Michael Twombly v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Plaintiff: MICHAEL TWOMBLY, AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF WILBUR TWOMBLY and Michael Twombly
Defendant: Aurora Pump, Crosby Valve, LLC, Ford Motor Company, Crane Co., VAPOR POWER INTERNATIONAL, HOMASOTE COMPANY, Industrial Holdings Corporation, f/k/a Carborundum Corporation, H.B. Smith Co., Inc., Weil-McLain United Dominion Company, Greene, Tweed & Co., Inc., Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC. f/k/a Peerless Pumps, General Electric Company, Boston And Maine Corporation, COPES VULCAN, INC., FMC Corporation On behalf of its former Northern Pump and Chicago Pump, Trane US Inc., f/k/a American Standard Inc., WABTEC Corporation, successor in interest to Westinghouse Air Brake Company, Neles-Jamesbury, Inc, York International Corporation, CBS Corporation f/k/a Viacom, Inc. as Successor by Merger to CBS Corporation f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Riley Power Inc., f/k/a Babcock Borsig Power, Inc., f/k/a D.B. Riley, Inc., f/k/a Riley Stoker Corporation, Cleaver-Brooks, Inc., Armstrong International, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, United States Steel Corp., f/k/a The American Steel & Wire Co., Elliot Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, IMO Industries, Inc., Individually and as Successor-in-Interest to DeLaval Turbine, Inc., Pneumo Abex Corporation, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Borg-Warner Corporation By its Successor in Interest, BorgWarner Morse TEC Inc.,, Bayer Cropscience Inc., Successor in interest to Amchem Products, Inc., ITT Corporation, As success-in-interest to Bell & Gossett, Burnham Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation as successor by merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc., Spence Engineering Co., HOLMAN PARTS DISTRIBUTION, INC., F/K/A RMP POWERTRAIN SOLUTIONS, INC., ARVINMERITOR, INC., The Nash Engineering Company, Goulds Pumps, Inc., NAVISTAR INC., F/K/A INTERNATIONAL TRUCK & ENGINE CORPORATION, The Budd Company, Warren Pumps, LLC, Milwaukee Valve Company, Inc., Honeywell International Inc. f/k/a Alliedsignal, Inc. f/k/a The Bendix Corporation, Zurn Industries, as successor in interest to Erie City Iron Works, Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc., A Division of Weir Power & Industrial, Cummins Inc., Trane US Inc., Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc., Honeywell International Inc., Industrial Holdings Corporation, FMC Corporation, Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC, Bayer CropScience Inc., Riley Power Inc., CBS Corporation, IMO Industries, Inc., United States Steel Corp., Borg-Warner Corporation, WABTEC Corporation, Navistar Inc., Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Holman Parts Distribution, Inc., Zurn Industries, LLC and ITT Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv10236
Filed: February 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2020 Filing 138 RESPONSE to Motion re #96 MOTION to Remand to State Court /Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to General Electric Company's Notice of Joinder in Removal filed by General Electric Company. (Mohan, Catherine)
March 26, 2020 Filing 137 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #135 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Lara, Miguel)
March 25, 2020 Filing 136 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #133 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Christopher G. Conley. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Lara, Miguel)
March 25, 2020 Filing 135 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to General Electric Company's Notice of Joinder in Removal by General Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Proposed Reply))(Mohan, Catherine)
March 25, 2020 Filing 134 NOTICE of Appearance by Giuliana D'Esopo on behalf of Michael Twombly (D'Esopo, Giuliana)
March 24, 2020 Filing 133 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Christopher G. Conley Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8169041 by CBS Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Good Standing)(Moccia, Anthony)
March 24, 2020 Filing 132 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Neles-Jamesbury, Inc. (Jackson, Susan)
March 24, 2020 Filing 131 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan A. Jackson on behalf of Neles-Jamesbury, Inc (Jackson, Susan)
March 24, 2020 Filing 130 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Armstrong International, Inc.. (Jackson, Susan)
March 24, 2020 Filing 129 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan A. Jackson on behalf of Armstrong International, Inc. (Jackson, Susan)
March 24, 2020 Filing 128 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Milwaukee Valve Company, Inc.. (Martin, Adam)
March 24, 2020 Filing 127 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam C. Martin on behalf of Milwaukee Valve Company, Inc. (Martin, Adam)
March 24, 2020 Filing 126 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.. (Martin, Adam)
March 24, 2020 Filing 125 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam C. Martin on behalf of Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. (Martin, Adam)
