Rucinski v. CSX Transportation, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jon E. Rucinski
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv10222
Filed: February 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45 U.S.C. ยง 51
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2020 Filing 14 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial disclosures to be completed by 6/6/2020; amended pleadings due by 6/6/2020; fact discovery to be completed by 12/7/2020; dispositive motions due by 5/14/2021. A Status Conference is set for 12/8/2020 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 13 before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Montes, Mariliz)
March 27, 2020 Filing 13 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re #12 JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference. The Court ADOPTS the #12 Joint Statement CANCELS the in person Rule 16 Conference on April 6, 2020, at the request of the parties and schedules a status conference for December 8, 2020 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 13 before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin.(Montes, Mariliz)
March 27, 2020 Filing 12 JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (Leibensperger, H. David)
March 12, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. A Scheduling Conference has been set for 4/6/2020 02:15 PM in Courtroom 3 before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Attachments: #1 Scheduling order sample, #2 standing order on summary judgment)(Simeone, Maria)
March 9, 2020 Filing 10 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added P. Matthew Darby. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Montes, Mariliz)
March 9, 2020 Filing 9 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added H. David Leibensperger. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Montes, Mariliz)
March 6, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of P. Matthew Darby Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8143896 by Jon E. Rucinski.(Gilzean, Jonathan)
March 6, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of H. David Leibensperger Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8143843 by Jon E. Rucinski.(Gilzean, Jonathan)
March 4, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CSX Transportation, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent CSX Corporation for CSX Transportation, Inc... (Powell, Francis)
March 4, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by CSX Transportation, Inc..(Powell, Francis)
February 19, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed CSX Transportation, Inc. served on 2/13/2020, answer due 3/5/2020. (Gilzean, Jonathan)
February 5, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CSX Transportation, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra)
February 5, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
February 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT And Jury Demand against CSX Transportation, Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8090772 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Jon rucinski. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Category Sheet)(Gilzean, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rucinski v. CSX Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon E. Rucinski
Represented By: Jonathan E. Gilzean
Represented By: H. David Leibensperger
Represented By: P. Matthew Darby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Francis R. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?