Snyder et al v. Contracted Medical for the DOC et al
Plaintiff: Joanna M. Snyder and Jennifer Donahue
Defendant: Brian Damlon, Taylor MaClellan, Christi Ladouceur, Grace Muturi, Contracted Medical for the DOC, Charlie Baker, Carol Mici and Dana Raberov
Case Number: 1:2020cv10226
Filed: February 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE: re (apportioned) payment of fee (prisoner filer DONAHUE) issued to the Treasurer at MCI Framingham. (PSSA, 4)
March 27, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE: re (apportioned) payment of fee (prisoner filer SNYDER) issued to the Treasurer at MCI Framingham. (PSSA, 4)
March 27, 2020 Filing 18 Judge Richard G. Stearns: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. Plaintiffs' motion (Docket No. 16) for immediate injunction and temporary restraining order is denied without prejudice. Plaintiffs' applications (Docket Nos. 13, 17) to proceed in district court without prepaying fees or costs are granted. Snyder is assessed an initial, partial filing fee of $11.06 with the remainder of the fee, $163.94, to be assessed and collected in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2). Donahue is assessed an initial, partial filing fee of $37.63 with the remainder of the fee, $137.37, to be assessed and collected in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2). The complaint is subject to dismissal pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2), 1915A. If plaintiffs wish to proceed in this matter, they must file an amended complaint that sets forth a plausible claim upon which relief may be granted. Failure to comply with this directive within forty-two (42) days of this Memorandum and Order likely will result in dismissal of this action. (PSSA, 4)
March 23, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joanna M. Snyder. (Pacho, Arnold) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/24/2020: #1 Exhibit) (Pacho, Arnold).
March 23, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for TRO and Immediate Injunction by Jennifer Donahue, Joanna M. Snyder. (Pacho, Arnold) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/23/2020: #1 Exhibits) (Pacho, Arnold).
March 12, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE re filing fee by Jennifer Donahue. (Pacho, Arnold)
March 10, 2020 Filing 14 Complaint signed by plaintiffs Jennifer Donahue and Joanna M. Snyder. (Pacho, Arnold)
March 10, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jennifer Donahue, Joanna M. Snyder. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Withdrawal / Issue Slip) (Pacho, Arnold) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/12/2020: #2 Exhibit) (Pacho, Arnold).
March 9, 2020 Filing 11 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying without prejudice #8 Motion to Appoint Counsel. If Plaintiffs wish to proceed as parties to this action, they shall, within 21 days of this Order, either pay the $400 filing fee or each file an application to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by a certified copy of her prison account statement. Failure of either party to comply with this directive will result in the dismissal of her claims from this action. The Clerk shall provide each plaintiff with blank Applications to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. (PSSA, 4)
March 6, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Jennifer Donahue, Joanna M. Snyder. (Pacho, Arnold)
March 6, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE re payment of filing fee by Jennifer Donahue. (Pacho, Arnold)
February 21, 2020 Filing 9 Letter/request (non-motion) from Joanna M. Snyder and Jennifer Donahue. (Pacho, Arnold)
February 21, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Jennifer Donahue and Joanna M. Snyder. (Pacho, Arnold)
February 13, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER by Jennifer Donahue re #5 Order directing plaintiff to sign the complaint. [Copy of signed complaint]. (Pacho, Arnold)
February 7, 2020 Filing 6 Copy of #5 Order separately mailed to Plaintiffs on 2/7/2020. Mailing for Jennifer Donahue includes a copy of complaint and blank IFP form. (Pacho, Arnold)
February 7, 2020 Filing 5 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. If Jennifer Donahue wishes to proceed as a party to this action, she shall, within 21 days of this Order, file (1) an application to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by a certified copy of her prison account statement and (2) a copy of the complaint containing her signature. Failure of the Donahue to comply with this directive may result in the dismissal of her claims from this action. (PSSA, 4)
February 6, 2020 Filing 4 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. Procedural Order regarding resolution of filling fee. The motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff must respond within 21 days. (Castilla, Francis)
February 6, 2020 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
February 5, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jennifer Donahue, Joanna M. Snyder.(Castilla, Francis)
February 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jennifer Donahue, Joanna M. Snyder. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Letter)(Castilla, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snyder et al v. Contracted Medical for the DOC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Damlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor MaClellan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christi Ladouceur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grace Muturi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contracted Medical for the DOC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlie Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Mici
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Raberov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanna M. Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?