March 19, 2020 Filing 124 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by HOMASOTE COMPANY. (Oleyer, Matthew)
March 19, 2020 Filing 123 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew C. Oleyer on behalf of HOMASOTE COMPANY (Oleyer, Matthew)
March 19, 2020 Filing 122 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #117 Motion for Leave to File Document. (Lara, Miguel)
March 19, 2020 Filing 121 REPLY to Response to #35 MOTION to Remand to State Court and MOTION to Sever filed by Michael Twombly. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Shepard, Michael)
March 12, 2020 Filing 120 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by VAPOR POWER INTERNATIONAL identifying Corporate Parent Vapor Power Holdings, LLC for VAPOR POWER INTERNATIONAL.. (Felice, John)
March 12, 2020 Filing 119 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Acknowledgment of Service, Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by VAPOR POWER INTERNATIONAL.(Felice, John)
March 12, 2020 Filing 118 NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Felice on behalf of VAPOR POWER INTERNATIONAL (Felice, John)
March 12, 2020 Filing 117 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply to Defendant ViacomCBS Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Severance and Remand by Michael Twombly.(McCann, Michael)
March 11, 2020 Filing 116 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Weil-McLain United Dominion Company.(Dwyer, Paul)
March 11, 2020 Filing 115 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Industrial Holdings Corporation.(Dwyer, Paul)
March 11, 2020 Filing 114 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC.(Dwyer, Paul)
March 11, 2020 Filing 113 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by FMC Corporation.(Dwyer, Paul)
March 9, 2020 Filing 112 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ford Motor Company. (Keough, Timothy)
March 9, 2020 Filing 111 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy J. Keough on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Keough, Timothy)
March 6, 2020 Filing 110 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #107 MOTION for Joinder, #96 MOTION to Remand to State Court , #35 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Motion to Sever: Motion Hearing set for 5/19/2020 02:30 PM in Courtroom 19 before Judge Patti B. Saris. (Lara, Miguel)
March 6, 2020 Filing 109 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Arvinmeritor, Inc..(Polglase, Holly)
March 5, 2020 Filing 108 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #101 , #102 , #103 , #104 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer now due by 3/11/2020. (Lara, Miguel)
March 5, 2020 Filing 107 MOTION for Joinder in ViacomCBS INC.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Severance and Remand (Docket #106) by General Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Complaint))(Mohan, Catherine)
March 4, 2020 Filing 106 Opposition re #96 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by CBS Corporation. (Moccia, Anthony)
March 4, 2020 Filing 105 NOTICE of Appearance by Clint D. Watts on behalf of Weil-McLain United Dominion Company (Watts, Clint)
March 4, 2020 Filing 104 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 3/11/2020 to File Answer by Weil-McLain United Dominion Company.(Dwyer, Paul)
March 4, 2020 Filing 103 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 3/11/2020 to File Answer by Industrial Holdings Corporation.(Dwyer, Paul)
March 4, 2020 Filing 102 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 3/11/2020 to File Answer by Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC.(Dwyer, Paul)
March 4, 2020 Filing 101 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 3/11/2020 to File Answer by FMC Corporation.(Dwyer, Paul)
March 4, 2020 Filing 100 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Weil-McLain United Dominion Company. (Dwyer, Paul)
March 4, 2020 Filing 99 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul E. Dwyer, Jr on behalf of Weil-McLain United Dominion Company (Dwyer, Paul)
March 4, 2020 Filing 98 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #92 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Arvinmeritor, Inc. answer due 3/6/2020. (Lara, Miguel)
March 4, 2020 Filing 97 MEMORANDUM in Support re #96 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Michael Twombly. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Service on General Electric)(Shepard, Michael)
March 4, 2020 Filing 96 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Michael Twombly.(Shepard, Michael)
March 3, 2020 Filing 95 NOTICE of Appearance by Clint D. Watts on behalf of Industrial Holdings Corporation (Watts, Clint)
March 3, 2020 Filing 94 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Industrial Holdings Corporation. (Dwyer, Paul)
March 3, 2020 Filing 93 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul E. Dwyer, Jr on behalf of Industrial Holdings Corporation (Dwyer, Paul)
February 28, 2020 Filing 92 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Arvinmeritor, Inc..(Polglase, Holly)
