Fucarile v. Laturno et al
Plaintiff: Michael William Fucarile
Defendant: Brian T. Laturno and Husqvarna Professional Products, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv10318
Filed: February 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2020 Filing 16 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered.The Court ADOPTS the #12 proposed schedule as an Order of the Court. At the request of the parties, the Court CANCELS the in-person Rule 16 conference scheduled on March 30, 2020. The Court will hold a status conference on Tuesday, October 20, 2020 at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom 13 before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. Counsel may attend this conference by telephone. re #12 Joint submission filed by Husqvarna Professional Products, Inc., Brian T. Laturno (Montes, Mariliz)
March 24, 2020 Filing 15 Document disclosure by Michael William Fucarile.(Fluke, Loring)
March 23, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Brian T. Laturno.(Polglase, Holly)
March 23, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Husqvarna Professional Products, Inc..(Polglase, Holly)
March 23, 2020 Filing 12 JOINT SUBMISSION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Husqvarna Professional Products, Inc., Brian T. Laturno.(Polglase, Holly)
February 28, 2020 Filing 10 STATE COURT Record. (Montes, Mariliz)
February 28, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. A Scheduling Conference has been set for 3/30/2020 02:15 PM in Courtroom 3 before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Attachments: #1 scheduling order sample, #2 standing order on summary judgment)(Simeone, Maria)
February 26, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Special Defenses by Brian T. Laturno.(Polglase, Holly)
February 26, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Special Defenses by Husqvarna Professional Products, Inc..(Polglase, Holly)
February 19, 2020 Filing 6 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email. (Jones, Sherry)
February 19, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
February 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Colin N. Holmes on behalf of Husqvarna Professional Products, Inc., Brian T. Laturno (Holmes, Colin)
February 18, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Husqvarna Professional Products, Inc.. (Polglase, Holly)
February 18, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Holly M. Polglase on behalf of Husqvarna Professional Products, Inc., Brian T. Laturno (Polglase, Holly)
February 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Husqvarna Professional Products, Inc., Brian T. Laturno ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8113218 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Complaint to LaTurno), #2 Exhibit 2 (Complaint to Husqvarna), #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit 4 (Category Form))(Polglase, Holly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fucarile v. Laturno et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian T. Laturno
Represented By: Colin N. Holmes
Represented By: Holly M. Polglase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Husqvarna Professional Products, Inc.
Represented By: Colin N. Holmes
Represented By: Holly M. Polglase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael William Fucarile
Represented By: Loring P. Fluke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?