Block & Leviton LLP v. Federal Trade Commission
Plaintiff: Block & Leviton LLP
Defendant: Federal Trade Commission
Intervenor Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv12539
Filed: December 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2020 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC ENDORSEMENT re #16 ADOPTING - REVISED JOINT STATEMENT re: scheduling conference. ORDERED: Deadline for amendments to pleadings February 17, 2020; Deadline for Defendant to produce first batch of documents to Plaintiff with accompanying Vaughn index due by April 15, 2020; Deadline for Defendant to file Summary Judgment and Vaughn index for remaining document due by 5/15/2021; Opposition by Plaintiff and any cross motions for summary judgment due by 6/5/2020; Deadline for Defendant to file its opposition to Plaintiffs motion for summary judgment due by 6/26/2020. (Molloy, Maryellen) Modified on 2/25/2020 (Molloy, Maryellen).
February 21, 2020 Filing 16 JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference Regarding Revised Proposed Case Schedule. (Leviton, Jason)
February 20, 2020 Filing 15 Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered granting #13 Motion to Intervene. Allowed, without opposition, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ.P. 24(a)(2) and 24(b)(1)(B). (McDonagh, Christina)
February 19, 2020 Filing 17 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Patti B. Saris: Scheduling Conference held on 2/19/2020....#10 JOINT STATEMENT NOT ADOPTED....parties shall submit an Amended Joint Statement on or before 2/26/2020 for court's approval.(law clerk G. Gohike covered for M. Molloy) (Court Reporter: Lee Marzilli at leemarz@aol.com.) (Molloy, Maryellen)
February 18, 2020 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION to Intervene filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lipshutz, Joshua)
February 18, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Intervene by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lipshutz, Joshua)
February 10, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Weida, Jason)
February 10, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Block & Leviton LLP.(Milgroom, Lauren)
February 10, 2020 Filing 10 JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (Milgroom, Lauren)
January 24, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference.... Scheduling Conference set for 2/19/2020 09:45 AM in Courtroom 19 before Judge Patti B. Saris. (Molloy, Maryellen) (Main Document 9 replaced on 1/27/2020) (Molloy, Maryellen).
January 21, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Federal Trade Commission.(Weida, Jason)
January 13, 2020 Filing 7 Answer deadline reset for Federal Trade Commission, due by 1/21/2020. (Lara, Miguel)
January 13, 2020 Filing 6 Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered granting #5 MOTION to Set 30-Day Response Deadline for Defendant's Response to Complaint in Accordance with FOIA, 5 USC 552(A)(4)(C). (Lara, Miguel)
January 10, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Set 30-Day Response Deadline for Defendant's Response to Complaint in Accordance with FOIA, 5 USC 552(A)(4)(C) by Block & Leviton LLP.(Milgroom, Lauren)
January 10, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Block & Leviton LLP. (Milgroom, Lauren)
December 18, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Federal Trade Commission. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra)
December 18, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
December 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Federal Trade Commission Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8020470 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Block & Leviton LLP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Leviton, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Block & Leviton LLP v. Federal Trade Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Block & Leviton LLP
Represented By: Jason M. Leviton
Represented By: Lauren G. Milgroom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Trade Commission
Represented By: Jason C. Weida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua S. Lipshutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?