In Re. Internal Revenue Service et al
Trustee: Joseph H. Baldiga, Tr and John Fitzgerald
Appellant: Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 1:2020cv10156
Filed: January 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2020 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for #11 Appellee's Brief. Counsel who filed this document are requested to submit a courtesy copy of it to the Clerk's Office. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy and reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF. (Lima, Christine)
March 18, 2020 Filing 11 Appellee's BRIEF by Joseph H. Baldiga, Tr. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Foley, Kate)
March 5, 2020 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for #9 Appellant's Brief. Counsel who filed this document are requested to submit a courtesy copy of it to the Clerk's Office. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy and reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF. (Lima, Christine)
March 4, 2020 Filing 9 Appellant's BRIEF by Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Murphy, Edward)
February 19, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC Bankruptcy Scheduling Order Appellant Brief due by 3/4/2020. Appellee Brief due by 3/18/2020. Appellant Reply Brief due by 4/1/2020. (Vieira, Leonardo)
February 19, 2020 Filing 7 Bankruptcy Record Received: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Attachments: #1 929 Part 1, #2 929 Part 1.1, #3 929 Part 2, #4 929 Part 3, #5 929 Transmittal)(Vieira, Leonardo)
February 19, 2020 Filing 6 Bankruptcy Record Received: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Attachments: #1 927 Part 4, #2 927 Part 5)(Vieira, Leonardo)
February 19, 2020 Filing 5 Bankruptcy Record Received: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Attachments: #1 927 Part 2, #2 927 Part 2.1)(Vieira, Leonardo) (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/19/2020) (Vieira, Leonardo). (Attachment 2 replaced on 2/19/2020) (Vieira, Leonardo).
February 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kate P. Foley on behalf of Joseph H. Baldiga, Tr (Foley, Kate)
January 27, 2020 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. (adminn, )
January 23, 2020 Filing 2 Copy of Bankruptcy Docket Received: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Coppola, Katelyn)
January 23, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 12-13862. File received (Attachments: #1 Initial Transmittal)(Coppola, Katelyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re. Internal Revenue Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Joseph H. Baldiga, Tr
Represented By: Joseph H. Baldiga
Represented By: Christine E. Devine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: John Fitzgerald
Represented By: Jennifer L. Hertz
Represented By: Heather A. Sprague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Edward J. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?