Albanese v. Dean
Plaintiff: Domenic Salvatore Albanese
Defendant: Mike Smith, Wareham Police Department, J Dean and Dean J. Decas
Case Number: 1:2020cv10392
Filed: February 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2020 Filing 12 Show Cause & Motion for Dismissal Without Prejudice by Domenic Salvatore Albanese. (Kelly, Danielle)
April 8, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE: re payment of fee (prisoner filer) issued to the Treasurer at Norfolk County Correctional Center (PSSA, 4)
April 8, 2020 Filing 10 Judge Indira Talwani: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered 1. The Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees [#2] is granted. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1), the court assesses an initial partial filing fee of $ 89.50. The remainder of the fee, $ 260.50, shall be collected in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2).2. The Motion for Appointment of Counsel [#3] is denied without prejudice.3. Albanese must, within forty-two days of the date of this order, show cause in writing why this action should not be dismissed for the reasons stated above. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of the action. The show cause response may be in the form of an amended complaint or legal memorandum. (PSSA, 4)
April 2, 2020 Filing 9 Letter/request (non-motion) from Domenic Salvatore Albanese. (Kelly, Danielle)
March 27, 2020 Filing 8 Letter/request (non-motion) from Domenic Salvatore Albanese. (Kelly, Danielle)
March 13, 2020 Filing 7 Letter/request (non-motion) from Domenic Salvatore Albanese. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C)(Kelly, Danielle)
March 9, 2020 Filing 6 Letter/request (non-motion) from Domenic Salvatore Albanese. (Kelly, Danielle)
February 27, 2020 Filing 5 Letter/request (non-motion) from Domenic Albanese. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kelly, Danielle)
February 26, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
February 24, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Domenic Salvatore Albanese.(Castilla, Francis)
February 24, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Domenic Salvatore Albanese.(Castilla, Francis)
February 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Domenic Salvatore Albanese. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Castilla, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Albanese v. Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wareham Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean J. Decas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Domenic Salvatore Albanese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?