Beauchamp v. Silva
Petitioner: Robert C. Beauchamp
Respondent: Steven Silva
Case Number: 1:2019cv12524
Filed: December 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2020 Filing 11 Copy re 10 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply mailed to Robert C. Beauchamp on 2/5/20. (Lima, Christine)
February 5, 2020 Filing 10 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (Lima, Christine)
February 4, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION Relief from the Conference Requirement in Local Rule 7.1 by Steven Silva.(Thornton, Gabriel)
February 4, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) by Steven Silva.(Thornton, Gabriel)
February 4, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by Steven Silva Regarding Existence of Victim (Thornton, Gabriel)
February 4, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Gabriel T. Thornton on behalf of Steven Silva (Thornton, Gabriel)
January 15, 2020 Filing 5 Letter/request (non-motion) from Robert C. Beauchamp. (Vieira, Leonardo)
January 15, 2020 Filing 4 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. SERVICE ORDER re 2254 Petition. Order entered pursuant to R.4 of the Rules governing Section 2254 cases for service on respondents. Answer/responsive pleading due w/in 21 days of receipt of this order. (Vieira, Leonardo)
December 17, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
December 16, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254), filed by Robert C. Beauchamp. (Attachments: #1 Attachments, #2 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Form)(McDonagh, Christina) Modified on 12/17/2019 (McDonagh, Christina).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beauchamp v. Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Steven Silva
Represented By: Gabriel T. Thornton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert C. Beauchamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?