 6, 2020 Filing 14 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiff's response to defendants' Motion to Dismiss is due by 2/3/2020. (Bono, Christine)
January 3, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with certificate of service by James Dickey.(Halley, Taylor)
December 31, 2019 Filing 12 STATE COURT Record. (Sandler, Erick)
December 19, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with certificate of service filed by Patricia Gillespie, David O'Donnell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-I, #2 Affidavit Declaration authenticating exhibits)(Krill, Giles)
December 19, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with certificate of service by Patricia Gillespie, David O'Donnell.(Krill, Giles)
December 17, 2019 Filing 9 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Response due 1/20/2020. (Bono, Christine)
December 17, 2019 Filing 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to January 20, 2020 to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint by U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., As Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust.(Sandler, Erick)
December 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Giles L. Krill on behalf of Patricia Gillespie, David O'Donnell (Krill, Giles)
December 13, 2019 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Duplicate Filing Fee and Credit for Refund, for $400.00 paid on 12/12/2019, receipt number 0101-8011418. (Tran, Henry)
December 12, 2019 Filing 6 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (Halley, Taylor)
December 12, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Case was randomly assigned due to 17-10009-PBS was close over two (2) years ago - 11/20/2017). (Finn, Mary)
December 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., As Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8011812 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Category Form)(Sandler, Erick)
December 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Bruynell Manesse on behalf of U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., As Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust (Manesse, Melissa)
December 12, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., As Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp for U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., As Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust.. (Sandler, Erick)
December 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Appearance by Erick M. Sandler on behalf of U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., As Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust (Sandler, Erick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dickey v. U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 497 East Fourth Street LLC
Represented By: Michael T. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., As Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust
Represented By: Erick M. Sandler
Represented By: Melissa Bruynell Manesse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Schena
Represented By: Michael T. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwelath Cooperative Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David O'Donnell
Represented By: Giles L. Krill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Gillespie
Represented By: Giles L. Krill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.
Represented By: Erick M. Sandler
Represented By: Melissa Bruynell Manesse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Dickey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?