February 28, 2020 Filing 91 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Arvinmeritor, Inc.. (Polglase, Holly)
February 28, 2020 Filing 90 NOTICE of Appearance by Holly M. Polglase on behalf of Arvinmeritor, Inc. (Polglase, Holly)
February 28, 2020 Filing 89 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony J. Sbarra, Jr on behalf of Arvinmeritor, Inc. (Sbarra, Anthony)
February 28, 2020 Filing 88 NOTICE of Appearance by Clint D. Watts on behalf of Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC (Watts, Clint)
February 28, 2020 Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance by Clint D. Watts on behalf of FMC Corporation (Watts, Clint)
February 28, 2020 Filing 86 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC. (Dwyer, Paul)
February 28, 2020 Filing 85 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by FMC Corporation. (Dwyer, Paul)
February 28, 2020 Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul E. Dwyer, Jr on behalf of Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC (Dwyer, Paul)
February 28, 2020 Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul E. Dwyer, Jr on behalf of FMC Corporation (Dwyer, Paul)
February 28, 2020 Filing 82 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T. Lee on behalf of Boston And Maine Corporation (Lee, Michael)
February 28, 2020 Filing 81 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark J. Claflin on behalf of Boston And Maine Corporation (Claflin, Mark)
February 28, 2020 Filing 80 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Boston And Maine Corporation. (Mackler, Joni)
February 28, 2020 Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance by Joni K. Mackler on behalf of Boston And Maine Corporation (Mackler, Joni)
February 27, 2020 Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by Seta Eskanian on behalf of Spence Engineering Co. (Eskanian, Seta)
February 27, 2020 Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by Michaela E. Lancer on behalf of Spence Engineering Co. (Lancer, Michaela)
February 27, 2020 Filing 76 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Spence Engineering Co.. (Misiura, Bryna)
February 27, 2020 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryna Rosen Misiura on behalf of Spence Engineering Co. (Misiura, Bryna)
February 27, 2020 Filing 74 Defendant Spence Engineering Company, Inc's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Spence Engineering Co..(Misiura, Bryna)
February 27, 2020 Filing 73 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 (D)(3). (Misiura, Bryna)
February 27, 2020 Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by Seta Eskanian on behalf of Crane Co. (Eskanian, Seta)
February 27, 2020 Filing 71 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 (D)(3). (Gardella, John)
February 27, 2020 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by Michaela E. Lancer on behalf of Crane Co. (Lancer, Michaela)
February 27, 2020 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by John P. Gardella on behalf of Crane Co. (Gardella, John)
February 27, 2020 Filing 68 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Crane Co.. (Gardella, John)
February 27, 2020 Filing 67 Defendant Crane Co.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Crane Co..(Gardella, John)
February 26, 2020 Filing 66 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CBS Corporation. (Moccia, Anthony)
February 26, 2020 Filing 65 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses, Cross-Claim against all Defendants by CBS Corporation.(Moccia, Anthony)
February 26, 2020 Filing 64 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by York International Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls International plc for York International Corporation.. (George, Wayne)
February 26, 2020 Filing 63 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ITT Corporation identifying Corporate Parent ITT Inc. for ITT Corporation.. (George, Wayne)
February 26, 2020 Filing 62 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Goulds Pumps, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent ITT Inc. for Goulds Pumps, Inc... (George, Wayne)
February 26, 2020 Filing 61 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Elliot Company identifying Corporate Parent Ebara Corporation, Other Affiliate Elliott Group Holdings, Inc. for Elliot Company.. (George, Wayne)
February 26, 2020 Filing 60 ANSWER to Complaint With Affirmative Defenses by York International Corporation.(George, Wayne)
February 26, 2020 Filing 59 ANSWER to Complaint With Affirmative Defenses by ITT Corporation.(George, Wayne)
February 26, 2020 Filing 58 ANSWER to Complaint With Affirmative Defenses by Goulds Pumps, Inc..(George, Wayne)
February 26, 2020 Filing 57 ANSWER to Complaint With Affirmative Defenses by Elliot Company.(George, Wayne)
February 26, 2020 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Wayne E. George on behalf of Elliot Company, Goulds Pumps, Inc., ITT Corporation, York International Corporation (George, Wayne)
February 26, 2020 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Yasmin Tayyab on behalf of Elliot Company, Goulds Pumps, Inc., ITT Corporation, York International Corporation (Tayyab, J.)
