Hawkinson v. Immigration and Customs Enforcement et al
Plaintiff: Pro Se Party John A. Hawkinson
Defendant: Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Department of Justice, Department of Homeland Security and Executive Office for Immigration Review
Case Number: 1:2020cv10189
Filed: January 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to April 6, 2020 to File Answer or Otherwise Respond : non-opposition with request for scheduling conference filed by John A. Hawkinson. (Hawkinson, John)
March 6, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to April 6, 2020 to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Immigration and Customs Enforcement.(Sady, Michael)
February 10, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Sady on behalf of Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Sady, Michael)
February 6, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John A. Hawkinson. Department of Homeland Security served on 2/6/2020, answer due 3/9/2020; Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 2/6/2020, answer due 3/9/2020., SUMMONS Returned Executed by John A. Hawkinson. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certified receipt for IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, #2 Certified receipt for DEPT. OF HOMELAND SECURITY)(Hawkinson, John)
February 5, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John A. Hawkinson. Department of Justice served on 2/5/2020, answer due 3/6/2020., SUMMONS Returned Executed by John A. Hawkinson. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certified receipt for DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE)(Hawkinson, John)
February 5, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John A. Hawkinson. All Defendants., SUMMONS Returned Executed by John A. Hawkinson. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certified receipt for ATTORNEY GENERAL (all defendants, pursuant to FRCP4(i)(1)(B)))(Hawkinson, John)
February 4, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John A. Hawkinson. (Hawkinson, John)
February 4, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney by John A. Hawkinson. Department of Homeland Security served on 1/31/2020, answer due 3/2/2020; Department of Justice served on 1/31/2020, answer due 3/2/2020; Executive Office for Immigration Review served on 1/31/2020, answer due 3/2/2020; Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 1/31/2020, answer due 3/2/2020. (Hawkinson, John)
February 3, 2020 Filing 8 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: "The motion is DENIED without prejudice. The motion requests an order directing respondents to follow the requirements of a federal statute. No court involvement is required unless the statutory requirement is not followed." ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #3 Motion without prejudice. (Bono, Christine)
February 3, 2020 Filing 7 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #2 Motion for leave to electronically file Pro Se. The court grants permission on the condition that the plaintiff satisfies all applicable training and other requirements for pro se litigants as stated in the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures, Page 5. The plaintiff is directed to complete the registration form accessible at https://public.mad.uscourts.gov/ecfreg.html (Bono, Christine)
January 31, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Kelly, Danielle)
January 31, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
January 31, 2020 Filing 4 Filing fee/payment: $ 400.00, receipt number 1BST078479 for #1 Complaint, (Currie, Haley)
January 31, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Set 30-Day Time For Answer Pursuant To Freedom of Information Act, 5 USC S552(a)(4)(C) by John A. Hawkinson. (Kelly, Danielle)
January 31, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to file electronically Pro Se by John A. Hawkinson.(Kelly, Danielle)
January 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Injunctive Relief against All Defendants, filed by John A. Hawkinson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Cover Letter, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Category Form)(Kelly, Danielle).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hawkinson v. Immigration and Customs Enforcement et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Michael P. Sady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Justice
Represented By: Michael P. Sady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Michael P. Sady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executive Office for Immigration Review
Represented By: Michael P. Sady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pro Se Party John A. Hawkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?