American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts et al v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: Lawyers for Civil Rights and American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security and United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Case Number: 1:2019cv12564
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Marianne B Bowler
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2020 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 3/9/2020 11:45 AM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Putnam, Harold)
January 27, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement.(Johnson, Anita)
January 15, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT by all parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts, Lawyers for Civil Rights.. (Milgroom, Lauren)
January 15, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts, Lawyers for Civil Rights. (Milgroom, Lauren)
January 13, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Anita Johnson on behalf of United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Johnson, Anita)
December 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel L. McFadden on behalf of American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts (McFadden, Daniel)
December 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (adminn, )
December 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Segal on behalf of American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts (Segal, Matthew)
December 23, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION Set 30-Day Deadline for Defendants Response by American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts, Lawyers for Civil Rights.(Milgroom, Lauren)
December 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8026884 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts, Lawyers for Civil Rights. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit)(Milgroom, Lauren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts et al v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Anita Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Anita Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawyers for Civil Rights
Represented By: Lauren G. Milgroom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts
Represented By: Lauren G. Milgroom
Represented By: Daniel L. McFadden
Represented By: Matthew Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?