February 25, 2020 Filing 54 NOTICE by General Electric Company of Joinder in Removal and Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Mohan, Catherine)
February 19, 2020 Filing 53 Zurn Industries, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , Affirmative Defenses, Answer to all Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Zurn Industries, LLC.(DeLuzio, Maria)
February 19, 2020 Filing 52 Warren Pumps, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , Affirmative Defenses, Answer to all Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Warren Pumps, LLC.(DeLuzio, Maria)
February 19, 2020 Filing 51 IMO Industries, Inc. f/k/a DeLaval Steam Turbine Company's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , Affirmative Defenses, Answer to All Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by IMO Industries, Inc..(DeLuzio, Maria)
February 19, 2020 Filing 50 Cummins Inc. f/k/a Cummins Engine Co.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , Affirmative Defenses, Answer to All Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Cummins Inc..(DeLuzio, Maria)
February 19, 2020 Filing 49 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of Bayer CropScience, Inc.. (Adams, Kip)
February 19, 2020 Filing 48 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bayer CropScience Inc.. (Adams, Kip)
February 19, 2020 Filing 47 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Bayer CropScience Inc..(Adams, Kip)
February 19, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Diana A. Balluku on behalf of Bayer CropScience Inc. (Balluku, Diana)
February 19, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Monica R. Nelson on behalf of Bayer CropScience Inc. (Nelson, Monica)
February 19, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Kip J. Adams on behalf of Bayer CropScience Inc. (Adams, Kip)
February 19, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Tauro on behalf of Bayer CropScience Inc. (Tauro, Christopher)
February 19, 2020 Filing 42 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of Union Carbide Corporation. (Adams, Kip)
February 19, 2020 Filing 41 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Union Carbide Corporation. (Adams, Kip)
February 19, 2020 Filing 40 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Union Carbide Corporation.(Adams, Kip)
February 19, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Diana A. Balluku on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation (Balluku, Diana)
February 19, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Monica R. Nelson on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation (Nelson, Monica)
February 19, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Kip J. Adams on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation (Adams, Kip)
February 19, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Tauro on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation (Tauro, Christopher)
February 18, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION to Remand to State Court and, MOTION to Sever ( Responses due by 3/3/2020) by Michael Twombly. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Severance and Remand)(Shepard, Michael)
February 14, 2020 Filing 34 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Budd Company identifying Corporate Parent ThyssenKrupp AG for The Budd Company.. (Felice, John)
February 14, 2020 Filing 33 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Acknowledgment of Service, Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by The Budd Company.(Felice, John)
February 14, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Felice on behalf of The Budd Company (Felice, John)
February 12, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan L. Riordan on behalf of Zurn Industries, LLC (Riordan, Meghan)
February 12, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan L. Riordan on behalf of Warren Pumps, LLC (Riordan, Meghan)
February 12, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan L. Riordan on behalf of IMO Industries, Inc. (Riordan, Meghan)
February 12, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan L. Riordan on behalf of Cummins Inc. (Riordan, Meghan)
February 12, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria E. DeLuzio on behalf of Zurn Industries, LLC (DeLuzio, Maria)
February 12, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria E. DeLuzio on behalf of Warren Pumps, LLC (DeLuzio, Maria)
February 12, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria E. DeLuzio on behalf of IMO Industries, Inc. (DeLuzio, Maria)
February 12, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria E. DeLuzio on behalf of Cummins Inc. (DeLuzio, Maria)
February 12, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Perritano on behalf of Zurn Industries, LLC (Perritano, Judith)
February 12, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Perritano on behalf of Warren Pumps, LLC (Perritano, Judith)
February 12, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Perritano on behalf of IMO Industries, Inc. (Perritano, Judith)
February 12, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Perritano on behalf of Cummins Inc. (Perritano, Judith)
February 11, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne E. Shannon on behalf of General Electric Company (Shannon, Anne)
February 11, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Stesha A. Emmanuel on behalf of General Electric Company (Emmanuel, Stesha)
February 11, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of General Electric Company. (Mohan, Catherine)
February 11, 2020 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by General Electric Company. (Mohan, Catherine)
February 11, 2020 Filing 15 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by General Electric Company.(Mohan, Catherine)
February 11, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine Mohan on behalf of General Electric Company (Mohan, Catherine)
February 10, 2020 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Burnham Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Burnham Holdings, Inc. for Burnham Corporation.. (Felice, John)
February 10, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Felice on behalf of Burnham Corporation (Felice, John)
February 10, 2020 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Ampco-Pittsburg Corporation for Air & Liquid Systems Corporation.. (Felice, John)
February 10, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Acknowledgment of Service, Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation.(Felice, John)
February 10, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal, Joinder in Removal (Felice, John)
February 10, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Felice on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (Felice, John)
February 7, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen T. Armato on behalf of Defense Liaison Counsel (Armato, Stephen)
February 7, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence G. Cetrulo on behalf of Defense Liaison Counsel (Cetrulo, Lawrence)
February 7, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. McCann on behalf of Michael Twombly (McCann, Michael)
February 7, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael C. Shepard on behalf of Michael Twombly (Shepard, Michael)
February 7, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Erika A. O'Donnell on behalf of Michael Twombly (O'Donnell, Erika)
February 7, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
February 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CBS Corporation f/k/a Viacom, Inc. as Successor by Merger to CBS Corporation f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8094357 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Form)(Moccia, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michael Twombly v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Pump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crosby Valve, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Timothy J. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Seta Eskanian
Represented By: Michaela E. Lancer
Represented By: John P. Gardella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VAPOR POWER INTERNATIONAL
Represented By: John R. Felice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOMASOTE COMPANY
Represented By: Matthew C. Oleyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Industrial Holdings Corporation, f/k/a Carborundum Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.B. Smith Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weil-McLain United Dominion Company
Represented By: Paul E. Dwyer, Jr.
