Pina v. Silva
Petitioner: Emmanuel Pina
Respondent: Steven Silva
Case Number: 1:2019cv12583
Filed: December 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2020 Filing 10 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER: ALLOWING #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Respondent's answer due 2/28/2020 (Kelly, Danielle)
February 14, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to 2/28/20 to File Answer re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) by Steven Silva.(Reardon, Susanne)
January 28, 2020 Filing 8 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. SERVICE ORDER re 2254 Petition. Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 cases, the Clerk of this Court is hereby ordered to serve a copy of the Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus by mailing copies of the same to the Respondent and the Attorney General for the Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Attention: Chief of the Appellate Division, Office of the Attorney General, One Ashburton Place, 18th Floor, Boston, MA 021081598.It is further ordered that the Respondent shall, within 21 days of receipt of this Order, file an answer (or other proper responsive pleading) to the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. The answer (or other responsive pleading) must also include a statement notifying this Court of the existence of any victim or victims as defined by 18 USC 3771.This court further requests the Respondent, as part of the return, to file such documents which reflect on the issue as to whether Petitioner exhausted available state remedies with respect to the matters raised by the Petition. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Kelly, Danielle)
January 27, 2020 Filing 7 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (PSSA, 5)
January 8, 2020 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Emmanuel Pina. (Vieira, Leonardo)
January 8, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Emmanuel Pina.(Vieira, Leonardo)
December 27, 2019 Filing 4 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. Procedural Order regarding resolution of filling fee. The motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is denied without prejudice. Petitioner must respond within 21 days. (PSSA, 5)
December 24, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (adminn, )
December 23, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Emmanuel Pina.(Castilla, Francis)
December 23, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28:2254, filed by Emmanuel Pina.(Castilla, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pina v. Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Emmanuel Pina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Steven Silva
Represented By: Susanne G. Reardon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?