Represented By: Clint D. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greene, Tweed & Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC. f/k/a Peerless Pumps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Anne E. Shannon
Represented By: Catherine Mohan
Represented By: Stesha A. Emmanuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston And Maine Corporation
Represented By: Mark J. Claflin
Represented By: Joni K. Mackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COPES VULCAN, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation On behalf of its former Northern Pump and Chicago Pump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trane US Inc., f/k/a American Standard Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WABTEC Corporation, successor in interest to Westinghouse Air Brake Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neles-Jamesbury, Inc
Represented By: Susan A. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: York International Corporation
Represented By: Wayne E. George
Represented By: J. Yasmin Tayyab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation f/k/a Viacom, Inc. as Successor by Merger to CBS Corporation f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Represented By: Anthony M. Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riley Power Inc., f/k/a Babcock Borsig Power, Inc., f/k/a D.B. Riley, Inc., f/k/a Riley Stoker Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.
Represented By: Adam C. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armstrong International, Inc.
Represented By: Susan A. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Christopher M. Tauro
Represented By: Diana A. Balluku
Represented By: Monica R. Nelson
Represented By: Kip J. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Steel Corp., f/k/a The American Steel & Wire Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliot Company
Represented By: Wayne E. George
Represented By: J. Yasmin Tayyab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc., Individually and as Successor-in-Interest to DeLaval Turbine, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo Abex Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borg-Warner Corporation By its Successor in Interest, BorgWarner Morse TEC Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Cropscience Inc., Successor in interest to Amchem Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Corporation, As success-in-interest to Bell & Gossett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burnham Corporation
Represented By: John R. Felice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation as successor by merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spence Engineering Co.
Represented By: Seta Eskanian
Represented By: Michaela E. Lancer
Represented By: Bryna Rosen Misiura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOLMAN PARTS DISTRIBUTION, INC., F/K/A RMP POWERTRAIN SOLUTIONS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARVINMERITOR, INC.
Represented By: Anthony J. Sbarra, Jr.
Represented By: Holly M. Polglase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Nash Engineering Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps, Inc.
Represented By: Wayne E. George
Represented By: J. Yasmin Tayyab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAVISTAR INC., F/K/A INTERNATIONAL TRUCK & ENGINE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Budd Company
Represented By: John R. Felice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Represented By: Maria E. DeLuzio
Represented By: Judith A. Perritano
Represented By: Meghan L. Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milwaukee Valve Company, Inc.
Represented By: Adam C. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc. f/k/a Alliedsignal, Inc. f/k/a The Bendix Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurn Industries, as successor in interest to Erie City Iron Works
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc., A Division of Weir Power & Industrial
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cummins Inc.
Represented By: Maria E. DeLuzio
Represented By: Judith A. Perritano
Represented By: Meghan L. Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trane US Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Industrial Holdings Corporation
Represented By: Paul E. Dwyer, Jr.
Represented By: Clint D. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Represented By: Paul E. Dwyer, Jr.
Represented By: Clint D. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC
Represented By: Paul E. Dwyer, Jr.
Represented By: Clint D. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer CropScience Inc.
Represented By: Monica R. Nelson
Represented By: Diana A. Balluku
Represented By: Christopher M. Tauro
Represented By: Kip J. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riley Power Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Anthony M. Moccia
Represented By: Christopher G Conley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Maria E. DeLuzio
Represented By: Judith A. Perritano
Represented By: Meghan L. Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Steel Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borg-Warner Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WABTEC Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navistar Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: John R. Felice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holman Parts Distribution, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurn Industries, LLC
Represented By: Maria E. DeLuzio
Represented By: Judith A. Perritano
Represented By: Meghan L. Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Corporation
Represented By: Wayne E. George
Represented By: J. Yasmin Tayyab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL TWOMBLY, AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF WILBUR TWOMBLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Twombly
Represented By: Giuliana D'Esopo
Represented By: Michael J. McCann
Represented By: Michael C. Shepard
Represented By: Erika A. O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?